Kaltenbach v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angela M. Kaltenbach
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv04314
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and File Certified Administrative Record as to Commissioner of Social Security. Answer and Administrative Record due 11/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/16/2020. (EPD)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 11/23/2020. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sorkin, Adam)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to the regenerating of the Complaint on 8/26/2020, Defendant's Answer is due 10/26/2020. (jlk)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 10/26/2020. Per the Order granting the IFP and regenerating of the Identification Form, the answer date is set. (jlk) Modified answer due date pursuant to filing error; Complaint regenerated on 8/26/2020 (jlk).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Angela M. Kaltenbach. (jlk) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/26/2020) (jlk).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In accordance with the Magistrate Judges' General Order Concerning Social Security Appeals (S.D. Ohio E.D. January 1, 2016) and Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1: Administrative record due 60 days after service of summons and complaint, statement of errors due 45 days thereafter, memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's statement of errors within 45 days after service of the statement of errors and Plaintiff's reply, if any, must be filed fifteen 15 days later. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 25, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (jlk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angela M. Kaltenbach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaltenbach v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Kaltenbach
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?