Cook v. Warden Noble Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Michael L. Cook
Respondent: Warden Noble Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2020cv03639
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 8/13/2020. (tb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This action is DISMISSED for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation. The Court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 8/13/2020. (tb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge GRANTS #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/24/2020. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael L. Cook. (ew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Michael L. Cook. (Attachments: #1 2254 petition, #2 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Warden Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?