Glowacki v. Duplay
Plaintiff: GARY R GLOWACKI and Gary R. Glowacki
Defendant: CRYSTAL M DUPLAY and Crystal M. Duplay
Case Number: 2:2019cv05329
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stefanie Helen Jackman and Sarah Tope Reise. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/30/2020. (ew)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7305530) of Stefanie Helen Jackman, Sarah Tope Reise by Defendant Crystal M. Duplay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Preslan, Clinton)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton E. Preslan for Defendant Crystal M. Duplay (Preslan, Clinton)
December 30, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Answer due 2/3/2020. (ew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Crystal M. Duplay on 12/5/2019. Answer due 2/3/2020. (Fitrakis, Robert) Modified service and answer dates on 12/31/2019 (ew).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/18/2019. (daf)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gary R. Glowacki. (Fitrakis, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crystal M. Duplay, filed by Gary R. Glowacki. (Fitrakis, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 1/5/2020. (ew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency: This case was filed without the required filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit) (ew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Gary R. Glowacki. (Fitrakis, Robert) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (ew).
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Crystal M. Duplay filed by Gary R. Glowacki. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fitrakis, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glowacki v. Duplay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY R GLOWACKI
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R. Glowacki
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYSTAL M DUPLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal M. Duplay
Represented By: Clinton E. Preslan
Represented By: Sarah Tope Reise
Represented By: Stefanie Helen Jackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?