Nickerson v. American Electric Power Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diana Nickerson
Defendant: Nicholas K. Akins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Brian X. Tierney and Joseph M Buonaiuto
Case Number: 2:2020cv04243
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME TO RESPOND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/31/2020. (kk2)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #4 & #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J Kevin McCall and Nicole A Allen by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/31/2020 (kk2)
August 28, 2020 Joint MOTION Seeking Entry of the Parties' Stipulation and Proposed Order by Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Joseph M Buonaiuto, Brian X. Tierney, Plaintiff Diana Nickerson. SEE DOCKET #6 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Motion for Miscellaneous Relief," which can be found in the "Motions" section of CM/ECF (kk2)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 **SEE 8/28/2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY** - STIPULATION Joint Motion Seeking Entry of the Parties' Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Time to Respond by Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Joseph M Buonaiuto, Brian X. Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)) (King, James) Modified on 8/31/2020 (kk2).
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7630194) of Nicole A. Allen by Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Joseph M Buonaiuto, Brian X. Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing)) (King, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7630178) of J. Kevin McCall by Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Joseph M Buonaiuto, Brian X. Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing)) (King, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James A King for Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Joseph M Buonaiuto, Brian X. Tierney (King, James)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Phillip Kim & Laurence M Rosen (kk2)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7617990), filed by Diana Nickerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Karon, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nickerson v. American Electric Power Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Nickerson
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: Beau D Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas K. Akins
Represented By: James A King
Represented By: Nicole A Allen
Represented By: J Kevin McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power Company, Inc.
Represented By: James A King
Represented By: Nicole A Allen
Represented By: J Kevin McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian X. Tierney
Represented By: James A King
Represented By: Nicole A Allen
Represented By: J Kevin McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Buonaiuto
Represented By: James A King
Represented By: Nicole A Allen
Represented By: J Kevin McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?