Clark v. Gray
Plaintiff: Cornelius Clark
Defendant: David W. Gray
Case Number: 2:2020cv04174
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Mail sent to Belmont Correctional Institution Cashier returned as undeliverable. Contents include: #2 Order and Report and Recommendation. (ew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (PAROLED) Mail sent to Cornelius Clark as to re #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (er)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against David W. Gray filed by Cornelius Clark. (ew)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) and (2) (ECF No. 1) is GRANTED. In addition, it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS his claim pursuant to 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and the prison cashiers office. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Order to the Courts financial office in Columbus. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 09/21/2020. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified text and docket entry relationships on 9/21/2020 (ew).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cornelius Clark. (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 USM-285, #5 Envelope) (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?