Perkins Coie LLP
In Re: Perkins Coie LLP
Case Number: 2:2019mc00038
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04717. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Ohio the electronic record. (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Pursuant to Stipulation filed on 8/1/2019 #9 , this motion is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Transfering this Action Pursuant to Rule 45(f) (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re Perkins Coie LLP by Regina L. LaMonica (LaMonica, Regina) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re Perkins Coie LLP by Caryn Lara Trombino (Trombino, Caryn) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 15, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-16026870. (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re Perkins Coie LLP by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM by Perkins Coie LLP in support of motion to quash #1 Plaintiffs' Subpoena (non-party Perkins Coie) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION by In Re Perkins Coie LLP to quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena (non-party Perkins Coie) (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins Coie LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Perkins Coie LLP
Represented By: Bates McIntyre Larson
Represented By: Caryn Lara Trombino
Represented By: Regina L. LaMonica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?