Asamoah v. Capstone Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Asamoah
Defendant: Capstone Logistics, LLC and Progressive Logistics Services, LLC
Petitioner: The Sygma Network, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05292
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Movant The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sygma Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Frey, Oliver)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to Consolidate by Michael Asamoah. (ew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Additional phone number by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah. (jlk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 Response re #9 Notice (Other) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Notify the Court of Defendants' Failure to Complete Service (Doc. #9) by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (Lillard, Samuel)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Response re #8 Response (non motion) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #8) by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (Lillard, Samuel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants' First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (Lillard, Samuel)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Defendants' Failure to Properly Complete Service of Process re #6 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Response in Opposition re #6 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Lillard, Samuel)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (Lillard, Samuel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Capstone Logistics, LLC served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (kk2)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Summons & complaint sent by certified mail to Capstone Logistics LLC & Progressive Logistics Services LLC (kk2)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Alias Summons Issued as to Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (ew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capstone Logistics, LLC and Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (ew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Capstone Logistics, LLC and Progressive Logistics Services, LLC filed by Michael Asamoah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ew).
December 2, 2019 Filing Fee Received: $400. Receipt Number: 200COL059738. (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asamoah v. Capstone Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Asamoah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Neal Lillard
Represented By: Curtis G. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Logistics Services, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Neal Lillard
Represented By: Curtis G. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Sygma Network, Inc.
Represented By: Oliver D. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?