Frand v. First Energy Corp et al
Plaintiff: Chana Frand and CalPERS
Defendant: First Energy Corp, K. Jon Taylor, Charles E. Jones, Steven Strath and James F. Pearson
Petitioner: James J Durrett, Jr., The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement and IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS
Case Number: 2:2020cv04287
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
2 Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
3 Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying (402) Motion to Amend Scheduling Order in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Non-Party Partners for Progress Inc is ORDERED to provide a privilege log to Plaintiffs and Dowling by 1/23/2023. After the log is produced, the parties are further ORDERED to confer diligently to identify and narrow any disputes on the claims of privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/17/2023. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
January 13, 2023 Filing 175 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph) Modified filing event for statistical purposes on 1/17/2023 (kk2)
January 13, 2023 Filing 174 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re (143 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress filed by Interested Party Partners for Progress Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 12/14/22 Email from J. Favret, #2 Exhibit B 12/15/22 Letter from M. Chiricosta, #3 Exhibit C 12/16/22 Letter from D. Mitchell, #4 Exhibit D 12/21/22 Letter from M Chiricosta, #5 Exhibit E Email Chain Among Counsel for Plaintiffs and PFP, #6 Exhibit F 5/18/22 Letter from F. Berckmueller, #7 Exhibit G 6/6/22 Letter from F. Berckmueller, #8 Exhibit H FirstEnergys Deferred Prosecution Agreement) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Chiricosta, Matthew)
January 13, 2023 Filing 173 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re (143 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 350 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress [Redacted] filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 [Placeholder], #7 Exhibit 6) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER overruling(388)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; overruling(163)Objection to Magistrate Judge Order in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. PFPs request therein to stay the Magistrate Judges Order pending resolution of their Objection is thus DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/10/2023. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (cw)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER re (397 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Status Report: No active disputes were raised, so the Court VACATES the hearing set for 1/12/2023 @ 11:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/10/2023. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
January 9, 2023 Filing 170 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Status Report by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: The Court VACATES the hearing set for December 22, 2022, at 11:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/20/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (tla)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTATION ORDER granting (391) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Entered for statistical purposes. See 393 for document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/19/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
December 16, 2022 Filing 167 RESPONSE to Motion re (388 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 163 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (378 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant Michael Dowling, Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
December 14, 2022 Filing 166 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
December 12, 2022 Filing 165 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association re (154 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class: Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 331 - Columbus before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/8/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (cw)
December 2, 2022 Filing 163 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (378 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order on Motion to Compel, ( Responses due by 12/27/2022) by Interested Party Partners for Progress Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12.13.18 Email from D. McCarthy, #2 Exhibit B - Partners for Progress's Privilege Log) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Chiricosta, Matthew)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER vacating the hearing set for 12/1/2022 at 11:00am. The Court ORDERS that McNees and IEU-Ohio complete (1) the collection and transfer of all agreed-upon document sources and (2) the production of responsive hard copy documents by December 21, 2022. Jones and IEU-Ohio are ORDERED to submit a joint status report by December 14, 2022, briefly describing the progress of production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/29/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 29, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/14/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 28, 2022 Filing 161 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
November 23, 2022 Filing 160 Response re (371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Defendants Charles Jones and Michael Dowling's Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Objection to ECF No. 368 by Defendants Michael Dowling, Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert G. Lin, #2 Exhibit 1 - Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
November 23, 2022 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re (154 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (350) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; (143) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/18/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 17, 2022 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion re (154 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 371 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings [Class Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Objection to the Magistrate Judges Aggregation Order and Request to Stay] filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting (375) Motion for Leave to File in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/16/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (cw)
November 11, 2022 Filing 155 Response re (352 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Notice (Other), Nonspeaking Defendants Michael Dowling, Dennis Chack, and Ty Pine's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Ty Pine. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mitchell, John)
November 10, 2022 Filing 154 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 368 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ( Responses due by 12/1/2022) by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sept. 28, 2022 email from Marjorie Duffy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Oct. 10, 2022 email from Jeremy Dunnaback, #4 Exhibit 3 - Oct. 12, 2022 email chain from Andrew C. Johnson, #5 Exhibit 4 - Oct. 24, 2022 email chain from Albert G. Lin, #6 Exhibit 5 - Nov. 2, 2022 email chain from Jason Forge, #7 Exhibit 6 - Nov. 9, 2022 email chain from Paul Helms, #8 Exhibit 7 - Nov. 9, 2022 email from Marjorie Duffy) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER vacating the hearing set for November 10, 2022 @ 11:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/9/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE Emily M. Rector as counsel for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, and Leslie Turner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/8/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
November 7, 2022 Filing 151 REPLY to Response to Motion re (143 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress filed by Defendant Michael Dowling, Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
November 1, 2022 Filing 150 Objection to Magistrate Judge Orderre (355 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Order,, Class Plaintiffs Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Aggregation Order and Request to Stay Pending Resolution of Class Plaintiffs' Objection ( Responses due by 11/22/2022) by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 - Appendix A, #4 Exhibit 2 - Oct. 26, 2022 J. Murray Email, #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Class Plaintiffs' Request to Stay Aggregation Order Pending Resolution of Class Plaintiffs Objection, #6 Text of Proposed Order Sustaining Class Plaintiffs' Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Aggregation Order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re (355) in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ: If class counsel seeks resolution of the present discovery dispute, they may avail themselves of the procedure adopted in this matter for dealing with discovery disputes (Doc. 309 at 1). The Court will not depart from that procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/27/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
October 21, 2022 Filing 148 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Unknown McNees Wallace & Nurick. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Schneider, Karl)
October 17, 2022 Filing 147 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, Defendants, and Non-Party Opt-Out Plaintiffs by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit - Defendants' Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit - Opt-Out Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Matthew Pritchard, or another McNees representative, is ORDERED to submit legal support for its position within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Failure to do so will result in an order requiring McNees to comply with IEU-Ohio's request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/14/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
October 12, 2022 Filing 145 NOTICE by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association re (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
October 11, 2022 Filing 144 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 143 Joint MOTION to Compel of Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling to Compel Production of Documents from Non--Party Partners for Progress ( Responses due by 10/27/2022) by Defendant Michael Dowling, Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex.1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11, #13 Exhibit Ex. 12, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13, #15 Exhibit Ex. 14, #16 Exhibit Ex. 15, #17 Exhibit Ex. 16, #18 Exhibit Ex. 17, #19 Exhibit Ex. 18, #20 Exhibit Ex. 19, #21 Exhibit Ex. 20, #22 Exhibit Ex. 21, #23 Exhibit Ex. 22, #24 Exhibit Ex. 23, #25 Exhibit Ex. 24, #26 Exhibit Ex. 25, #27 Exhibit Ex. 26, #28 Exhibit Ex. 27) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER - Jones and IEU-Ohio are ORDERED to submit a joint status report within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, in which, if there is still disagreement, each side should propose alternatives to allow for the immediate progress of discovery. Given that the parties are being allotted additional time to confer, the telephonic status conference set for October 6, 2022 is VACATED. The Court appreciates that the parties seek clarity on their disputes and will consider setting an in-person hearing to quickly rule on their disputes, if judicial resolution is necessary after the submission of the joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/4/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
October 3, 2022 Filing 141 STATUS REPORT of Industrial Energy Users-Ohio and Defendant Charles E. Jones filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Meet-and-Confer Tracking Chart) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTATION ORDER granting (345) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shanaye Y. Carvajal in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on September 30, 2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jlk)
September 28, 2022 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class [Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Class Certification] filed by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hillary B. Stakem in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit H - Expert Rebuttal Report of Cynthia L. Jones, CFA, #3 Exhibit I - Expert Rebuttal Report of W. Scott Dalrymple, CFA, #4 Exhibit J - FE_CIV_SEC_0588238-45, #5 Exhibit K - FE_CIV_SEC_0588232-37, #6 Exhibit L - Brad Duff Depo Tr., #7 Exhibit M - Eleanor Innes Depo Tr., #8 Exhibit N - Esmeralda del Bosque Depo Tr., #9 Exhibit O - John Schmitt Depo Tr., #10 Exhibit P - Jennifer Marietta-Westberg, Ph.D. Depo Tr., #11 Text of Proposed Order [Revised Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER - The in-person discovery hearing set for 9/29/22 is VACATED. Defendant Jones and third-party IEU-Ohio are ORDERED to submit a joint status report on or before October 3, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of their dispute. If the parties have not reached agreement regarding the subpoena production, the Court will hold a telephonic status conference with the disputing parties, on October 6, 2022, at 11:00am, in order to set a briefing schedule on the dispute. Counsel for the disputing parties shall call 1-888-684-8852 to participate in the telephone conference. The conference access code is 3189690 and the security code is 3785. No other party is required to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/27/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTATION ORDER: The parties came before the Court to discuss a briefing schedule for the dispute outlined in their recent status report (Doc. 337 ). The Court SETS the schedule as follows: Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling must file their Motions to Compel by 10/6/2022; Partners for Progress shall file one response to both motions within twenty-one (21) days of both motions being filed; Plaintiffs and Defendant Dowling shall have ten (10) days to reply thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/26/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 26, 2022 Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 9/26/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTATION ORDER: Based on the Joint Status Report (Doc. 337 ), the Court SETS a telephonic status conference for 9/26/2022 at 1:00pm, at which the Court will set a briefing schedule for the dispute outlined by Lead Plaintiff, Defendant Dowling, and Partners for Progress. Counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. The conference access code is 3189690 and the security code is 3785. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/22/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 21, 2022 Filing 134 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, Defendant Michael J. Dowling, and Third-Party Partners for Progress by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER - Based on the Joint Status Report (Doc. 335 ), the Court does not find that an in-person status conference is immediately necessary, and VACATES the status conference set for September 8, 2022, at 11:00am. Lead Plaintiff, Defendant Dowling, and Partners for Progress are ORDERED to submit a joint status report on or before September 21, 2022, updating the Court on the progress of their dispute. If at that time, the parties have not reached agreement as to supplementation of the privilege log, the Court will hold a telephonic status conference to set a briefing schedule as to the threshold issue of creating a privilege log. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/7/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
September 6, 2022 Filing 132 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Movant Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Murray, Joseph)
August 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 OPINION AND ORDER granting (319) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (122) Motion to Compel in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. is ORDERED to make available one or more corporate representatives for a second Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, for which Jones and Dowling may have the seven (7) hours for questioning contemplated by the Rule. Additionally, FirstEnergy is ORDERED to pay Jones' and Dowling's reasonable costs and expenses associated with attending the second deposition, including court reporter costs, as well as Jones' and Dowling's reasonable attorney's fees associated with preparing the instant motion. The parties are ORDERED to appear before the Court for an in-person status conference on Thursday, September 8, 2022, at 11:00am in Courtroom 203. A joint status report on the progress of discovery will be due on Tuesday, September 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/19/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2) Modified on 8/22/2022 to correct date for status report (jr).
August 19, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2022. Status Conference set for 9/8/2022 @ 11:00am in Courtroom 203 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 17, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE by Defendant Dennis Chack Of Joinder In FirstEnergy Corp., et. al.'s (ECF Doc. #327) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
August 17, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE by Defendant Michael Dowling Of Joinder In FirstEnergy Corp., et. al.'s (ECF Doc. #327) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
August 17, 2022 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re (293 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Certify Class by Nonspeaking Defendants Michael Dowling, Dennis Chack, and Ty Pine filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE Zheng (Jane) He as counsel for Defendant Leila Vespoli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/17/22. (jr)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE Zheng (Jane) He as counsel for Defendant Leila Vespoli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/17/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
August 16, 2022 Filing 125 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Zheng (Jane) He] by Defendant Leila Vespoli. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (He, Jane)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: The parties represent that they have reached an impasse regarding designation of documents and testimony under the protective order. They are ORDERED to submit letter briefs on their relative positions, not to exceed 3 single-spaced pages, by email to jolson_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov on or before 8/18/2022. Additionally, the Court sets a Telephone Status Conference for 8/22/2022 @ 10:30am before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/12/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 3, 2022 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re (319 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 122 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Compel Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of FirstEnergy filed by Defendants Michael Dowling, Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
July 22, 2022 Filing 122 MOTION to Compel Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of FirstEnergy ( Responses due by 7/29/2022) by Defendants Michael Dowling, Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - FirstEnergy Script, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - FirstEnergy Responses and Objections to Deposition Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - 5-3-22 Meet and Confer Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 6 - 5-3-22 Meet and Confer Topic Chart, #8 Exhibit 7 - 5-9-22 Meet and Confer Correspondence, #9 Exhibit 8 - 6-29-22 Meet and Confer Email Correspondence, #10 Exhibit 9 - 6-29-22 Meet and Confer Correspondence, #11 Exhibit 10 - JD Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 11 - JD Exhibit 25) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting (317) Joint Motion and Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ. Lead Plaintiff's motion to compel due by 11/22/2022 - First Energy's response due by 12/16/2022 - Lead Plaintiff's reply due by 12/23/2022; Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2023; Primary Expert due by 8/1/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 9/28/2023; Reply Expert due by 11/1/2023; Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2024; Status Report re: privilege dispute due by 11/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/22/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery (Expert) due by 12/15/2023; Discovery (Fact) due by 6/30/2023; Primary Expert due by 8/1/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 9/28/2023; Status Report due by 11/14/2022; Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2024; Motions to Compel due by 11/22/2022 - Responses due by 12/16/2022 - Replies due by 12/23/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER regarding discovery disputes: Jones and Dowling's Motion to Compel due by July 22, 2022; FirstEnergy's response in opposition due by July 29, 2022; Jones and Dowling's reply due by August 3, 2022. Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Compel due by July 22, 2022; FirstEnergy's response in opposition due by July 29, 2022; Lead Plaintiff's reply due by August 3, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/15/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/7/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS RELATING TO PROTOCOL FOR UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE: PROTOCOL FOR FACT DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
June 27, 2022 Filing 116 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTATION ORDER granting (296) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yiqing Shi as co-counsel; granting (297) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew C. Johnson as co-counsel in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (113) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yiqing Shi as co-counsel; granting (114) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew C. Johnson as co-counsel in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on June 16, 2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jlk)
June 14, 2022 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8910668) of Andrew C. Johnson( Responses due by 7/5/2022) by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-DC, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-California) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Arnold, James)
June 14, 2022 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8910641) of Yiqing Shi( Responses due by 7/5/2022) by Defendant Leila Vespoli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-New York) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Arnold, James)
June 10, 2022 Filing 112 PRIVILEGE LOG SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT PROTOCOL FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/10/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTATION ORDER granting #102 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steve Grimes; granting #103 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dan K. Webb as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on June 7, 2022. (jlk)
May 19, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick O'Connor for Defendant Donald Schneider Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (O'Connor, Brian)
May 16, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE by Defendant Michael Dowling of Service of Subpoena on Generation Now Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: Because the parties were able to resolve their dispute regarding the deposition of Defendant Steven E Strah, the telephonic status conference set for May 11, 2022 @ 11:00am is VACATED. Further, Defendant Strah's (266) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ is DENIED as moot. The 30(b)(6) depositions already scheduled in this action must proceed within the bounds of the Court's previous orders. The Court will not revisit either of its prior rulings on the 30(b)(6) depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/11/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 10, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE by Defendant Michael Dowling of Service of Subpoena on Partners for Progress Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer to resolve the discovery dispute at hand. They are FURTHER ORDERED to join the Joint Status Report due on 5/9/2022, described by the Court's prior Order (see Doc. 259). In that report, they must describe their efforts to end their bickering. Should they fail to reach extrajudicial resolution, the Court will implement a process for managing discovery moving forward, which will include in-person hearings with counsel, cost shifting, and the appearance of the parties or deponents before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/6/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re (265 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Joint Status Report: The Court holds that Lead Plaintiff may have up to one hour for its cross-noticed examination of FirstEnergy's corporate representative. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/4/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re (266 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) Motion for Protective Order: Briefing on the motion is STAYED. The Court ORDERS the parties to further meet and confer to resolve their dispute, and to file a Joint Status Report by 5/9/2022. Should the parties be unable to reach a resolution on their own, a Telephone Status Conference is set for 5/11/2022 @ 11:00am before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/4/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
May 2, 2022 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8846857) of Dan K. Webb( Responses due by 5/23/2022) by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 2, 2022 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8846833) of Steve Grimes( Responses due by 5/23/2022) by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTATION ORDER granting #100 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk shall TERMINATE Wendy West Feinstein as counsel for Defendant Dennis Chack. The Clerk shall designate Douglas M. Mansfield as the trial attorney for Defendant Dennis Chack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/18/22. (jr)
April 15, 2022 Filing 100 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Wendy West Feinstein ( Responses due by 5/6/2022) by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Feinstein, Wendy)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court emphasizes that it intends to grant no further extensions to the case schedule. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report by 5/13/2022 setting forth a proposed deadline for substantial completion of document production. The Court adopts deadlines as follows: Class Certification Motion due by 6/6/2022; Motions to Amend due by 9/30/2022; Discovery (Expert) due by 10/6/2023; Discovery (Fact) due by 4/28/2023; Dispositive motions due by 11/21/2023; Primary Expert due by 5/29/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 7/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/14/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTATION ORDER granting #96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Daniel S. Magy shall be TERMINATED as counsel for Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/14/22. (jr)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTATION ORDER granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Daniel S. Magy shall be TERMINATED as counsel for Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/14/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
April 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/13/2022 Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
April 12, 2022 Filing 96 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DANIEL S. MAGEY ( Responses due by 5/3/2022) by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Trafford, Robert)
April 11, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah M. Smith for Defendant Michael Dowling Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Smith, Hannah)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTATION ORDER granting #87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brittany M. Wilson as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 8, 2022. (jlk)
April 8, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerhardt A Gosnell, II for Defendant Leila Vespoli Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Gosnell, Gerhardt)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTATION ORDER GRANTING Motion to Substitute Attorney. James E. Arnold is substituted as lead counsel for Defendant Leila Vespoli. David H. Wallace is TERMINATED as counsel for Defendant Leila Vespoli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/8/22. (jr)
April 8, 2022 This entry is being made for statistical purposes only re #91 . (jlk)
April 6, 2022 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8810771) of Eric M. Kim( Responses due by 4/27/2022) by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Trafford, Robert)
April 5, 2022 Filing 90 MOTION to Substitute Attorney ( Responses due by 4/26/2022) by Defendant Leila Vespoli. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Arnold, James)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTATION ORDER granting (216) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter E Borkon and F. Joseph Warin terminated; granting (217) Motion in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter E Borkon and F. Joseph Warin terminated; granting (85) Motion in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/24/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTATION ORDER granting #78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher W.H. Sullivan terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/24/22. (jr)
March 23, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8786783) of Brittany M. Wilson by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Teaberry, Jeremy)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION and ORDER issued in that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. 160 is GRANTED IN PART as to the non-management Director Defendants in Count IV only and is DENIED in all other respects. Defendant Pines Motion to Dismiss 166 is GRANTED IN PART as to Count II and is DENIED IN PART as to Count I. The remaining Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant Reffner 162 , Defendant Judge 164 , Defendant Dowling 165 , Defendant Chack 168 , Defendant Schneider 170 , the Underwriter Defendants 171 , Defendant Vespoli 172 , and Defendant Jones 174 each are DENIED. The partial dismissals are without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/7/22. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (sem)
February 22, 2022 Filing 85 MOTION by Movant State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Borkon, Peter) Modified text/event on 3/1/2022 (jlk).
February 18, 2022 Filing 84 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney F. Joseph Warin by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason R. Meltzer as co-counsel; granting #82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Hur as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on February 17, 2022. (jlk)
February 10, 2022 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8717966) of Robert K. Hur by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTATION ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of George A. Stamboulidis. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/4/2022. (er)
December 31, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8655247) of George A. Stamboulidis by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
December 10, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8632963) of Jason R. Meltzer by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
December 10, 2021 Filing 78 Notice to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (jlk).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JOINT PROTOCOL ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/5/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (kk2)
August 9, 2021 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re (64 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 174 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum in Support] filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Warren, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re (61 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 165 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, (160 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 58 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re (171 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., BoFa Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, PNC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Santander Investment Securities, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Trafford, Robert)
August 2, 2021 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re (62 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 168 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
August 2, 2021 Filing 71 REPLY to 176 Response to Motion re (60 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 164 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant John Judge. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Walton, Victor) Modified link on 8/3/2021 (jlk).
July 29, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney (by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Fraser, Kirsten) Modified on 9/8/2021 (jr).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 183 in 2:20-cv-3785 Motion for Extension of Time: Reply due by 8/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/26/2021. (ew)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTATION ORDER granting (182) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin Robert Donoho terminated in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin Robert Donoho terminated in case 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/22/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jr)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTATION ORDER - Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendant's Motion for Extension (66 in 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 183 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) no later than July 23, 2021. The opposition shall be no longer than three single-spaced pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/21/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ (jr)
July 20, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (174 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum in Support] New date requested 8/12/2021. ( Responses due by 8/10/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Lin, Albert)
July 20, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Justin R. Donoho) ( Responses due by 8/10/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
May 18, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum in Support] ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Albert G. Lin in Support of Defendant Charles E. Jones's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Albert G. Lin Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Albert G. Lin Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Warren, Daniel)
May 18, 2021 Filing 63 BRIEF re(168 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant Dennis Chack. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas Mansfield, #2 Exhibit Form 4s, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant Michael Dowling. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
May 18, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendant John Judge. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Walton, Victor)
May 18, 2021 Filing 59 BRIEF re(160 in 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts in Support of FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws, #2 Exhibit A: Excerpt 2021 10-K, #3 Exhibit B: Excerpt 2020 10-Q, #4 Exhibit C: Strah Form 4 (2017), #5 Exhibit D: Strah Form 4 (2020), #6 Exhibit E: Taylor Form 4 (2017), #7 Exhibit F: Taylor Form 4 (2018), #8 Exhibit G: Pearson Form 4 (2017), #9 Exhibit H: Pearson Form 4 (2019)) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the Consolidated Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws ( Responses due by 6/8/2021) by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Paul Guran for Defendant John Judge Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Guran, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Brunner for Defendant John Judge Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Brunner, Joseph)
May 18, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor A Walton, Jr for Defendant John Judge Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Walton, Victor)
May 7, 2021 Filing 54 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 16, 2020, before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawna J. Evans, Telephone number 614-719-3316. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Evans, Shawna)
April 16, 2021 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Yurkiw, Jay)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTATION ORDER granting (144) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Mendro in case 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ AND #51 Motion for Leave to Appeal Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Mendro in case 2:20-cv-4287 as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 9, 2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (jlk)
April 5, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8249736) of Jason J. Mendro( Responses due by 4/26/2021) by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Rendon, Carole)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court VACATES the Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 30, 2021 at 10:00a.m. in Case No. 2:20-cv-3785. Answers/motions to dismiss due by 5/18/2021. Responses due by 7/2/2021 Replies due by 8/2/2021. Settlement Demand due by 4/23/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/29/2021. (daf) Modified on 3/30/2021 (jr).
March 29, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M Mansfield for Defendant Dennis Chack Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Mansfield, Douglas)
March 23, 2021 Filing 48 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey)
March 23, 2021 Filing 47 STIPULATION and Joint Motion Regarding Case Schedule by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia Johnson, Jason Lisowski, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed Order]) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Ritts, Geoffrey) Modified event on 3/26/2021 (jlk).
March 23, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8229910) of Michael L. Kichline and Laura Hughes( Responses due by 4/13/2021) by Defendant Dennis Chack. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Feinstein, Wendy)
March 19, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy West Feinstein for Defendant Dennis Chack Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Feinstein, Wendy)
March 16, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael Dowling Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (Favret, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by John F McCaffrey for Defendant Michael Dowling Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03785-ALM-KAJ, 2:20-cv-04287-ALM-KAJ (McCaffrey, John)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Initial Case Schedule: Consolidated Complaint due by 2/26/2021. Answer due 60 days after filing of Complaint. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss the Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file their response no later than 45 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss. Reply due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/26/2021. (ew)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Regarding Initial CaseSchedule: Consolidated Complaint due within 60 days. Answer due 60 days after filing of Complaint. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss the Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file their response no later than 45 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss. Reply due 30 days thereafter. It is further ORDERED that the parties will submit all future filings in these consolidated cases under the caption In re FirstEnergy Corp. Securities Litigation, No. 2:20-cv-03785. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/14/2020. (ew)
December 10, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION and Stipulation Regarding Initial Case Schedule by Defendants First Energy Corp, James F. Pearson, Steven Strath, K. Jon Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 8, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Baumann for Defendants First Energy Corp, James F. Pearson, Steven Strath, K. Jon Taylor (Baumann, Jordan)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/23/2020. (cw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 38 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Patrick Dahlstrom as to re #29 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, was returned as "attempt unknown". (jlk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Movant IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS MOTION OF IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Wagoner, Robert)
November 12, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Movant James J Durrett, Jr re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Cummins, James)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTATION ORDER granting #30 #31 and #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Barenbaum, Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr., and Nicole Lavallee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 30, 2020. (jlk)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The deadline for Defendants' answer, motion, or other response to the complaint is postponed, pending appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/29/2020. (ew)
October 29, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7730533) of Joseph J. Tobacco, Jr. by Plaintiffs CalPERS, Chana Frand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tobacco Jr. Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Tobacco Jr. Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
October 29, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7730522) of Nicole Lavallee by Plaintiffs CalPERS, Chana Frand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lavalee Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Lavalee Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
October 29, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7730503) of Daniel E. Barenbaum by Plaintiffs CalPERS, Chana Frand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Barenbaum Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Barenbaum Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel , #20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL : Virtual Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2020 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley.via video conference virtual courtroom. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/28/2020. (cw)
October 22, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION and Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendants First Energy Corp, James F. Pearson, Steven Strath, K. Jon Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Movant The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement to Withdraw Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (Serrani, Victoria)
October 19, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Movant The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions (Serrani, Victoria)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTATION ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 13, 2020. (jlk)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-3785 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham and Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/08/2020. (mdr)
October 7, 2020 Filing Fee Received re #13 PHV Motion of of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan: $600. Receipt Number: 200COL063428. (ew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Movant James J Durrett, Jr of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Consolidation of the Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel (Cummins, James)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTATION ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A, Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood, II and Patrick V. Dahlstrom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 09/29/2020. (mdr)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Movant The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Victoria L. Serrani Ferrise, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Serrani, Victoria)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL by Movant IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Damages Analysis, #2 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit Cert & Schedule A, #4 Exhibit Pomerantz Resume, #5 Exhibit Wagoner Resume, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wagoner, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff CalPERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Declaration to Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Karon, Daniel)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Responses due by 10/19/2020), MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Movant James J Durrett, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James R. Cummins, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cummins, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-7676911) of Jeremy A. Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood II and Patrick V. Dahlstrom by Plaintiff Chana Frand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Wagoner, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTATION ORDER Granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Justin Robert Donoho. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 09/25/2020. (mdr)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7672628) of Justin Robert Donoho by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan (mdr)
September 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/6/2020. (mdr)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warin COGS, #2 Exhibit Scherman COGS, #3 Exhibit Sullivan COGS) (Rendon, Carole)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Rendon, Carole)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants First Energy Corp, James F. Pearson, Steven Strath, K. Jon Taylor (Faxon, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants First Energy Corp, James F. Pearson, Steven Strath, K. Jon Taylor (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant First Energy Corp. (Ritts, Geoffrey) Modified filing party on 9/10/2020 (kk2)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants First Energy Corp, James F. Pearson, Steven Strath, K. Jon Taylor (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to K. Jon Taylor on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Wagoner, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Steven Strath on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Wagoner, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to James F. Pearson on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Wagoner, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to First Energy Corp on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Wagoner, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Charles E. Jones on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Wagoner, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against First Energy Corp, et al. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7619659), filed by Chana Frand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (Wagoner, Robert) Modified text on 8/24/2020 (mdr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frand v. First Energy Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Energy Corp
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Represented By: Justin Robert Donoho
Represented By: Albert Grant Lin
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Christopher W.H. Sullivan
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: William Scherman
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Represented By: George A. Stamboulidis
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Strath
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Brittany Marie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chana Frand
Represented By: Robert J Wagoner
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: Daniel E. Barenbaum
Represented By: Nicole Lavallee
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CalPERS
Represented By: Daniel Richard Karon
Represented By: Daniel E. Barenbaum
Represented By: Nicole Lavallee
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James J Durrett, Jr.
Represented By: James Rubin Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Serrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: IRONWORKERS LOCALS 40, 361 & 417 UNION SECURITY FUNDS
Represented By: Robert J Wagoner
Represented By: Robert J. Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?