Bradley v. Collabera, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MARK BRADLEY
Defendant: DEAN PEIFFER, COLLABERA, INC. and NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2020cv02986
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
July 20, 2020 Reset deadlines pursuant to #8 as to Nationwide Insurance Company of America and Dean Peiffer: Answers due 8/17/2020. (ew)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION 21-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE OR PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Defendants Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Dean Peiffer. (Kathumbi, Lisa)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Dean Peiffer. Served on 7/7/2020. Answer due 7/28/2020. (ew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Collabera, Inc. and Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Served on 7/6/2020. Answers due 7/27/2020. (ew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: The complaint and issued summons were sent by certified mail to Defendants. (ew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to unidentified party on 6/11/2020. (Breedlove, Trisha) Modified text on 7/2/2020 (ew).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/12/2020. (ew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Collabera, Inc.; Nationwide Insurance Company of America; and Dean Peiffer. (ew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7505821), filed by MARK BRADLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Civil Summons x 3) (Breedlove, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Collabera, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN PEIFFER
Represented By: Lisa Kathumbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLABERA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lisa Kathumbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK BRADLEY
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?