Long Point Energy, LLC v. Gulfport Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Long Point Energy, LLC
Defendant: Jill E. Perkins, Jackie M Perkins, Robert Garrison, Mitchell G Perkins, Rice Drilling D LLC, Nancy L Garrison, Phillip J Perkins, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Gulfport Appalachia LLC, Dedra D Perkins and Michael A Perkins
Case Number: 2:2020cv04644
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Gulfport Appalachia LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation, Rice Drilling D LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Long Point Energy, LLC filed by Jill E. Perkins, Nancy L Garrison, Mitchell G Perkins, Phillip J Perkins, Dedra D Perkins, Jackie M Perkins, Michael A Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - DR Vol. 669, Page 29, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - OR Vol. 755, Page 728, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - DR Vol. 373, Page 127, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - DR Vol. 373, Page 436, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - DR Vol. 368, Page 338, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - DR Vol. 526, Page 642, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - DR Vol. 526, Page 643, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - DR Vol. 501, Page 710, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - DR Vol. 368, Page 380, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - DR Vol. 523, Page 462, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Agreed Judgment Entry) (Wilson, Craig)
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Gulfport Energy Corporation & Gulfport Appalachia LLC. (West, John) Modified filing parties on 11/10/2020 (kk2)
November 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines per #18 Stipulation filed on 11/05/2020: Rice Drilling D LLC answer due 11/25/2020. (mdr)
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION Stipulation for the Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Rice Drilling D LLC. (Huda, Syed)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Robert Garrison by Defendants Nancy L Garrison, Dedra D Perkins, Jackie M Perkins, Jill E. Perkins, Michael A Perkins, Mitchell G Perkins, Phillip J Perkins. (Wilson, Craig)
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig J. Wilson for Defendants Nancy L Garrison, Dedra D Perkins, Jackie M Perkins, Jill E. Perkins, Michael A Perkins, Mitchell G Perkins, Phillip J Perkins (Wilson, Craig)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Mitchell G Perkins on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy)
October 19, 2020 Notice of Correction re #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13 #14 (Waivers of Service Executed): The docket text of each of these entries has been corrected to reflect the appropriate service and answer due dates for each party served (kk2)
October 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Nancy L Garrison; Robert Garrison; Dedra D Perkins; Jackie M Perkins; Jill E. Perkins; Michael A Perkins; and Phillip J Perkins answers due 11/16/2020 (kk2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robert Garrison on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct service and answer due dates (kk2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Phillip J Perkins on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct service and answer due dates (kk2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nancy L Garrison on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct service and answer due dates (kk2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael A Perkins on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct service and answer due dates (kk2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jill E. Perkins on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct service and answer due dates (kk2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jackie M Perkins on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct service and answer due dates (kk2)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Dedra D Perkins on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2020 to correct service and answer due dates (kk2)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Rice Drilling D LLC on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Baronzzi and Ryan Timothy Steele for Defendant Rice Drilling D LLCSEE DOCKET #6 FOR DOCUMENT (kk2)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Syed Ahmadul Huda for Defendant Rice Drilling D LLC (Huda, Syed)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Gulfport Appalachia LLC on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Gulfport Energy Corporation on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Pettorini, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Amended Certificate of Service re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Long Point Energy, LLC (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (kk2)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Long Point Energy, LLC (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (kk2).
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7642672), filed by Long Point Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K, #2 Exhibits L-T, #3 Exhibits U-CC, #4 Exhibits DD-MM, #5 Exhibits NN-RR) (Pettorini, Timothy) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (kk2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long Point Energy, LLC v. Gulfport Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill E. Perkins
Represented By: Craig J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie M Perkins
Represented By: Craig J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell G Perkins
Represented By: Craig J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice Drilling D LLC
Represented By: Syed Ahmadul Huda
Represented By: Ryan Timothy Steele
Represented By: Christopher J Baronzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L Garrison
Represented By: Craig J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip J Perkins
Represented By: Craig J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Appalachia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedra D Perkins
Represented By: Craig J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Perkins
Represented By: Craig J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Point Energy, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Batiste Pettorini
Represented By: James Benjamin Fraifogl
Represented By: Jeremy Dean Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?