Fiorelli v. Columbus Outlets, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Fiorelli
Defendant: Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc., Brooks Brothers Group, Inc. and Columbus Outlets, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05278
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #9 (Notice of Dismissal) (kk2)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Nicholas Fiorelli (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (kk2)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Brooks Brothers Group, Inc. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (kk2)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Columbus Outlets, LLC. Columbus Outlets, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (sem)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint sent by certified mail to Defendants Columbus Outlets LLC, Brooks Brothers Group Inc, and Tanger Factory Outlet Centers Inc (kk2)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Nicholas Fiorelli (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (kk2)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants, filed by Nicholas Fiorelli. (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (kk2)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brooks Brothers Group Inc., Columbus Outlets LLC, and Tanger Factory Outlet Centers Inc. (kk2)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7220827), filed by Nicholas Fiorelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form - Columbus Outlets, #3 Summons Form - Tanger Outlet, #4 Summons Form - Brooks Brothers) (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiorelli v. Columbus Outlets, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanger Factory Outlet Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Brothers Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Outlets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Fiorelli
Represented By: Nicole T Fiorelli
Represented By: Patrick J Perotti
Represented By: Frank A. Bartela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?