McKay v. Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John McKay
Defendant: Ronald Davies and Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01584
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
2 Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 This entry is being generated allowing defense counsel to file exhibits under seal. See doc #13 pg 2 of 3 granting motion #10 . (er)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 This entry is being generated for the purpose for defense counsel to file exhibits Under Seal. (er)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc. re #10 MOTION to File Document Under Seal Defendants' Notice of Filing Exhibits Under Seal (Williams, Leigh)
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc. re #13 Order, NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Williams, Leigh)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - re #10 File Document Under Seal, filed by Ronald Davies, Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc., #4 Motion to Seal Document filed by John McKay. The Court GRANTS Defendants seven days in which to submit a supplemental memorandum demonstrating that redacting or sealing the Complaint is appropriate here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/12/20. (jr)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc., Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc. for Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc... (Williams, Leigh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2020 @ 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL by Defendants Ronald Davies, Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Williams, Leigh) Modified event type on 5/6/2020 (daf). Modified on 5/22/2020 (er).
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 1 Complaint Defendants brief in support of sealing Plaintiffs complaint filed by Defendants Ronald Davies, Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employee NDA - Authorization to Deduct) (Williams, Leigh)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus for all further proceedings. Judge George C. Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/23/20. (jcw)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John McKay. (Rosca, Alan)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to temporarily seal the Complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendants 14 days in which to file a brief and any evidentiary materials supporting their contention that the Complaint should be sealed permanently because it discloses the identities of their third-party vendors. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/21/2020. (ew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF re #4 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 1 Complaint by Plaintiff John McKay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rosca, Alan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 1 Complaint by Plaintiff John McKay. (Rosca, Alan)
April 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ronald Davies answer due 6/1/2020. Reset Answer date per the Waiver of Summons filed as Document No. #2 . (mdr)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc. on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Rosca, Alan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ronald Davies on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Rosca, Alan) Modified text to correct answer due date on 4/13/2020 (mdr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKay v. Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Davies
Represented By: Leigh Anne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Auto Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh Anne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McKay
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?