Harper Holdings, LLC v. Shikhman
Plaintiff: Harper Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Sara Shikhman
Case Number: 2:2020cv03603
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Plaintiff Harper Holdings, LLC. (Wolinetz, Barry) Modified text on 9/10/2020 (kk2)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The August 26, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2021. Motions to Amend due by 3/31/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 9/9/2020. Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2022. Primary Expert due by 7/30/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 9/30/2021. Settlement Demand due by 7/30/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/30/2021. Mediation Deadline: 10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/21/2020. (daf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Harper Holdings, LLC. (Wolinetz, Barry)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sara Shikhman. (Arnold, James)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2020 01:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
July 20, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Sara Shikhman answer due 7/24/2020. (mdr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Sara Shikhman in the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 06/12/2020 as Case No. 20CV003801 filed by Harper Holdings, LLC. (mdr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20CV003801 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7560102), filed by Sara Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Request for Svc on Defendant, #6 Exhibit D - Proof of Svc issued, #7 Exhibit E - Proof of Svc complete, #8 Exhibit F - State Ct Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Arnold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper Holdings, LLC v. Shikhman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Shikhman
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Represented By: Gerhardt A Gosnell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harper Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Barry Howard Wolinetz
Represented By: Adam C Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?