Clary et al v. Zimmer Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Clary and Karen J. Clary
Defendant: Biomet, Inc., Adena Health System, Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. and Doe Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 2:2020cv03583
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2020 is VACATED. Case is referred to Mediation in October 2021. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 9/30/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 9/9/2020. Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 9/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/18/2021. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 6/9/2021. Defendant Primary Expert due by 7/21/2021. Settlement Demand due by 3/22/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 4/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/17/2020. (ew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendants Biomet, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. Rule 26(f) Report. (Edwards, Ryan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PARTIES by Defendants Biomet, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Edwards, Ryan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Partial Dismissal as to Adena Health System originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 6/18/2020 by Plaintiffs Karen J. Clary and Douglas Clary. (ew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2020 @ 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Complaint filed in the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 01/15/20 in Case No. 19CV009925 filed by Biomet, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (mdr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed in the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 12/20/19 in Case No. 19CV009925 filed by Adena Health System. (mdr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Adena Health System, Biomet, Inc., Doe Corporations 1-10, Zimmer Biomet, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc filed in the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 12/12/2019 as Case No. 19CV009925 filed by Karen J. Clary, Douglas Clary. (mdr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (Edwards, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Biomet, Inc., LVB Acquisition, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LVB Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for Biomet, Inc... (Edwards, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. for Zimmer, Inc... (Edwards, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendants Biomet, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Removal to Adverse Party (Edwards, Ryan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-cv-9925 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7558586), filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Biomet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Answer of Defendant Adena Health System, #5 Exhibit C - Answer of Zimmer Biomet Defendants, #6 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Adena Health System, #7 Exhibit E - Summonses and additional State Court Records, #8 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Edwards, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clary et al v. Zimmer Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Rachel Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adena Health System
Represented By: Sabrina Sue Sellers
Represented By: Brant E Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Rachel Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Rachel Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Rachel Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Rachel Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Clary
Represented By: Thomas Day Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen J. Clary
Represented By: Thomas Day Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?