A.C. v. Red Roof Inns Inc et al
Plaintiff: A.C.
Defendant: Red Roof Inns Inc, Choice Hotels International Inc and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04965
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Algenon L Marbley
3 Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sara M Turner by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/23/2019 (kk2)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7253593) of Sara M. Turner by Defendant Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Heis, Jennifer)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-755 and 2:19-cv-849 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley & Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 11/14/2019. (kk2)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Choice Hotels International Inc, Red Roof Inns Inc, and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts LLC (kk2)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously by Plaintiff A.C. (Babin, Steven) Modified on 11/12/2019 to correct text & filing event (kk2)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Choice Hotels International Inc, Red Roof Inns Inc, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7193569), filed by A.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Red Roof Inns, Inc, #3 Summons Form Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, LLC, #4 Summons Form Choice Hotels International, Inc.) (Babin, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.C. v. Red Roof Inns Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Inns Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Snyder Heis
Represented By: Alyson A Terrell
Represented By: Sara M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.
Represented By: Steven Charles Babin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?