RiverCity Properties, LLC et al v. The City of Belpre, Ohio et al
Plaintiff: RiverCity Properties, LLC and Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.
Defendant: Safety-Service Dir. Ronald D. Cross and The City of Belpre, Ohio
Not Classified By Court: Peter K Newman
Case Number: 2:2020cv00530
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (er)
February 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. (Ashrawi, Yazan)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint written REPORT detailing the status of this case ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 8, 2021, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/11/2021. (daf)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/18/2020. (agm)
September 18, 2020 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/21/2020. Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2021. (agm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed ORDER in re #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya) Modified text, terminated motion on 9/18/2020 (agm).
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/22/2021. Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines (also Filed by Plaintiffs) by Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. Withdrawl of Counsel (Chappelear, Stephen)
July 30, 2020 Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediation set for 9/2/2020 (agm)
June 22, 2020 NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Peter Newman assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (agm)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (cw)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2020. Motions to Amend due by 6/1/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 5/7/2020. Discovery due by 8/31/2020. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2020. Primary Expert due by 7/31/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/31/2020. Settlement Demand due by 5/1/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/15/2020. Mediation Deadline: 6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/23/2020. (daf)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley for all further proceedings. Judge George C. Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/23/20. (jcw)
April 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/23/2020. (agm)
April 22, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference RE-SET for 4/23/2020 at 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. **This is a time change only.** (agm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff RiverCity Properties, LLC. (Ashrawi, Yazan)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 10:00 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. **Please note that in light of the current COVID-19 pandemic, all conferences are being set as telephone conferences at this time. (agm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Beck, Gregory)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya J. Rogers for Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio (Rogers, Tonya)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Beck for Defendants Ronald D. Cross, The City of Belpre, Ohio (Beck, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The City of Belpre, Ohio. (mdr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Chappelear, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Exhibit 2 Ron Eddy Response Letter June 6, 2018 by Plaintiffs RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd. re #1 Complaint,(Chappelear, Stephen) Modified text on 1/31/2020 (mdr).
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.. (Chappelear, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff RiverCity Properties, LLC. (Chappelear, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs, filed by RiverCity Properties, LLC, Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Belpre Response Letter May 10, 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 Ron Eddy Response Letter June 6, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3 Morgan Erosion &Sediment Control Earth Moving Permit Application, #4 Exhibit 4 Stormwater Pollution Prevention Plan, #5 Exhibit 5 October correspondence and revised lot layout, #6 Exhibit 6 April letter with enclosure, #7 Exhibit 7 Building Permit Application, #8 Exhibit 8 Building Zoning Permit, #9 Exhibit 9 Cease and Desist Order, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chappelear, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $400. Receipt Number: 0648-7308320. (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RiverCity Properties, LLC et al v. The City of Belpre, Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RiverCity Properties, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Yazan S Ashrawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Eddy Builders, Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Yazan S Ashrawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Service Dir. Ronald D. Cross
Represented By: Gregory A Beck
Represented By: Tonya J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Belpre, Ohio
Represented By: Gregory A Beck
Represented By: Tonya J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter K Newman
Represented By: Peter Kevin Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?