Munk v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Daniel Devon Munk
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv04098
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTATION ORDER granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 11/9/2020. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/5/2020. (agm)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 12/8/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 9/1/2020.SEE DOCKET #7 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event (kk2)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING case to United States Magistrate Judge Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 9/1/2020. (tb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Kellup, Kiywhanna)
August 11, 2020 Set/Reset Commissioner of Social Security answer date. (daf)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Daniel Devon Munk. (daf)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent Form) (daf)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Daniel Devon Munk. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brian, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munk v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kiywhanna LaChic Kellup
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Devon Munk
Represented By: Richard F Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?