Total Environmental Concepts, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv03992
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Federal Insurance Company on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Ferguson, Katherine)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica A. duHoffmann and Michael B. Brown is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/25/2020. (daf)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7622225) of Jessica A. DuHoffman and Michael B. Brown by Plaintiff Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Jessica A. duHoffmann), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Michael B. Brown)) (Ferguson, Katherine)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay M. Nelson for Plaintiff Total Environmental Concepts, Inc. (Nelson, Lindsay)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.. (Ferguson, Katherine)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7595674), filed by Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subcontract, #3 Exhibit 3 - Payment Applications and Change Orders, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover) (Ferguson, Katherine) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/7/2020) (daf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Environmental Concepts, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Environmental Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Ferguson
Represented By: Jessica A. duHoffmann
Represented By: Lindsay M. Nelson
Represented By: Michael B. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?