Dhondt v. Ohio Rural Electric Cooperatives, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Dhondt
Defendant: Ohio Rural Electric Cooperatives, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01483
Filed: March 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: George C Smith
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Judge George C. Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/23/20. (jcw)
April 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ohio Rural Electric Cooperatives, Inc. answer due 5/22/2020. (mdr)
April 4, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ohio Rural Electric Cooperatives, Inc. Answer Due: 05/22/2020. (Young, Malcom) Modified text on 4/6/2020 (mdr).
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Plaintiff Michael Dhondt re #2 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint (Landry, Francis) Modified text on 3/23/2020 (mdr).
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Dhondt re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of EEOC Charge) (Landry, Francis) Modified text on 3/23/2020 (mdr).
March 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ohio Rural Electric Cooperatives, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7390422), filed by Michael Dhondt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dhondt v. Ohio Rural Electric Cooperatives, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dhondt
Represented By: Francis J. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Rural Electric Cooperatives, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?