PEARSON v. BARRETT
Plaintiff: RITA M PEARSON
Defendant: SECRETARY AIR FORCE BARBARA M BARRETT and BARBARA M BARRETT
Case Number: 2:2020cv00154
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 10:1552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 EXHIBITS A - E) (Cincione, Alphonse) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (jlk).
January 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Redacted version of Exhibits Deadline by 1/30/2020. (jlk)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The Clerk is directed to place [4-1] Exhibits under seal, which are also ORDERED STRICKEN. Plaintiff is again ORDERED to file a properly redacted version of the exhibits by JANUARY 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 27, 2020. (jlk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN PER ORDER #5 ***NOTICE by Plaintiff RITA M PEARSON re #1 Complaint EXHIBITS A - E (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Cincione, Alphonse) Modified on 1/27/2020 (jlk).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a redacted version of the exhibits within 7 DAYS re #2 Notice filed by RITA M PEARSON. Deadline by 1/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 23, 2020. (jlk)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 STRICKEN PER ORDER #3 ***NOTICE by Plaintiff RITA M PEARSON re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A THRU E) (Cincione, Alphonse) Modified on 1/27/2020 (jlk).
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7275113), filed by RITA M PEARSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cincione, Alphonse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEARSON v. BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY AIR FORCE BARBARA M BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA M BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA M PEARSON
Represented By: Alphonse P. Cincione
Represented By: Daniel Chadd McKitrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?