Broyles v. Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Marsha Broyles
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv03577
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 For good cause shown, Defendants first unopposed Motion for Extension (Doc. 8) is GRANTED, and Defendant shall have until November 13, 2020, to file the administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/11/2020. (KAJ)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/13/2020. by Defendant Commissioner for Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Baltz, Shefali)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Baltz for Defendant Commissioner for Social Security Administration (Baltz, Shefali)
July 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security Administration answer due 9/15/2020 (kk2)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Certified administrative record due sixty (60) days after filing of the Complaint and SS Identification Form; Plaintiff's statement of errors due forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record; Defendant's response in opposition due forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors; Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/17/2020. (kk2)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kimberly A. Jolson. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (cw)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Margolius, Marcia)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marsha Broyles. (Margolius, Marcia)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner for Social Security Administration, filed by Marsha Broyles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Margolius, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broyles v. Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security Administration
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Shefali Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Broyles
Represented By: Marcia W Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?