Shivers v. Buds, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Shivers
Defendant: Buds, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02808
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/7/2020. (cmw)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The July 10, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2020. Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 5/17/2021. Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2021. Primary Expert due by 3/29/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 5/3/2021. Settlement Demand due by 8/3/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/7/2020. Mediation Deadline: 3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/2/2020. (daf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Amy Shivers. (Probst, Erica)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2020 03:00 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Loughry for Defendant Buds, Inc. (Loughry, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Buds, Inc.. (Pollock, Stacy)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Buds, Inc.. The defendant was served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (daf)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (daf)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Buds, Inc.. (daf)
June 2, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7487599 (daf)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Buds, Inc., filed by Amy Shivers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Probst, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shivers v. Buds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buds, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Loughry
Represented By: Stacy Virginia Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Shivers
Represented By: Erica Ann Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?