Subramanya v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Ranjitha Subramanya, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Rene Kejang Ngenkeng and Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ken Cuccinelli and Ernest Destefano
Case Number: 2:2020cv03707
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Report Pursuant to Consent Order (ECF No. 55), 09/09/2020 by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Yates, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 NOTICE : The PPTC set for 9/1/2020 at 11:00 AM is VACATED. (sln)
August 21, 2020 Filing 56 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Report Pursuant to Consent Order (ECF No. 55), 08/21/2020 by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Yates, Christopher)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/21/2020. (cw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services re #53 Status Report, Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Consent Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Consent Order) (Yates, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 53 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report RE: Parties' Proposed Consent Order, Pursuant to Notation Order ECF No. 51, to file Notice of/Proposed Consent Order 8-20-2020 by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Yates, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez (Gentry, Caroline)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTATION ORDER : Joint Status Report regarding status, but not substance of settlement negotiations due by 8/18/2020. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/13/2020. (sln)
August 13, 2020 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Continued mediation held on 8/13/2020. Parties continuing to mediate. (sln)
August 12, 2020 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Settlement Conference held on 8/12/2020. Negotiations not at impasse. Parties continue to confer. (sln)
August 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 8/11/2020. (sln)
August 11, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 8/12/2020 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
August 10, 2020 Filing 47 CONSENT to Mediation by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Yates, Christopher)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER granting #45 Motion to Continue; Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 8/24/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/6/2020. (cw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Associated Deadlines by Plaintiffs Rene Kejang Ngenkeng, Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya. (Gentry, Caroline)
August 4, 2020 Filing 44 Transcript of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on July 29, 2020, before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawna J. Evans, Telephone number 614-719-3316. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.

< For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 8/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2020. (Evans, Shawna)

August 4, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana P. Crawford for Plaintiffs Rene Kejang Ngenkeng, Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya (Crawford, Ana)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Setting Virtual Hearing on Motion #34 Mandatory Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2020 09:30 AM in Virtual Courtroom 331 - Columbus before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley United States: +1 (646) 749-3112; Access Code: 347-407-869; and DENYING #35 Defendants Motion to Dismiss. GRANTING #2 #34 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/3/2020. (cw)
August 3, 2020 Filing 41 REDACTED Version of 17 Amended Complaint. (sln)
July 31, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Rene Kejang Ngenkeng, Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT - REDACTED) (Gentry, Caroline)
July 29, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
July 29, 2020 Filing 38 Emergency MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Rene Kejang Ngenkeng, Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya. (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya, Rene Kejang Ngenkeng /Notice of Adding Rene Kejang Ngenkeng as a Plaintiff and Class Representative (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Rene Kejang Ngenkeng (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND WRIT OF MANDAMUS, AND OBJECTION TO CERTIFICATION AS A CLASS ACTION (ECF NOS. 1, 2, 5, 17, and 34) by Defendants Ken Cuccinelli, Ernest Destefano, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Goodwin, USCIS/DHS Decl., #2 Affidavit Troy, NBC/USCIS/DHS Decl.) (Yates, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 34 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Mandatory Injunction by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya. (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Kebin Antonio Palma Sanchez (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Lucrecia Rosa Ramos (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Michael Propper, Director, Chess NYC (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Tania Patricia Carcamo Oseguera (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Swetha Muralidhara (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Richard Patrick McNulty (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Ching-Min Lin (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Meng Huan Lee (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Syeda Fareeza Karimushan (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Mohsen Haghighatpour (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Abraham Blay Gayetaye (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Nicolas Joseph Bell Fabregat (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Sirelene Moura Da Costa; Norberto Bernardes Da Fonseca; and Samuel Moura Fonseca (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Yoan Martinez Ayala (Gentry, Caroline)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Lucrecia Rosa Ramos, Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez, Kebin Palma Sanchez, Ranjitha Subramanya /Declaration of Wajdi M. Ammarah (Gentry, Caroline)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten R. Fraser for Plaintiff Ranjitha Subramanya (Fraser, Kirsten)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiff Ranjitha Subramanya /Civil Cover Sheet (Gentry, Caroline)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ernest Destefano. (jlk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Ken Cuccinelli. (jlk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jlk) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/24/2020) (jlk).
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Yates for Defendants Ken Cuccinelli, Ernest Destefano, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Yates, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting 65.1 Virtual Conference on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2020 03:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 07/23/2020. (cw)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Gentry for Plaintiff Ranjitha Subramanya (Gentry, Caroline)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Cohen, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Cohen, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Cohen, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Andrea La Manna in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ranjitha Subramanya. (Cohen, Robert) Modified text and termed motion on 7/23/2020 (jlk).
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Catherine Kang in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ranjitha Subramanya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Cohen, Robert) Modified text and termed Motion on 7/23/2020 (jlk).
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Ranijitha Subramanya re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ranjitha Subramanya. (Cohen, Robert) Modified text and termed Motion on 7/23/2020 (jlk).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ranjitha Subramanya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Cohen, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ranjitha Subramanya ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7568329), filed by Ranjitha Subramanya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Cohen, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subramanya v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Destefano
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranjitha Subramanya
Represented By: Robert Howard Cohen
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Represented By: David P Shouvlin
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Ana P. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kebin Palma Sanchez
Represented By: Robert Howard Cohen
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Represented By: David P Shouvlin
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Ana P. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucrecia Rosa Ramos
Represented By: Robert Howard Cohen
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Represented By: David P Shouvlin
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Ana P. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Kejang Ngenkeng
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Represented By: Ana P. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Francisco Rodriguez Martinez
Represented By: Robert Howard Cohen
Represented By: Caroline Gentry
Represented By: David P Shouvlin
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Ana P. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?