Hocking Hills Energy and Wells Services, LLC v. Marksmen Energy USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hocking Hills Energy and Wells Services, LLC
Defendant: Marksmen Energy USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05295
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendant Marksmen Energy USA, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel (Meluch, Maribeth)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The January 6, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 2/7/2020. Motions to Amend due by 2/7/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 1/30/2020. Discovery due by 7/15/2020. Dispositive motions due by 8/15/2020. Primary Expert due by 5/15/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/15/2020. Settlement Demand due by 1/15/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/3/2020. Mediation Deadline: 2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/30/2019. (daf)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Counter Defendant Hocking Hills Energy and Wells Services, LLC. (West, John)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by All Plaintiffs. (West, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please Note:The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Hocking Hills Energy and Wells Services, LLC filed by Marksmen Energy USA, Inc.. (Meluch, Maribeth)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Marksmen Energy USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint) (Meluch, Maribeth)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, [AMENDED] by Defendant Marksmen Energy USA, Inc.. (Meluch, Maribeth)
December 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Answer due 12/9/2019. (ew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Marksmen Energy USA, Inc. originally filed in Hocking County Court of Common Pleas on 11/18/2019 by Hocking Hills Energy and Wells Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hocking County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19cv1033 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7222485), filed by Marksmen Energy USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit Maribeth Meluch, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Meluch, Maribeth) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (ew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hocking Hills Energy and Wells Services, LLC v. Marksmen Energy USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hocking Hills Energy and Wells Services, LLC
Represented By: John Kevin West
Represented By: Curtis H Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marksmen Energy USA, Inc.
Represented By: Maribeth Meluch
Represented By: Shawn Kincade Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?