Dunn v. Burris et al
Plaintiff: Claudine Dunn
Defendant: Officer David Burris and Officer Wesley Jackson
Case Number: 2:2020cv03642
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Beck, Gregory)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Beck for Defendants David Burris, Wesley Jackson (Beck, Gregory)
August 14, 2020 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waivers sent to David Burris & Wesley Jackson on 7/27/2020, answers due 9/25/2020.SEE DOCKET #2 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to enter the service and answer due dates for the parties served. (kk2)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 **SEE 8/14/2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY** - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Rettig, Madeline) Modified on 8/17/2020 (kk2)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7561601), filed by Claudine Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rettig, Madeline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Burris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer David Burris
Represented By: Gregory A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wesley Jackson
Represented By: Gregory A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudine Dunn
Represented By: Madeline Jean Rettig
Represented By: Helen M. Robinson
Represented By: Samuel Micah Schlein
Represented By: Edward Reilley Forman
Represented By: Louis Abraham Jacobs
Represented By: John Spenceley Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?