Stavely v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: NANCY G STAVELY
Defendant: JAMES F O'NEIL III, STEVEN E STRAH, CHARLES E JONES, EBONY YEBOAH-AMANKWAH, LUIS A REYES, MICHAEL J DOWLING, JULIA L JOHNSON, DONALD T MISHEFF, Steven J Demetriou, LESLIE M TURNER, THOMAS N MITCHELL, MICHAEL J ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER D PAPPAS, FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION, JAMES F PEARSON, SANDRA PIANALTO, ROBERT P REFFNER, K JON TAYLOR, K. Jon Taylor, Steven E. Strah, James F O'Neil, III, First Energy Corporation and James F. Pearson
Case Number: 2:2020cv04598
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - the Court ORDERS The City of Philadelphia to appear at the previously scheduled hearing on Monday, November 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/29/2020. (cw)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-5529 IS related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 24 and 2:20CV5128 #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/21/2020. (cw)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 13, 2020. (jlk)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-4534, 2:20-cv-3785, 2:20-cv-5237, 2:20-cv-4813, 2:20-cv-5020, and 2:20-cv-5128 are related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge Sarah D. Morrison, and Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/8/2020. (kk2)
October 7, 2020 Filing Fee Received re #9 PHV Motion of of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan: $600. Receipt Number: 200COL063428. (ew)
September 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/7/2020. (daf)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. (daf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warin COGS, #2 Exhibit Scherman COGS, #3 Exhibit Sullivan COGS) (Rendon, Carole)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael J Dowling (Favret, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Faxon, Robert)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert P Reffner, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7639797), filed by NANCY G STAVELY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nancy G. Stavely Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mordarski, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stavely v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES F O'NEIL III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN E STRAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES E JONES
Represented By: Christopher W.H. Sullivan
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: William Scherman
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBONY YEBOAH-AMANKWAH
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS A REYES
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J DOWLING
Represented By: John A Favret, III
Represented By: John F McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIA L JOHNSON
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD T MISHEFF
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J Demetriou
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE M TURNER
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS N MITCHELL
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ANDERSON
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER D PAPPAS
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES F PEARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA PIANALTO
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT P REFFNER
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K JON TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F O'Neil, III
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Energy Corporation
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY G STAVELY
Represented By: Daniel R Mordarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?