McNeil et al v. Trinity Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brandi Wells, Jessica Sheets, Edward Wright, Amelia Powers, Akeela Bowens, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Chad Readout, Deron Lundy and Earlene Romine
Defendant: Trinity Health Corporation, Edward Lamb and Mount Carmel Health System
Case Number: 2:2020cv00258
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTATION ORDER: Defendants represent that they are ready to submit the documents at issue in the pending motions (Docs. #50 , #54 ) for in camera review. They are directed to send all documents by email to jolson_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/5/21. (jr)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (O'Shea, Kevin)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING the Unopposed Motion to Seal (Doc. #59 ). Plaintiffs shall file Exhibits 1, 2, and 5 from their Cross Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. #54 ) under temporary seal. The materials shall remain sealed until the Court rules on the Motion for Protective Order (Doc. #50 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/4/21. (jr)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STATUS REPORT re Three Pending Motions by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Landy, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION for Protective Order , #54 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery Memorandum in Opposition filed by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (O'Shea, Kevin)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Three Exhibits That Plaintiffs Have Attached to their Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order and in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel Discovery [ECF No. 54] by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases) (O'Shea, Kevin)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright re #54 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery Re-Filed Exhibit 7 Unredacted (Landy, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order This entry was created for filing purposes only. Please refer to ECF No. 56. (daf)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Joint Motion to So Order (Doc. #55 ). Plaintiffs shall file the supporting materials designated "Confidential" under temporary seal. Defendants shall file a motion to seal, if any, by October 1, concurrently with their papers in reply/response. If Defendants file no such a motion, the materials shall no longer be sealed. If Defendants file such a motion, the materials shall remain sealed until the Court rules on the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/21/21. (jr)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Consent MOTION to So Order Letter re #54 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery re Materials Designated as Confidential under Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Landy, Robert) Modified event type on 9/23/2021 (daf).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Cross-Motion, #2 Declaration of Robert S. Landy, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9) (Landy, Robert)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTATION ORDER - For good cause shown, the parties' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #52 ) is granted. The briefing schedule for Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Doc. #50 ) is amended as follows: Plaintiffs' Response and Cross-Motion due by 9/17/2021; Response to Cross-Motion and Reply due by 10/1/2021; and Plaintiffs' Reply to Cross-Motion due by 10/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/8/21. (jr)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #50 MOTION for Protective Order . Responses due by 9/17/2021 Replies due by 10/1/2021. (jr)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/17/2021. re Remaining Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Prasad, Anjula)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTATION ORDER - Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Doc. #50 ) was due September 3, 2021 (Doc. #48 ). As of the date of this Order, no response has been filed. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause why they have not responded by September 10, 2021, or the Court will consider Defendants' Motion (Doc. #50 ) unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/7/21. (jr)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Mandi Murray, #3 Exhibit B- Affidavit of Melissa Lander, #4 Exhibit C- Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 37, 40 and 41, #5 Exhibit D- Unpublished Cases) (O'Shea, Kevin)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation of Withdrawal of Appearance of Mahde Abdallah (Abdallah, Mahde)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Protective Order due by 8/20/2021. Responses and Cross-Motion due by 9/3/2021. Response to Cross-Motion and Reply due by 9/17/2021. Plaintiffs' Reply to Cross-Motion due by 9/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/16/2021. (ew)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 7/14/2021. (jr)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint MOTION Conference re #45 Order on Motion for Discovery, Request for Telephonic Conference by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Discovery Status Report) (Landy, Robert)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery (Doc. #44 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding these outstanding discovery requests and file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order updating the Court on any lingering issues. Furthermore, the status conference set for June 25, 2021, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/24/21. (jr)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Discovery via Letter re Final Discovery by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Prasad, Anjula)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - Resetting discovery deadlines: Discovery (Fact) due by 10/18/2021. Dispositive motions due by 11/23/2021. Settlement Demand due by 10/15/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 10/29/2021. Mediation Deadline: 2/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 27, 2021. (jlk)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Compliance Conference set for 6/25/2021 10:00 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jlk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re: Discovery Schedule by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Landy, Robert)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 4/20/2021. (jr)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Discovery Conference by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails among counsel regarding privilege log and forthcoming productions) (Landy, Robert)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #38 and #39 Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice of Daniel L. Ravitz and Mahde Y. Abdallah as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/31/2021. (daf)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8241579) of Mahde Y. Abdallah by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Michigan Certificate of Good Standing) (Endicott, Samuel)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8241521) of Daniel L. Ravitz by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Michigan Certificate of Good Standing) (Endicott, Samuel)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/18/2021. (cmw)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Defendants Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation, and Edward Lambs Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/17/2021. (cmw)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: James D Curphey assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in April 2021, or within 60 days of this notice. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in April 2021. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 3/1/2021. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, all in-person mediations are postponed; however, the parties and mediators are DIRECTED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice #26 Motion to Compel: Defendants are ORDERED to produce a privilege log within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/8/2021. (ew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order [Request to so Order] by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Landy, Robert)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Landy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Landy, Robert)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION of Voluntary Partial Dismissal by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Landy, Robert)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (O'Shea, Kevin)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 1/11/2021. (jr)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTATION ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs Motion (Doc. #27 ), the Court sets a status conference for January 11, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852 to participate in the telephone conference. The conference access code is 3189690 and the security code is 0258. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/5/2021. (kk2)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Discovery Letter Request for Court Conference by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Landy, Robert)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Landy Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Graff, Douglas)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 24) is GRANTED. Discovery due 7/9/21. Dispositive Motions due 8/24/21. Primary Expert due 5/4/21. Rebuttal Expert due 6/25/20. Settlement demand due 4/23/21. Response to Settlement Demand due 5/14/21. The Court expects the parties to use video conferencing technology to complete depositions in this matter. Due to the length of the extension requested, the Court anticipates no further extension of these deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/14/2020. (KAJ)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Discovery via Letter Requesting a 120-day Extension of all Deadlines by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Landy, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (O'Shea, Kevin)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint) (Landy, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit D to Plaintiffs' Complaint) (Miller, E.)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/27/20. (jr)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION regarding Protective Order by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (O'Shea, Kevin)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Defendants' ANSWER to #8 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (O'Shea, Kevin)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF FIRST PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Case is referred to Mediation in April 2021. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 8/15/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 3/26/2020. Discovery due by 3/12/2021. Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 3/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/26/2021. Primary Expert due by 1/24/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/26/2021. Settlement Demand due by 12/26/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 1/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ESI Protocols) (ew)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2020. (jr)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin O'Shea and E. Powell Miller are GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/10/2020. (daf)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7371213) of E. Powell Miller by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for EPM, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for PHV Admission for EPM) (Endicott, Samuel)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7371177) of Kevin O'Shea by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for KFO, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for PHV Admission for KFO) (Endicott, Samuel)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ESI Production Specs) (Graff, Douglas)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert S. Landy and Anjula S. Prasad are GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/4/2020. (daf)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7357071) of Anjula S. Prasad by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Graff, Douglas)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7357056) of Robert s. Landy by Plaintiffs Akeela Bowens, Deron Lundy, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Rebecca McNeil, Amelia Powers, Chad Readout, Earlene Romine, Jessica Sheets, Brandi Wells, Edward Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Graff, Douglas)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 @ 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time: Answers due 3/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/11/2020. (ew)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Complaint, New date requested 3/16/2020. by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer) (Endicott, Samuel)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation, filed by Akeela Bowens, Earlene Romine, Amelia Powers, Jessica Sheets, Beth Macioce-Quinn, Chad Readout, Edward Wright, Rebecca McNeil, Deron Lundy, and Brandi Wells. (daf)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Edward Lamb answer due 2/14/2020; Mount Carmel Health System answer due 2/14/2020; Trinity Health Corporation answer due 2/14/2020. (daf)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation. (Asensio, Manuel)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation Certificate of Filing Notice to State Court of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal) (Asensio, Manuel)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Trinity Health Corporation. (Asensio, Manuel)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mount Carmel Health System. (Asensio, Manuel)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel E Endicott for Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation (Endicott, Samuel)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Jose Asensio, III for Defendants Edward Lamb, Mount Carmel Health System, Trinity Health Corporation (Asensio, Manuel)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV10094 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7286022), filed by Trinity Health Corporation, Mount Carmel Health System, Edward Lamb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Summons, #5 Exhibit C - State Court Filings) (Asensio, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil et al v. Trinity Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Wells
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Sheets
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Wright
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Powers
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akeela Bowens
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Macioce-Quinn
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca McNeil
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Readout
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deron Lundy
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlene Romine
Represented By: Douglas Eric Graff
Represented By: Robert S. Landy
Represented By: Anjula Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Health Corporation
Represented By: Samuel E Endicott
Represented By: Manuel Jose Asensio, III
Represented By: Kevin O'Shea
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mahde Youssef Abdallah
Represented By: Daniel L. Ravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lamb
Represented By: Samuel E Endicott
Represented By: Manuel Jose Asensio, III
Represented By: Kevin O'Shea
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mahde Youssef Abdallah
Represented By: Daniel L. Ravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Carmel Health System
Represented By: Samuel E Endicott
Represented By: Manuel Jose Asensio, III
Represented By: Kevin O'Shea
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mahde Youssef Abdallah
Represented By: Daniel L. Ravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?