Poole v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bertina Poole
Defendant: Davol Inc and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05039
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Short Form ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol Inc. (Kloss, William)
November 15, 2019 Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (daf)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07038. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Ohio the electric record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2846 Conditional Transfer Order filed 11/13/2019. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. Mailed notice (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2019.]
October 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. by Maryanne Chongmee Woo (Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L10539) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16375804. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woo, Maryanne) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 11/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertina Poole
Represented By: Robert McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol Inc
Represented By: Maryanne Chongmee Woo
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Maryanne Chongmee Woo
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?