Kifuko et al v. Koumans et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Kifuko, Arinda Turigye, Jacqueline Rose Kifuko and A.T.
Defendant: Kevin McLeenan, William Barr, Mark Koumans, William P. Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan and Mark R. Koumans
Case Number: 2:2019cv05313
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Reset deadlines pursuant to #11 : Answers due 2/25/2020. (ew)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATED Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendants William P. Barr, Mark R. Koumans, Kevin K. McAleenan. (Yates, Christopher) Modified text on 1/31/2020 (ew).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/5/2019. (ew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants c/o U.S. Attorney (Columbus). (ew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Marshall, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jacqueline Rose Kifuko and A.T. (Marshall, John) Modified filers on 12/5/2019 (ew).
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Rose Kifuko and A.T. (Marshall, John) Modified filers on 12/5/2019 (ew).
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mark R. Koumans, Kevin K. McAleenan, and William P. Barr. (ew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Marshall, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Marshall, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Marshall, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kifuko et al v. Koumans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Kifuko
Represented By: John Spenceley Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arinda Turigye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Rose Kifuko
Represented By: Madeline Jean Rettig
Represented By: Helen M. Robinson
Represented By: Samuel Micah Schlein
Represented By: Edward Reilley Forman
Represented By: Louis Abraham Jacobs
Represented By: John Spenceley Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T.
Represented By: Madeline Jean Rettig
Represented By: John Spenceley Marshall,
Represented By: Helen M. Robinson
Represented By: Samuel Micah Schlein
Represented By: Edward Reilley Forman
Represented By: Louis Abraham Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McLeenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Koumans
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?