Owens v. FirstEnergy Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Diane Owens and CalPERS
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor, Charles E. Jones, Steven E. Strah, FirstEnergy Corp., James F. Pearson, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, PNC Capital Markets LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Michael Dowling, Santander Investment Securities, Steven J. Demetriou, TD Securities (USA) LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Jerry Sue Thornton, Jason Lisowski, Barclays Capital Inc., Christopher D. Pappas, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., John Judge, Dennis Chack, Donald T. Misheff, George Smart, Robert Reffner, Julia Johnson, Leila Vespoli, Morgan Stanley & Co, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Michael J. Anderson, BoFa Securities, Inc., Leslie Turner, Thomas N Mitchell, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Luis A. Reyes, Sandra Pianalto, James F. O'Neil, III, CIBC World Markets Corp., Donald Schneider, donald misheff, Paul T. Addison, Ty Pine and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Petitioner: IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS, The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, James J Durrett, Jr. and State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio
Interested Party: Partners for Progress Inc., MFS Heritage Trust Company, MFS Investment Management Company (LUX), S.a.r.l, MFS Meridian Funds, MFS Series Trust I, MFS Series Trust IV, MFS Series Trust V, MFS Series Trust VI, MFS Series Trust X, MFS Series Trust XI, MFS Series Trust XV, MFS Variable Insurance Trust, MFS Variable Insurance Trust II, MFS Variable Insurance Trust III, Brighthouse Funds - MFS Total Return Portfolio and Brighthouse Funds II - MFS Value Portfolio
Case Number: 2:2020cv03785
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTATION ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Jason R. Meltzer, Jason J. Mendro, and William S. Scherman as counsel for Defendant Charles E. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/26/23. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jason J. Mendro, Jason R. Meltzer, and William S. Scherman) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Mendro, Jason)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER denying (402) Motion to Amend Scheduling Order in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Non-Party Partners for Progress Inc is ORDERED to provide a privilege log to Plaintiffs and Dowling by 1/23/2023. After the log is produced, the parties are further ORDERED to confer diligently to identify and narrow any disputes on the claims of privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/17/2023. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 402 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph) Modified filing event for statistical purposes on 1/17/2023 (kk2)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re (143 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress filed by Interested Party Partners for Progress Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 12/14/22 Email from J. Favret, #2 Exhibit B 12/15/22 Letter from M. Chiricosta, #3 Exhibit C 12/16/22 Letter from D. Mitchell, #4 Exhibit D 12/21/22 Letter from M Chiricosta, #5 Exhibit E Email Chain Among Counsel for Plaintiffs and PFP, #6 Exhibit F 5/18/22 Letter from F. Berckmueller, #7 Exhibit G 6/6/22 Letter from F. Berckmueller, #8 Exhibit H FirstEnergys Deferred Prosecution Agreement) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Chiricosta, Matthew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re (143 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 350 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress [Redacted] filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 [Placeholder], #7 Exhibit 6) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER overruling(388)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; overruling(163)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. PFPs request therein to stay the Magistrate Judges Order pending resolution of their Objection is thus DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/10/2023. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (cw)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER re (397 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Status Report: No active disputes were raised, so the Court VACATES the hearing set for 1/12/2023 @ 11:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/10/2023. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 397 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Status Report by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER: The Court VACATES the hearing set for December 22, 2022, at 11:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/20/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (tla)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Status Report by Defendant Michael Dowling. (Favret, John)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTATION ORDER granting (391) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Entered for statistical purposes. See #393 for document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/19/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER: re #387 IEU-Ohio seeks an extension of time to comply with the Court's production deadline and proposes a schedule for production to which Jones has agreed. For good cause shown, the extension is GRANTED and the Court ADOPTS the joint proposed schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/19/2022. (vb)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 RESPONSE to Motion re (388 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 163 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (378 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant Michael Dowling, Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association re (154 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class: Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 331 - Columbus before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/8/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (cw)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (378 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order on Motion to Compel, ( Responses due by 12/27/2022) by Interested Party Partners for Progress Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12.13.18 Email from D. McCarthy, #2 Exhibit B - Partners for Progress's Privilege Log) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Chiricosta, Matthew)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER vacating the hearing set for 12/1/2022 at 11:00am. The Court ORDERS that McNees and IEU-Ohio complete (1) the collection and transfer of all agreed-upon document sources and (2) the production of responsive hard copy documents by December 21, 2022. Jones and IEU-Ohio are ORDERED to submit a joint status report by December 14, 2022, briefly describing the progress of production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/29/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/14/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Response re (371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Defendants Charles Jones and Michael Dowling's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Objection to ECF No. 368 by Defendants Michael Dowling, Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert G. Lin, #2 Exhibit 1 - Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Response re #371 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Defendants Dennis Chack, John Judge, James Pearson, Ty Pine, Robert Reffner, Donald Schneider, and Leila Vespoli's Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to ECF No. 368 by Defendant Ty Pine. (Mitchell, John)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 RESPONSE in Opposition re (154 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER overruling #360 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order. Class Plaintiffs request therein to stay the Aggregation Order pending resolution of their Objection is thus DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/21/2022. (cw)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER denying #379 MOTION to Strike #377 Reply to Response to Motion, #380 MOTION for Leave to File Instanter Reply in Support of Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Aggregation Order and Request to Stay Nunc Pro Tunc; granting #380 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/21/2022. (cw)
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MOTION for Leave to File Instanter Reply in Support of Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Aggregation Order and Request to Stay Nunc Pro Tunc by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Murray, Joseph)
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 MOTION to Strike #377 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Dennis Chack, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Steven J. Demetriou, Michael Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Julia Johnson, Charles E. Jones, John Judge, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Jason Lisowski, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, James F. O'Neil, III, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Ty Pine, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Donald Schneider, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., George Smart, Steven E. Strah, TD Securities (USA) LLC, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Leila Vespoli. (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (350) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; (143) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/18/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 REPLY to Response to Motion re (154 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings [Class Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Objection to the Magistrate Judges Aggregation Order and Request to Stay] filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting (375) Motion for Leave to File in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/16/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (cw)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MOTION for Leave to File Instanter Their Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Objection to Judge Jolson's October 18, 2022 Order and Request to Stay by Interested Parties MFS Heritage Trust Company, MFS Investment Management Company (LUX), S.a.r.l, MFS Meridian Funds, MFS Series Trust I, MFS Series Trust IV, MFS Series Trust V, MFS Series Trust VI, MFS Series Trust X, MFS Series Trust XI, MFS Series Trust XV, MFS Variable Insurance Trust, MFS Variable Insurance Trust II, MFS Variable Insurance Trust III, Brighthouse Funds - MFS Total Return Portfolio, Brighthouse Funds II - MFS Value Portfolio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Objection, #2 Exhibit A-1, Declaration of Michael Miarmi) (Woods, Nicole)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 RESPONSE in Opposition re #360 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (355 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order,, Class Plaintiffs Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Aggregation Order and Request to Stay Pending Resolution of Class Plaintiffs' Objection filed by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Dennis Chack, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Steven J. Demetriou, Michael Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Julia Johnson, Charles E. Jones, John Judge, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Jason Lisowski, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, James F. O'Neil, III, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Ty Pine, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Donald Schneider, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., George Smart, Steven E. Strah, TD Securities (USA) LLC, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Leila Vespoli. (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Response re (352 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Notice (Other), Nonspeaking Defendants Michael Dowling, Dennis Chack, and Ty Pine's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Ty Pine. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mitchell, John)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #370 Second Unopposed Joint Motion and Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule and Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/11/2023. Dispositive motions due by 3/13/2024. Primary Expert due by 9/12/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/9/2023. Reply expert reportsdue 12/13/2023. Expert discovery cutoff due 2/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/10/2022. (er)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ( Responses due by 12/1/2022) by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sept. 28, 2022 email from Marjorie Duffy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Oct. 10, 2022 email from Jeremy Dunnaback, #4 Exhibit 3 - Oct. 12, 2022 email chain from Andrew C. Johnson, #5 Exhibit 4 - Oct. 24, 2022 email chain from Albert G. Lin, #6 Exhibit 5 - Nov. 2, 2022 email chain from Jason Forge, #7 Exhibit 6 - Nov. 9, 2022 email chain from Paul Helms, #8 Exhibit 7 - Nov. 9, 2022 email from Marjorie Duffy) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 STIPULATION and Second Unopposed Joint Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule and Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Response re #352 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Julia Johnson, Charles E. Jones, John Judge, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Jason Lisowski, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, James F. O'Neil, III, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Donald Schneider, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., George Smart, Steven E. Strah, TD Securities (USA) LLC, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER vacating the hearing set for November 10, 2022 @ 11:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/9/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE Emily M. Rector as counsel for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, and Leslie Turner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/8/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 STATUS REPORT by Class Plaintiffs and Defendants by Defendant Ty Pine. (Attachments: #1 Class Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1 - 9-28-22 e-mail, #2 Class Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2 - 10-10-22 e-mail, #3 Class Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3 10-11-22 e-mail, #4 Class Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4 10-24-22 e-mail, #5 Class Plaintiffs' Exhibit 5 11-2-22 e-mail) (Mitchell, John)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 REPLY to Response to Motion re (143 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress filed by Defendant Michael Dowling, Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Shalini Beth Goyal for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner (Goyal, Shalini)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Benshoff for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner (Benshoff, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine T. Berger for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner (Berger, Katherine)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Emily M. Rector) by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Rector, Emily)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (355 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order,, Class Plaintiffs Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Aggregation Order and Request to Stay Pending Resolution of Class Plaintiffs' Objection ( Responses due by 11/22/2022) by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 - Appendix A, #4 Exhibit 2 - Oct. 26, 2022 J. Murray Email, #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Class Plaintiffs' Request to Stay Aggregation Order Pending Resolution of Class Plaintiffs Objection, #6 Text of Proposed Order Sustaining Class Plaintiffs' Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Aggregation Order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RESPONSE in Opposition re #350 Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress filed by Interested Party Partners for Progress Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 9/22/22 Order in LifeBio, Inc. v. Eva Garland Consulting, LLC, S.D. Ohio No. 2:21-cv-722, #2 Exhibit B - 6/28/22 Email, #3 Exhibit C - 7/28/22 Email) (Chiricosta, Matthew)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER re (355) in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ: If class counsel seeks resolution of the present discovery dispute, they may avail themselves of the procedure adopted in this matter for dealing with discovery disputes (Doc. 309 at 1). The Court will not depart from that procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/27/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER : The Court understands McNees's sensitivity about the use of client information. But now, to clarify McNees's obligation and provide clear support for disclosure under Ohio Rule of Professional Conduct 1.6(b)(6), the Court ORDERS McNees to include the.pst files of the document custodians1 in the initial search of files and resulting hit report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/26/2022. (vb)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Unknown McNees Wallace & Nurick. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Schneider, Karl)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER: Re #354 Only one active dispute was raised in the report. The Court now resolves the dispute and VACATES the hearing set for October 20, 2022, at 11:00am. Having considered the parties' competing proposals, and in the interest of justice and efficiency, the Court ORDERS as follows: The Court will allow up to eighteen hours for each fact deposition, divided evenly between Plaintiffs and Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/18/2022. (vb) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/18/2022.
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, Defendants, and Non-Party Opt-Out Plaintiffs by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Defendants' Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit - Opt-Out Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Matthew Pritchard, or another McNees representative, is ORDERED to submit legal support for its position within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Failure to do so will result in an order requiring McNees to comply with IEU-Ohio's request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/14/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association re (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress ( Responses due by 10/27/2022) by Defendant Michael Dowling, Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex.1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11, #13 Exhibit Ex. 12, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13, #15 Exhibit Ex. 14, #16 Exhibit Ex. 15, #17 Exhibit Ex. 16, #18 Exhibit Ex. 17, #19 Exhibit Ex. 18, #20 Exhibit Ex. 19, #21 Exhibit Ex. 20, #22 Exhibit Ex. 21, #23 Exhibit Ex. 22, #24 Exhibit Ex. 23, #25 Exhibit Ex. 24, #26 Exhibit Ex. 25, #27 Exhibit Ex. 26, #28 Exhibit Ex. 27) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER - Jones and IEU-Ohio are ORDERED to submit a joint status report within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, in which, if there is still disagreement, each side should propose alternatives to allow for the immediate progress of discovery. Given that the parties are being allotted additional time to confer, the telephonic status conference set for October 6, 2022 is VACATED. The Court appreciates that the parties seek clarity on their disputes and will consider setting an in-person hearing to quickly rule on their disputes, if judicial resolution is necessary after the submission of the joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/4/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Meet-and-Confer Tracking Chart) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTATION ORDER granting (345) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shanaye Y. Carvajal in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on September 30, 2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jlk)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 REPLY to Response to Motion re (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Class Certification] filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hillary B. Stakem in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit H - Expert Rebuttal Report of Cynthia L. Jones, CFA, #3 Exhibit I - Expert Rebuttal Report of W. Scott Dalrymple, CFA, #4 Exhibit J - FE_CIV_SEC_0588238-45, #5 Exhibit K - FE_CIV_SEC_0588232-37, #6 Exhibit L - Brad Duff Depo Tr., #7 Exhibit M - Eleanor Innes Depo Tr., #8 Exhibit N - Esmeralda del Bosque Depo Tr., #9 Exhibit O - John Schmitt Depo Tr., #10 Exhibit P - Jennifer Marietta-Westberg, Ph.D. Depo Tr., #11 Text of Proposed Order [Revised Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9068240) of Shanaye Y. Carajal by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Shanaye Carvajal) (Bloomfield, David)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER - The in-person discovery hearing set for 9/29/22 is VACATED. Defendant Jones and third-party IEU-Ohio are ORDERED to submit a joint status report on or before October 3, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of their dispute. If the parties have not reached agreement regarding the subpoena production, the Court will hold a telephonic status conference with the disputing parties, on October 6, 2022, at 11:00am, in order to set a briefing schedule on the dispute. Counsel for the disputing parties shall call 1-888-684-8852 to participate in the telephone conference. The conference access code is 3189690 and the security code is 3785. No other party is required to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/27/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTATION ORDER: The parties came before the Court to discuss a briefing schedule for the dispute outlined in their recent status report (Doc. #337 ). The Court SETS the schedule as follows: Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling must file their Motions to Compel by 10/6/2022; Partners for Progress shall file one response to both motions within twenty-one (21) days of both motions being filed; Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling shall have ten (10) days to reply thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/26/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Status Report by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 9/26/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Update to Substantial Completion of Document Production by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re #293 MOTION to Certify Class (unredacted version of ECF 327) filed by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Julia Johnson, Charles E. Jones, John Judge, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Jason Lisowski, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, James F. O'Neil, III, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Luis A. Reyes, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Donald Schneider, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., George Smart, Steven E. Strah, TD Securities (USA) LLC, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts, #2 Exhibit A - 7.12.22 Email, #3 Exhibit B - Dalrymple Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit C - Jones Deposition Transcript (with redaction), #5 Exhibit D - Dr. Marietta-Westberg Expert Report, #6 Exhibit E - LACERA Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit F - Wisconsin Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit G - Irving Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit H - Amalgamated Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit I - 7.19.22 Email) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTATION ORDER: Based on the Joint Status Report (Doc. #337 ), the Court SETS a telephonic status conference for 9/26/2022 at 1:00pm, at which the Court will set a briefing schedule for the dispute outlined by Lead Plaintiff, Defendant Dowling, and Partners for Progress. Counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. The conference access code is 3189690 and the security code is 3785. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/22/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, Defendant Michael J. Dowling, and Third-Party Partners for Progress by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #334 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samantha L. Fenton as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 09/09/2022. (tla)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER - Based on the Joint Status Report (Doc. #335 ), the Court does not find that an in-person status conference is immediately necessary, and VACATES the status conference set for September 8, 2022, at 11:00am. Lead Plaintiff, Defendant Dowling, and Partners for Progress are ORDERED to submit a joint status report on or before September 21, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of their dispute. If at that time, the parties have not reached agreement as to supplementation of the privilege log, the Court will hold a telephonic status conference to set a briefing schedule as to the threshold issue of creating a privilege log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/7/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9030145) of Samantha L. Fenton by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing) (Fairweather, John)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 8/22/2022. (jr)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 OPINION AND ORDER granting (319) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (122) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. is ORDERED to make available one or more corporate representatives for a second Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, for which Jones and Dowling may have the seven (7) hours for questioning contemplated by the Rule. Additionally, FirstEnergy is ORDERED to pay Jones' and Dowling's reasonable costs and expenses associated with attending the second deposition, including court reporter costs, as well as Jones' and Dowling's reasonable attorney's fees associated with preparing the instant motion. The parties are ORDERED to appear before the Court for an in-person status conference on Thursday, September 8, 2022, at 11:00am in Courtroom 203. A joint status report on the progress of discovery will be due on Tuesday, September 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/19/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2) Modified on 8/22/2022 to correct date for status report (jr).
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2022. Status Conference set for 9/8/2022 @ 11:00am in Courtroom 203 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 RESPONSE to Motion re #293 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants Robert Reffner, Leila Vespoli. (Fairweather, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE by Defendant Ty Pine of Joinder in Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF Nos. 327 and 328) (Mitchell, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE by Defendant Dennis Chack Of Joinder In FirstEnergy Corp., et. al.'s (ECF Doc. #327) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE by Defendant Michael Dowling Of Joinder In FirstEnergy Corp., et. al.'s (ECF Doc. #327) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSE in Opposition re (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class by Nonspeaking Defendants Michael Dowling, Dennis Chack, and Ty Pine filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 RESPONSE in Opposition re #293 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Julia Johnson, Charles E. Jones, John Judge, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Jason Lisowski, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, James F. O'Neil, III, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Luis A. Reyes, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Donald Schneider, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., George Smart, Steven E. Strah, TD Securities (USA) LLC, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts, #2 Exhibit A - 7.12.22 Email, #3 Exhibit B - Dalrymple Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit C - Jones Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit D - Dr. Marietta-Westberg Expert Report, #6 Exhibit E - LACERA Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit F - - Wisconsin Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit G - Irving Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit H - Amalgamated Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit I - 7.19.22 Email) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE Zheng (Jane) He as counsel for Defendant Leila Vespoli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/17/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Zheng (Jane) He] by Defendant Leila Vespoli. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (He, Jane)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER: The parties represent that they have reached an impasse regarding designation of documents and testimony under the protective order. They are ORDERED to submit letter briefs on their relative positions, not to exceed 3 single-spaced pages, by email to jolson_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov on or before 8/18/2022. Additionally, the Court sets a Telephone Status Conference for 8/22/2022 @ 10:30am before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/12/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 REPLY to Response to Motion re (319 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 122 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Compel Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of FirstEnergy filed by Defendants Michael Dowling, Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Update to Substantial Completion of Document Production by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Duffy, Marjorie)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 RESPONSE in Opposition re #319 MOTION to Compel Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of FirstEnergy filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Duffy, Marjorie)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MOTION to Compel Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of FirstEnergy ( Responses due by 7/29/2022) by Defendants Michael Dowling, Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - FirstEnergy Script, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - FirstEnergy Responses and Objections to Deposition Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - 5-3-22 Meet and Confer Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 6 - 5-3-22 Meet and Confer Topic Chart, #8 Exhibit 7 - 5-9-22 Meet and Confer Correspondence, #9 Exhibit 8 - 6-29-22 Meet and Confer Email Correspondence, #10 Exhibit 9 - 6-29-22 Meet and Confer Correspondence, #11 Exhibit 10 - JD Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 11 - JD Exhibit 25) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting (317) Joint Motion and Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Lead Plaintiff's motion to compel due by 11/22/2022 - First Energy's response due by 12/16/2022 - Lead Plaintiff's reply due by 12/23/2022; Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2023; Primary Expert due by 8/1/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 9/28/2023; Reply Expert due by 11/1/2023; Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2024; Status Report re: privilege dispute due by 11/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/22/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery (Expert) due by 12/15/2023; Discovery (Fact) due by 6/30/2023; Primary Expert due by 8/1/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 9/28/2023; Status Report due by 11/14/2022; Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2024; Motions to Compel due by 11/22/2022 - Responses due by 12/16/2022 - Replies due by 12/23/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATION and Unopposed Joint Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule and Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey) Modified filing event for statistical purposes on 7/22/2022 (kk2)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTATION ORDER granting #315 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karen Pieslak Pohlmann as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 20, 2022. (jlk)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number BOHSDC-8958643) of Karen Pieslak Pohlmann by Defendant Dennis Chack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mansfield, Douglas)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER regarding discovery disputes: Jones and Dowling's Motion to Compel due by July 22, 2022; FirstEnergy's response in opposition due by July 29, 2022; Jones and Dowling's reply due by August 3, 2022. Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Compel due by July 22, 2022; FirstEnergy's response in opposition due by July 29, 2022; Lead Plaintiff's reply due by August 3, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/15/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Ryan Harmanis for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner (Harmanis, M.)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Mae Rector for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner (Rector, Emily)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/7/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS RELATING TO PROTOCOL FOR UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER RE: PROTOCOL FOR FACT DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #308 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Hutton as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 07/06/2022. (tla)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8940587) of Andrew W. Hutton by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murray, Joseph)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 STIPULATION and proposed order between Plaintiffs and Underwriting Defendants Relating to Protocol for Underwriting Defendants' Production of Documents and ESI by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Bloomfield, David)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION Fact Deposition Protocol [Joint Motion for Fact Deposition Protocol] by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lin, Albert)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTATION ORDER granting #304 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily S. Kimmelman as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 1, 2022. (jlk)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8936784) of Emily S. Kimmelman by Defendant Dennis Chack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mansfield, Douglas)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #302 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. Defendants shall file their Response in opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification on or before 8/17/2022. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply in support of their Motion for Class Certification on or before 9/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/29/22. (jr)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Duffy, Marjorie)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTATION ORDER granting #299 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonah H. Golstein, John M. Kelley, Christopher T. Gilroy, Rachel A. Cocalis and Francis P. Karam. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/21/22. (ds)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8915307) of Jonah H. Goldstein, Rachel A. Cocalis, John M. Kelley, Francis P. Karam, and Christopher T. Gilroy by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Goldstein, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Cocalis, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Kelley, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Karam, #5 Certificate of Good Standing - Gilroy) (Murray, Joseph)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTATION ORDER granting (296) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yiqing Shi as co-counsel; granting (297) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew C. Johnson as co-counsel in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (113) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yiqing Shi as co-counsel; granting (114) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew C. Johnson as co-counsel in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on June 16, 2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jlk)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8910668) of Andrew C. Johnson( Responses due by 7/5/2022) by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-DC, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-California) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Arnold, James)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8910641) of Yiqing Shi( Responses due by 7/5/2022) by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-New York) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Arnold, James)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 PRIVILEGE LOG SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT PROTOCOL FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/10/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #288 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott Scheinberg as co-counsel; granting #289 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adrienne Ferraro Mueller as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on June 10, 2022. (jlk)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MOTION to Certify Class by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Hillary B. Stakem in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Stakem Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Stakem Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Stakem Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Stakem Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Stakem Decl., #8 Exhibit F to Stakem Decl., #9 Exhibit G to Stakem Decl., #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Murray, Joseph)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTATION ORDER granting #287 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelsey Hughes-Blaum as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on June 6, 2022. (jlk)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTATION ORDER granting #281 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kari Kathleen Hall is terminated as counsel for Defendant Schneider. The Clerk is DIRECTED to DESIGNATE Brian Patrick OConnor as Defendant's trial attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/3/22. (jr)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G Sozio for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner (Sozio, Stephen)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8892710) of Adrienne M. Mueller by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8892631) of Scott B. Scheinberg by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing fee for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelsey- Hughes-Blaum: $ 200, receipt number AOHSDC-8892565. (Mitchell, John) Modified text on 6/2/2022 (er).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Kelsey- Hughes-Blaum by Defendant Ty Pine. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Mitchell, John)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #282 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua N Shinbrot. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/27/2022. (vb)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Misny for Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association (Misny, Jonathan)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J Moul for Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association (Moul, Geoffrey)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K Murphy for Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association (Murphy, Brian)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8881691) of Joshua N. Shinbrot by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Joshua Shinbrot)) (Bloomfield, David)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Donald Schneider. (Hall, Kari)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTATION ORDER granting #278 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jill Winter as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on May 20, 2022. (jlk)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick O'Connor for Defendant Donald Schneider Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (O'Connor, Brian)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8868482) of Jill Winter by Defendant Donald Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for DC, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hall, Kari)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE by Defendant Michael Dowling of Service of Subpoena on Generation Now Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Substantial Completion of Document Production by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Zbiegien, Jr for Defendant Ty Pine (Zbiegien, Michael)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER: Because the parties were able to resolve their dispute regarding the deposition of Defendant Steven E Strah, the telephonic status conference set for May 11, 2022 @ 11:00am is VACATED. Further, Defendant Strah's (266) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ is DENIED as moot. The 30(b)(6) depositions already scheduled in this action must proceed within the bounds of the Court's previous orders. The Court will not revisit either of its prior rulings on the 30(b)(6) depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/11/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE by Defendant Michael Dowling of Service of Subpoena on Partners for Progress Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding The Deposition Of Steven E. Strah, Allocation Of Time For 30(b)(6) Deposition Of FirstEnergy, And Discovery Going Forward by Defendants Michael Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Charles E. Jones, Steven E. Strah. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer to resolve the discovery dispute at hand. They are FURTHER ORDERED to join the Joint Status Report due on 5/9/2022, described by the Court's prior Order (see Doc. 259). In that report, they must describe their efforts to end their bickering. Should they fail to reach extrajudicial resolution, the Court will implement a process for managing discovery moving forward, which will include in-person hearings with counsel, cost shifting, and the appearance of the parties or deponents before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #263 and #264 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steve Grimes and Dan K. Webb as Co-Counsel for Defendant Michael Dowling. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 05/06/2022. (tla)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #270 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven W. Pepich, X. Jay Alvarez, David W. Mitchell, Steven M. Jodlowski, and Hillary B. Stakem as Co-Counsel for Lead Plaintiff. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 05/06/2022. (tla)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8850939) of Steven W. Pepich, X. Jay Alvarez, David W. Mitchell, Steven M. Jodlowski, and Hillary B. Stakem by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Pepich, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Alvarez, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Mitchell, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Jodlowski, #5 Certificate of Good Standing - Stakem) (Murray, Joseph)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER re (265 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Joint Status Report: The Court holds that Lead Plaintiff may have up to one hour for its cross-noticed examination of FirstEnergy's corporate representative. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/4/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE in Opposition re #266 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition on May 25, 2022 filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Murray, Joseph)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re (266 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Motion for Protective Order: Briefing on the motion is STAYED. The Court ORDERS the parties to further meet and confer to resolve their dispute, and to file a Joint Status Report by 5/9/2022. Should the parties be unable to reach a resolution on their own, a Telephone Status Conference is set for 5/11/2022 @ 11:00am before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/4/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition on May 25, 2022 by Defendant Steven E. Strah. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support) (Duffy, Marjorie)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Time For Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8846857) of Dan K. Webb( Responses due by 5/23/2022) by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8846833) of Steve Grimes( Responses due by 5/23/2022) by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTATION ORDER granting #260 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica T. Shinnefield, Lucas F. Olts, and Kevin S. Sciarani as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 25, 2022.
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER - The Court adopts the following parameters re deposition of FirstEnergy's corporate representative: The depositions shall occur on May 19 and 20, 2022 in Cleveland, Ohio with the option for counsel to participate remotely or in-person. Over those two days, Lead Plaintiff will conduct a one-day deposition, not to exceed seven hours, and Defendants Jones and Dowling will conduct a one-day deposition, not to exceed seven hours. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/21/22. (jr)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8834008) of Jessica T. Shinnefield, Lucas F. Olts, and Kevin S. Sciarani by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Shinnefield, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Olts, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Sciarani) (Murray, Joseph). Added MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of on 4/25/2022 (jlk).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition per Court Order Doc #257 by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTATION ORDER granting #256 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk shall TERMINATE Wendy West Feinstein as counsel for Defendant Dennis Chack. The Clerk shall designate Douglas M. Mansfield as the trial attorney for Defendant Dennis Chack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/18/22. (jr)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER - The Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer by April 20, 2022, and file a joint status report regarding their efforts by that date. The telephonic discovery conference set for April 15, 2022 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/15/22. (jr)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Wendy West Feinstein ( Responses due by 5/6/2022) by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Feinstein, Wendy)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court emphasizes that it intends to grant no further extensions to the case schedule. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report by 5/13/2022 setting forth a proposed deadline for substantial completion of document production. The Court adopts deadlines as follows: Class Certification Motion due by 6/6/2022; Motions to Amend due by 9/30/2022; Discovery (Expert) due by 10/6/2023; Discovery (Fact) due by 4/28/2023; Dispositive motions due by 11/21/2023; Primary Expert due by 5/29/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 7/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/14/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTATION ORDER granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Daniel S. Magy shall be TERMINATED as counsel for Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/14/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/13/2022 Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DANIEL S. MAGEY ( Responses due by 5/3/2022) by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Trafford, Robert)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTATION ORDER granting #250 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. David S. Rosenbloom shall be TERMINATED as counsel for Defendant Robert Reffner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/12/22. (jr)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah M. Smith for Defendant Michael Dowling Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Smith, Hannah)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Anthony Lee for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner (Lee, Corey)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTATION ORDER granting #233 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Kim as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 8, 2022. (jlk)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerhardt A Gosnell, II for Defendant Leila Vespoli Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Gosnell, Gerhardt)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING #231 Motion to Substitute Attorney. James E. Arnold is substituted as lead counsel for Defendant Leila Vespoli. David H. Wallace is TERMINATED as counsel for Defendant Leila Vespoli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/8/22. (jr)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Charles E. Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Donald Schneider. (Hall, Kari)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Leila Vespoli. (Callahan, Veronica)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by John Judge. (Walton, Victor)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Weinstein, Brian)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by FirstEnergy Corp.. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Dennis Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Michael Dowling. (McCaffrey, John)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Defendant Ty R. Pine's ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Ty Pine. (Mitchell, John)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8810771) of Eric M. Kim( Responses due by 4/27/2022) by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Trafford, Robert)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Bloomfield, Jr for Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. (Bloomfield, David)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION to Substitute Attorney ( Responses due by 4/26/2022) by Defendant Leila Vespoli. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Arnold, James)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Proposed Pretrial Order Parties Proposed Case Schedule by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #226 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brittany M. Wilson as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 25, 2022. (jlk)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTATION ORDER granting (216) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter E Borkon and F. Joseph Warin terminated; granting (217) Motion in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter E Borkon and F. Joseph Warin terminated; granting (85) Motion in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/24/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTATION ORDER granting #225 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #72 Amended Complaint. Answers due by 4/6/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/23/22. (jr)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8786783) of Brittany M. Wilson by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Teaberry, Jeremy)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #72 Amended Complaint,,,,, New date requested 4/6/2022. by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Change of Address by John R Mitchell (Mitchell, John)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk shall TERMINATE Christine M. Haaker, Kip T. Bollin, and the law firm of Thompson Hine LLP as counsel for Defendant Ty R. Pine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/15/22. (jr)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Christine M. Haaker, Kip T. Bollin and Thompson Hine LLP by Defendant Ty Pine. (Haaker, Christine)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTATION ORDER granting #220 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ashley M. Kelly as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 14, 2022. (jlk)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8763381) of Ashley M. Kelly by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murray, Joseph)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 OPINION and ORDER issued in that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. #160 is GRANTED IN PART as to the non-management Director Defendants in Count IV only and is DENIED in all other respects. Defendant Pines Motion to Dismiss #166 is GRANTED IN PART as to Count II and is DENIED IN PART as to Count I. The remaining Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant Reffner #162 , Defendant Judge #164 , Defendant Dowling #165 , Defendant Chack #168 , Defendant Schneider #170 , the Underwriter Defendants #171 , Defendant Vespoli #172 , and Defendant Jones #174 each are DENIED. The partial dismissals are without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/7/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (sem)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:22-cv-865 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/28/2022. (jlk) . (jlk)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION by Movant State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Borkon, Peter) Modified text/event on 3/1/2022 (jlk).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney F. Joseph Warin by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTATION ORDER granting #214 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Hur as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on February 17, 2022. (jlk)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8717966) of Robert K. Hur by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Steven Dunnaback for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Dunnaback, Jeremy)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas L. Shively for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Shively, Douglas)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTATION ORDER granting #210 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of George A. Stamboulidis. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/4/2021. (er)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8655247) of George A. Stamboulidis by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner re #160 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. OF WITHDRAWAL OF JAY A. YURKIW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR THE UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS (Yurkiw, Jay)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTATION ORDER granting #206 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason R. Meltzer. Terminating Christopher Sullivan pursuant to the #205 Notice of Withdrawal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on December 14, 2021. (jlk)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8632963) of Jason R. Meltzer by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Notice to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (jlk).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 JOINT PROTOCOL ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/5/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re (64 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 174 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum in Support] filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Warren, Daniel)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTATION ORDER granting #190 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Magy as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 3, 2021. (jlk)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion re (61 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 165 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, (160 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 58 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Ty Pine. (Mitchell, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REPLY to Response to Motion re (171 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Trafford, Robert)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REPLY to Response to Motion re #162 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion re #172 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration Of Veronica E. Callahan and Exhibit 6 Thereto (FE 2Q17 Earnings Call Transcript)) (Callahan, Veronica)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REPLY to Response to Motion re (62 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 168 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REPLY to Response to Motion re #160 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Axelrod, David)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REPLY to Response to Motion re #160 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Donald Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Preston Burton, #2 Exhibit A) (Hall, Kari)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REPLY to #176 Response to Motion re (60 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 164 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant John Judge. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Walton, Victor) Modified link on 8/3/2021 (jlk).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8432421) of Daniel S. Magy by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel Sofia A. Vittiello for the Underwriter Defendants (Trafford, Robert)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 8/19/2021) by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Fraser, Kirsten)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #183 Motion for Extension of Time: Reply due by 8/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/26/2021. (ew)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTATION ORDER granting (182) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin Robert Donoho terminated in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin Robert Donoho terminated in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/22/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 RESPONSE in Opposition re #183 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (174 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Murray, Joseph)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTATION ORDER - Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendant's Motion for Extension (66 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 183 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) no later than July 23, 2021. The opposition shall be no longer than three single-spaced pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/21/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ (jr)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (174 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum in Support] New date requested 8/12/2021. ( Responses due by 8/10/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Justin R. Donoho) ( Responses due by 8/10/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #178 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D. Katsiff as co-counsel; granting #179 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David L. Axelrod as co-counsel; granting #180 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emilia McKee Vassallo as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 12, 2021. (jlk)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8396519) of Emilia McKee Vassallo by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Teaberry, Jeremy)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8396509) of David L. Axelrod by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Teaberry, Jeremy)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8396420) of Timothy D. Katsiff by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Teaberry, Jeremy)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Geoffrey J. Ritts substituting for / by Jeremy R. Teaberry, Timothy D. Katsiff, David L. Axelrod and Emilia McKee Vassallo as to Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #168 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #172 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #171 MOTION to Dismiss , #174 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum in Support], #160 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws, #162 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #165 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit A to the Forge Declaration) (Murray, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #145 Motion Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/14/2021. (cw)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum in Support] ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert G. Lin in Support of Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Albert G. Lin Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Warren, Daniel)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 BRIEF re #172 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Veronica E. Callahan in Support of Vespoli Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - July 2018 Form 8-K, #3 Exhibit 2 - February 2019 State of Ohio Press Release, #4 Exhibit 3 - March 2018 Vespoli Form 4, #5 Exhibit 4 - March 2019 Vespoli Form 4, #6 Exhibit 5 - February 2017 Form 4) (Callahan, Veronica)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Callahan, Veronica)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. (Yurkiw, Jay)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Donald Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Declaration of Adam Miller, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Text of Proposed Order) (Hall, Kari)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 BRIEF re(168 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant Dennis Chack. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas Mansfield, #2 Exhibit Form 4s, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 BRIEF re #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ty Pine. (Mitchell, John)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ty Pine. (Mitchell, John)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant Michael Dowling. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant John Judge. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Walton, Victor)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 BRIEF re #162 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 BRIEF re(160 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts in Support of FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws, #2 Exhibit A: Excerpt 2021 10-K, #3 Exhibit B: Excerpt 2020 10-Q, #4 Exhibit C: Strah Form 4 (2017), #5 Exhibit D: Strah Form 4 (2020), #6 Exhibit E: Taylor Form 4 (2017), #7 Exhibit F: Taylor Form 4 (2018), #8 Exhibit G: Pearson Form 4 (2017), #9 Exhibit H: Pearson Form 4 (2019)) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Paul Guran for Defendant John Judge Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Guran, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Brunner for Defendant John Judge Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Brunner, Joseph)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor A Walton, Jr for Defendant John Judge Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Walton, Victor)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 REPLY to Response to Motion re #145 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Murray, Joseph)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 16, 2020, before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawna J. Evans, Telephone number 614-719-3316. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Evans, Shawna)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten R. Fraser for Defendant Barclays Capital Inc. (Fraser, Kirsten)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Response Letter to RICO plaintiffs in the Smith case by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Yurkiw, Jay)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTATION ORDER granting #148 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sofia Vitiello; granting #149 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian Weinstein as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 14, 2021. (jlk)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8262208) of Brian S. Weinstein by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 062048) of Sofia A. Vitiello by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Trafford, Robert)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ward Trafford for Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. (Trafford, Robert)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTATION ORDER granting (144) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Mendro in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ AND 51 Motion for Leave to Appeal Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Mendro in case 2:20-cv-4287 as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 9, 2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jlk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Sara B. Polychron in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Polychron Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Polychron Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Polychron Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Polychron Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Polychron Decl., #8 Exhibit F to Polychron Decl., #9 Exhibit G to Polychron Decl., #10 Text of Proposed Order) (Murray, Joseph)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8249736) of Jason J. Mendro( Responses due by 4/26/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTATION ORDER granting #135 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Zheng (Jame) He; granting #136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aaron F. Miner; granting #137 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Veronica E. Callahan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 30, 2021. (jlk)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court VACATES the Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 30, 2021 at 10:00a.m. in Case No. 2:20-cv-3785. Answers/motions to dismiss due by 5/18/2021. Responses due by 7/2/2021 Replies due by 8/2/2021. Settlement Demand due by 4/23/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/29/2021. (daf) Modified on 3/30/2021 (jr).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M Mansfield for Defendant Dennis Chack Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M Haaker for Defendant Ty Pine (Haaker, Christine)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip T Bollin for Defendant Ty Pine (Bollin, Kip)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Mitchell for Defendant Ty Pine (Mitchell, John)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8234588) of Veronica Ellen Callahan by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wallace, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8234584) of Aaron Frank Miner by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wallace, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8234579) of Zheng (Jane) He by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wallace, David)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTATION ORDER granting #127 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. Kichline and Laura H. McNally as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 24, 2021. (jlk) Modified on 3/25/2021- there is no document associated with entry; this is simply a notation (er).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Per Summons Returned Executed - BoFa Securities, Inc. answer due 4/1/2021; CIBC World Markets Corp. answer due 4/1/2021. (jlk)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION and Joint Motion Regarding Case Schedule by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed Order]) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey) Modified event on 3/26/2021 (jlk).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTATION ORDER granting #124 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum, Mark Solomon, Sara B. Polychron, Ting H. Liu, and Francisco J. Mejia as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 23, 2021. (jlk)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTATION ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chad Johnson and Desiree Cummings as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 23, 2021. (jlk)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTATION ORDER granting #102 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Preston Burton as co-counsel; granting #103 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam Miller as co-counsel; granting #104 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bree Murphy as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 23, 2021. (jlk) Modified text on 3/23/2021 (jlk).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by David H Wallace for Defendant Leila Vespoli (Wallace, David)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8229910) of Michael L. Kichline and Laura Hughes( Responses due by 4/13/2021) by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Feinstein, Wendy)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ty Pine on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy West Feinstein for Defendant Dennis Chack Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Feinstein, Wendy)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8222527) of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum, Mark Solomon, Sara B. Polychron, Ting H. Liu, and Francisco J. Mejia by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Pfefferbaum, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Solomon, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Polychron, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Liu, #5 Certificate of Good Standing - Mejia) (Murray, Joseph)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8222459) of Chad Johnson and Desiree Cummings by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Johnson, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Cummings) (Murray, Joseph)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant TD Securities (USA) LLC. TD Securities (USA) LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.. SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.. Scotia Capital (USA) Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Santander Investment Securities. Santander Investment Securities served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant RBC Capital Markets, LLC. RBC Capital Markets, LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant PNC Capital Markets LLC. PNC Capital Markets LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant MUFG Securities Americas Inc.. MUFG Securities Americas Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Morgan Stanley & Co. Morgan Stanley & Co served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Mizuho Securities USA LLC. Mizuho Securities USA LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.. KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant CIBC World Markets Corp.. CIBC World Markets Corp. served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant BoFa Securities, Inc.. BoFa Securities, Inc. served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Leila Vespoli on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8219507) of Bree Murphy by Defendant Donald Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hall, Kari)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8219496) of Adam Miller by Defendant Donald Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hall, Kari)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8219476) of Preston Burton by Defendant Donald Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hall, Kari)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Kathleen Hall for Defendant Donald Schneider (Hall, Kari)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael Dowling Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by John F McCaffrey for Defendant Michael Dowling Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael Dowling on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dennis Chack on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Leslie Turner on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jerry Sue Thornton on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to George Smart on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Luis A. Reyes on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Sandra Pianalto on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Christopher D. Pappas on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to James F. O'Neil, III on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Thomas N Mitchell on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Donald T. Misheff on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jason Lisowski on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to John Judge on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Julia Johnson on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Steven J. Demetriou on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael J. Anderson on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Paul T. Addison on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Donald Schneider on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robert Reffner on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Cochran, Brian)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTATION ORDER granting #76 , #77 , #78 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Rosenbloom, Steven S. Scholes and Paul M.G. Helms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/5/2021. (er)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8192915) of Paul M.G. Helms by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate) (Fairweather, John)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8192896) of Steven S. Scholes by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate) (Fairweather, John)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8192879) of David S. Rosenbloom by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate) (Fairweather, John)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa S Del Grosso for Defendant Robert Reffner (Del Grosso, Lisa)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Fairweather for Defendant Robert Reffner (Fairweather, John)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Summons Issued as to Michael J. Anderson, Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Dennis Chack, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Steven J. Demetriou, Michael Dowling, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Julia Johnson, John Judge, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Jason Lisowski, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Thomas N Mitchell, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, James F. O'Neil, III, PNC Capital Markets LLC, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Ty Pine, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Donald Schneider, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., George Smart, TD Securities (USA) LLC, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Leila Vespoli, donald misheff. (jlk)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against All Defendants, filed by Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Barclays, #2 Summons Form BoFa Securities, #3 Summons Form Pappas, #4 Summons Form CIBC World Markets, #5 Summons Form Citigroup, #6 Summons Form Chack, #7 Summons Form Misheff, #8 Summons Form Schneider, #9 Summons Form Smart, #10 Summons Form O'Neil, #11 Summons Form Lisowski, #12 Summons Form Thornton, #13 Summons Form Judge, #14 Summons Form Morgan, #15 Summons Form Johnson, #16 Summons Form KeyBanc, #17 Summons Form Vespoli, #18 Summons Form Turner, #19 Summons Form Reyes, #20 Summons Form Anderson, #21 Summons Form Dowling, #22 Summons Form Mizuho, #23 Summons Form Morgan Stanley, #24 Summons Form MUFG Securities, #25 Summons Form Addison, #26 Summons Form PNC Capital, #27 Summons Form RBC Capital Markets, #28 Summons Form Reffner, #29 Summons Form Pianalto, #30 Summons Form Santander, #31 Summons Form Scotia USA, #32 Summons Form SMBC Nikko, #33 Summons Form Demetriou, #34 Summons Form TD Securities, #35 Summons Form Mitchell, #36 Summons Form Pine, #37 Summons Form US Bancorp) (Cochran, Brian)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Initial Case Schedule: Consolidated Complaint due by 2/26/2021. Answer due 60 days after filing of Complaint. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss the Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file their response no later than 45 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss. Reply due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/26/2021. (ew)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Joint MOTION and Stipulation Regarding Initial Case Schedule by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gronborg, Tor)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Initial CaseSchedule: Consolidated Complaint due within 60 days. Answer due 60 days after filing of Complaint. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss the Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file their response no later than 45 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss. Reply due 30 days thereafter. It is further ORDERED that the parties will submit all future filings in these consolidated cases under the caption In re FirstEnergy Corp. Securities Litigation, No. 2:20-cv-03785. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/14/2020. (ew)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint MOTION and Stipulation Regarding Initial Case Schedule by Defendants FirstEnergy Corp., James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTATION ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Justin Robert Donoho as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless co-counsel has done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on December 8, 2020. (jlk)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Baumann for Defendants FirstEnergy Corp., James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor (Baumann, Jordan)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Consolidate and denying the Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff; granting #33 Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff; granting #60 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply; and denying #28 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/23/2020. (cw)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Movant IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS MOTION OF IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Wagoner, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Murray, Joseph)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTATION ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lesley E. Weaver, Peter E. Borkon and Javier Bleichmar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 13, 2020. (jlk)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Movant James J Durrett, Jr re #27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Cummins, James)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions by Movant State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions, #2 Declaration of Gregory M. Utter, #3 Exhibit A (Financial Interest Analysis for CalPERS), #4 Exhibit B (Financial Interest Analysis for LACERA), #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Geiger, Sarah)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-7748917) of Javier Bleichmar, Lesley E. Weaver, Peter E. Borkon by Movant State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Javier Bleichmar, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Lesley E. Weaver, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Peter E. Borkon) (Geiger, Sarah)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , to Approve Selection as Lead Counsel, and to Consolidate Cases filed by Movant State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Geiger, Sarah)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Murray, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff CalPERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lavallee Declaration) (Karon, Daniel)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM regarding case 2:20-cv-5610. The cases are related along with all cases listed on the memo. Signed by Chief Judge Marbley. (jlk)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , to Approve Selection as Lead Counsel, and to Consolidate Cases, #33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #30 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL, #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel : Virtual GoToMtg Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2020 02:00 PM - Columbus before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley via video conference virtual courtroom. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/28/2020. (cw)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTATION ORDER granting #47 #48 #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Barenbaum, Joseph J. Tobacco, Jr., and Nicole Lavallee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 27, 2020. (jlk)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTATION ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Darren J. Robbins, Jason A. Forge, Tor Gronborg, and Danielle S. Myers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 27, 2020. (jlk)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-5529 IS related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7717373) of Nicole Lavallee by Plaintiffs CalPERS, Diane Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lavallee Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Lavallee Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7717363) of Joseph J. Tobacco, Jr. by Plaintiffs CalPERS, Diane Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tobacco, Jr. Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Tobacco, Jr. PHV Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7717338) of Daniel E. Barenbaum by Plaintiffs CalPERS, Diane Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Barenbaum Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Barenbaum Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by Movant The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement to Withdraw Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (Serrani, Victoria)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel , #32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , to Approve Selection as Lead Counsel, and to Consolidate Cases, #29 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel, #31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel, #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #30 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bloomberg Printout, #2 Exhibit 2 - CalPERS' Annual Report Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - STRS' Fixed Income Report) (Murray, Joseph)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel , #33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #29 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel, #30 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL filed by Movant State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Geiger, Sarah)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff CalPERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration to Memorandum) (Karon, Daniel)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE by Movant The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions (Serrani, Victoria)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $800 paid, receipt number 0648-7708347) of Darren J. Robbins, Jason A. Forge, Tor Gronborg, and Danielle S. Myers by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing) (Murray, Joseph)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTATION ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 13, 2020. (jlk)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-5237, 2:20-cv-4534, 2:20-cv-4598, 2:20-cv-4813, 2:20-cv-5020, and 2:20-cv-5128 are related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge Sarah D. Morrison, and Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/8/2020. (kk2)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received re #24 PHV Motion of of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan: $600. Receipt Number: 200COL063428. (ew)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE by Movant James J Durrett, Jr of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Consolidation of the Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel (Cummins, James)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants FirstEnergy Corp., James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor (Faxon, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel ( Responses due by 10/19/2020) by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Joseph F. Murray in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Murray Decl. (PSLRA Notice), #4 Exhibit B to Murray Decl. (Certification), #5 Exhibit C to Murray Decl. (Estimate of losses), #6 Exhibit D to Murray Decl. (Declaration of Michael D. Herrera in Support), #7 Text of Proposed Order) (Murray, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , to Approve Selection as Lead Counsel, and to Consolidate Cases by Movant State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Gregory M. Utter, #3 Ex. A to Utter Declaration (PSLRA Certification), #4 Ex. B to Utter Declaration (Notice of Pendency), #5 Ex. C to Utter Declaration (Chart of Financial Interest), #6 Ex. D to Utter Declaration (BFA Firm Resume), #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Geiger, Sarah)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Movant The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Victoria L. Serrani Ferrise, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Serrani, Victoria)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WITHDRAWN per #64 .First MOTION to Consolidate Cases APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL by Movant IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Damages Analysis, #2 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit Cert & Schedule A, #4 Exhibit Pomerantz Resume, #5 Exhibit Wagoner Resume, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wagoner, Robert) Modified on 11/17/2020 (ew).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Movant The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Serrani, Victoria) Modified term on 10/30/2020 per ALM (jlk).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff CalPERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Declaration to Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Responses due by 10/19/2020), MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Movant James J Durrett, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James R. Cummins, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cummins, James)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7672618) of Justin Robert Donoho by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan (mdr)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/6/2020. (mdr)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warin COGS, #2 Exhibit Scherman COGS, #3 Exhibit Sullivan COGS) (Rendon, Carole)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Rendon, Carole)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-4534 are related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley & Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 9/8/2020. (kk2)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian E. Cochran. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on August 21, 2020. (jlk)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7616347) of Brian E. Cochran by Plaintiff Diane Owens. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Murray, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: 1:20-cr-77 will remain assigned to Judge Black. 2:20-cv-3785 will remain assigned to Chief Judge Marbley. All other cases listed on this memo should be transferred to the docket of Judge Sargus. (ew) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/19/2020) (ew).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER re 2:20-cv-3954, 2:20-cv-3987, 1:20-cr-77, 2:20-cv-3785, and 2:20-cv-3755. The judges agree that these cases are related. Cases 2:20-cv-3954 and 2:20-cv-3987 reassigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge Timothy S. Black, Judge Michael H. Watson, and Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. on 8/18/2020. (ew)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to answer is postponed pending appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/13/2020. (kk2)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION Joint Motion and Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendants FirstEnergy Corp., James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants FirstEnergy Corp., James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor (Ritts, Geoffrey)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants FirstEnergy Corp., James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor (Duffy, Marjorie)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant K. Jon Taylor. K. Jon Taylor served on 8/8/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Murray, Joseph)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Steven E. Strah. Steven E. Strah served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Murray, Joseph)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant James F. Pearson. James F. Pearson served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Murray, Joseph)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Charles E. Jones. Charles E. Jones served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Murray, Joseph)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. FirstEnergy Corp. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Murray, Joseph)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FirstEnergy Corp., Charles E. Jones, James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah and K. Jon Taylor. (er)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against FirstEnergy Corp., Charles E. Jones, James F. Pearson, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7576737), filed by Diane Owens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form FirstEnergy Corp., #3 Summons Form Jones, #4 Summons Form Pearson, #5 Summons Form Strah, #6 Summons Form Taylor) (Murray, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. FirstEnergy Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Represented By: Albert Grant Lin
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Justin Robert Donoho
Represented By: Christopher W.H. Sullivan
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: William Scherman
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: George A. Stamboulidis
Represented By: Jason R. Meltzer
Represented By: Jeremy Steven Dunnaback
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstEnergy Corp.
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Jeremy R Teaberry
Represented By: David L. Axelrod
Represented By: Emilia McKee Vassallo
Represented By: Timothy D. Katsiff
Represented By: Brittany Marie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dowling
Represented By: John A Favret, III
Represented By: John F McCaffrey
Represented By: Hannah M. Smith
Represented By: Dan K Webb
Represented By: Steven Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Investment Securities
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Demetriou
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Sue Thornton
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Lisowski
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Kirsten R. Fraser
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Pappas
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Judge
Represented By: Joseph Michael Brunner
Represented By: Victor A Walton, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Paul Guran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Chack
Represented By: Laura Hughes McNally
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Represented By: Douglas M Mansfield
Represented By: Michael L. Kichline
Represented By: Emily S. Kimmelman
Represented By: Karen Pieslak Pohlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Misheff
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Smart
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reffner
Represented By: Paul Helms
Represented By: Steven S. Scholes
Represented By: John C Fairweather
Represented By: David S. Rosenbloom
Represented By: Lisa S Del Grosso
Represented By: Samantha L Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Johnson
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leila Vespoli
Represented By: Veronica E. Callahan
Represented By: David H Wallace
Represented By: Aaron F. Miner
Represented By: Zheng (Jane) He
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Represented By: Gerhardt A Gosnell, II
Represented By: Andrew C. Johnson
Represented By: Yiqing Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Anderson
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BoFa Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Turner
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N Mitchell
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Securities Americas Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Reyes
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pianalto
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. O'Neil, III
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC World Markets Corp.
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Schneider
Represented By: Kari Kathleen Hall
Represented By: Bree Murphy
Represented By: Preston Burton
Represented By: Adam B. Miller
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Connor
Represented By: Jill Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: donald misheff
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Addison
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Brittany Marie Wilson
Represented By: Corey Anthony Lee
Represented By: Adrienne M. Mueller
Represented By: Scott B. Scheinberg
Represented By: Stephen G Sozio
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ferraro Mueller
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Emily Mae Rector
Represented By: M. Ryan Harmanis
Represented By: Katherine T. Berger
Represented By: Shalini Beth Goyal
Represented By: Elizabeth Benshoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Pine
Represented By: John R Mitchell
Represented By: Christine M Haaker
Represented By: Kip T Bollin
Represented By: Michael J. Zbiegien, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey Hughes-Blaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Jay A Yurkiw
Represented By: Robert Ward Trafford
Represented By: Sofia A. Vitiello
Represented By: Daniel Magy
Represented By: David S Bloomfield, Jr
Represented By: Eric Kim
Represented By: Joshua N. Shinbrot
Represented By: Shanaye Y. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Owens
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: David W Mitchell
Represented By: Hillary Bryn Stakem
Represented By: Steve Michael Jodlowski
Represented By: Steven Wayne Pepich
Represented By: X. Jay Alvarez
Represented By: Andrew W Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CalPERS
Represented By: Daniel E. Barenbaum
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: Nicole Lavallee
Represented By: Jessica Tally Shinnefield
Represented By: Kevin Shen Sciarani
Represented By: Lucas Freeman Olts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS
Represented By: Robert J Wagoner
Represented By: Robert J. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Serrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Represented By: Darren J Robbins
Represented By: Jason A. Forge
Represented By: Tor Gronborg
Represented By: Danielle S. Myers
Represented By: Sara B. Polychron
Represented By: Daniel J. Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Ting H. Liu
Represented By: Francisco J Mejia
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: C. Chad Johnson
Represented By: Desiree Cummings
Represented By: Mark Soloman
Represented By: Ashley M. Kelly
Represented By: Brian K Murphy
Represented By: Geoffrey J Moul
Represented By: Jonathan P. Misny
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Gilroy
Represented By: Francis Paul Karam
Represented By: John M Kelley
Represented By: Jonah H. Goldstein
Represented By: Rachel Ann Cocalis
Represented By: John F McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James J Durrett, Jr.
Represented By: James Rubin Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio
Represented By: Peter Borkon
Represented By: Lesley Weaver
Represented By: Javier Bleichmar
Represented By: Sarah V. Geiger
Represented By: Peter E Borkon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Partners for Progress Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A Chiricosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Heritage Trust Company
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Investment Management Company (LUX), S.a.r.l
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Meridian Funds
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Series Trust I
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Series Trust IV
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Series Trust V
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Series Trust VI
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Series Trust X
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Series Trust XI
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Series Trust XV
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Variable Insurance Trust
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Variable Insurance Trust II
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MFS Variable Insurance Trust III
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Brighthouse Funds - MFS Total Return Portfolio
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Brighthouse Funds II - MFS Value Portfolio
Represented By: Nicole Rene Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?