Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Defendant: Charles E Jones, James F O'Neil, III, Steven E. Strah, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Jerry Sue Thornton, James F. Pearson, Julia L. Johnson, Christopher D. Pappas, William T. Cottle, Leslie M Turner, George M. Smart, Donald T. Misheff, Robert Reffner, Justin Biltz, Michael J. Anderson, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, K. Jon Taylor, Paul T. Addison, Luis A. Reyes, Sandra Pianalto, Michael J. Dowling, Thomas N. Mitchell and Massachusetts Laborer
Petitioner: Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp
Interested Party: City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Consolidated Plaintiff: Roberta Bloom, James Atherton, Arlene Pogolowitz and Joan Randell
Consolidated Defendant: John Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2020cv04813
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Response re #140 Notice (Other) requesting ex parte meeting by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Consol Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Camillus, John)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. in Connection to Discovery Conference (Gleeson, John)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTATION ORDER - Discovery in this matter is STAYED for fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/7/21. (jr)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 10/7/2021. (jr)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 JOINT PROTOCOL ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/5/2021. (kk2)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8525834) of Maeve O'Connor by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (Nitschke, Kathleen)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8525827) of John Gleeson by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (Nitschke, Kathleen)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8525795) of Susan Reagan Gittes by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (Nitschke, Kathleen)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #134 , #135 & #136 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Susan R. Gittes, John Gleeson and Maeve O'Connor. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/4/2021. (er)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis re #132 Response (non motion), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Response re #131 Notice (Other) to Plaintiffs' Notice of Further Developments Concerning the FirstEnergy Derivative Action Pending in the United States District Court, Northern District of Ohio by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Molly Bowen. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/15/2021. (er)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8490957) of Molly Bowen by Consol Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, filed by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Consol Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. re #95 MOTION for Leave to File to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Notice Withdrawing Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.'s Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal (Nitschke, Kathleen)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTATION ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sara DiLeo as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 28, 2021. (jlk)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTATION ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Sanborn-Lowing as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 28, 2021. (jlk)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8411265) of Sara Dileo by Plaintiff Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8411226) of Margaret Sanborn-Lowing by Plaintiff Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting (119) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; (41) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ;(62) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; (44) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; (24) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and (17) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJMotion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Kerin Lyn Kaminski and Karen L Giffen for FirstEnergy Corp. Attorneys Lawrence Heftman; Barry S. Hyman; Ann H. MacDonald; Kayvan B. Sadeghi; Kevin J. Whelan; Elise H. Yu; Daniel John Donnellon and James Alan Dyer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/20/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Stay) (Nitschke, Kathleen)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. ( Responses due by 8/9/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION for Leave to File to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by Defendants Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTATION ORDER - Defendant FirstEnergy is ORDERED to file any motion to stay by July 21, 2021. If FirstEnergy does not file such a motion, the parties shall file a joint status report by July 26, 2021, setting forth proposed case deadlines to govern this matter moving forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/1/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STATUS REPORT of Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Concerning Formation of a Special Litigation Committee by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting (59) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (107) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (38) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (41) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (21) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (14) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kayvan B. Sadeghi. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless he has done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting (58) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (106) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (37) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (40) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (20) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (13) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry S. Hyman, Larry H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yu, and Kevin J. Whelan. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ANSWER to #75 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ANSWER to #75 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ANSWER to #75 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Charles E Jones. (Warren, Daniel)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ANSWER to #75 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by James F. Pearson. (Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ANSWER to #75 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Michael J. Dowling. (McCaffrey, John)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 The D&O Defendants' ANSWER to #75 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ANSWER to #75 Complaint,, filed by FirstEnergy Corp.. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375667) of Kayvan B. Sadeghi( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Good Standing Cert.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375658) of Barry S. Hyman, Lawrence H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yo, Kevin J. Whelan( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by James Alan Dyer for Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Geoffrey J. Ritts substituting for /by James A. Dyer, Daniel J. Donnellon, Barry S. Hyman, Lawrence H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Kayvan B. Sadeghi, Elise H. Yu and Kevin J. Whelan as to Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #101 , #102 & #103 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D. Katsiff, David L. Axelrod & Emilia McKee Vassallo. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/24/2021. (er) Modified on 6/24/2021 (er).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8373298) of Emilia McKee Vassallo by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8373289) of David L. Axelrod by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8373269) of Timothy D. Katsiff by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION for Leave to File to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Consol Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Camillus, John)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Geoffrey J. Ritts substituting for /by Jeremy R. Teaberry, Timothy D. Katsiff, David L. Axelrod and Emilia McKee Vassallo as to Defendant James F. Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER LIFTING STAY, discovery may commence. The parties are DIRECTED to file a revised Rule 26(f) Report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. The Court will later address, in a separate order, whether and to what extent discovery between the securities and RICO actions will be coordinated. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/14/2021. (cw)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Defendant shall update the Court by 6/30/2021 re: whether it has created a SLC and, if so, when it intends to seek a stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/10/2021. (kk2)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) by Defendants Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Charles E Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Defts Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Darrell Arthur Clay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/18/2021. (ew)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying #79 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/11/2021. (cw)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Justin Biltz. (Clay, Darrell)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Warren, Daniel)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Joinder in the Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Derivative Complaint filed by the FirstEnergy Defendants by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Derivative Complaint by Defendant Michael J. Dowling. (McCaffrey, John)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Joinder in the Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Derivative Complaint filed by the FirstEnergy Defendants by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendants Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Camillus, John)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Mendro as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 19, 2021. (jlk)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8222076) of Jason J. Mendro by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mendro COGS) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Rendon, Carole)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Derivative Complaint filed by the FirstEnergy Defendants by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Defendant Charles E Jones. (Warren, Daniel)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Derivative Complaint filed by the FirstEnergy Defendants by Defendant Michael J. Dowling. (McCaffrey, John)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Derivative Complaint filed by the FirstEnergy Defendants by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Memorandum in Support of #79 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts in Support of FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Shareholders Derivative Complaint, #2 Exhibits A to H of Ritts Declaration) (Duffy, Marjorie) Modified as the document is not a Motion. Created linkage to Document #79 on 2/24/2021 (mdr).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Defendants Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Enforce Stay of Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/4/2021. (cw)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DISMISSING the City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement is terminated as a Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/29/2021. (cw)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis re #74 MOTION to Stay re #73 Order,, Defendants' Motion to Enforce Stay of Discovery of non-opposition to PSLRA stay (Camillus, John)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Consolidated against Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Charles E Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Exhibit Verification, #3 Exhibit Verification) (Camillus, John)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION to Stay re #73 Order,, Defendants' Motion to Enforce Stay of Discovery by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Justin Biltz, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Charles E Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER vacating the preliminary pretrial conference set for 1/13/2021 @ 11:00am. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their consolidated complaint w/in forty-five (45) days. Defendants must file their anticipated motion to dismiss w/in thirty (30) days of the consolidated complaint - plaintiffs' response due twenty-eight (28) days thereafter - defendants' reply due twenty-one (21) days thereafter. The parties shall file a revised Rule 26(f) report w/in ten (10) days of the Court's resolution of Defendants' forthcoming motion to stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/12/2021. (kk2)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RULE 26(f) REPORT Supplement by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Camillus, John)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTATION ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Rosenbloom as CO-COUNSEL; granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul Helms as CO-COUNSEL; granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven S. Scholes as CO-COUNSEL. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on January 6, 2021. (jlk)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTATION ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gail E. Lee as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on January 6, 2021. (jlk)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7945342) of Steven Samuel Scholes by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois) (Fairweather, John)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7945300) of Paul Michael Geraghty Helms by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois) (Fairweather, John)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7945261) of David S. Rosenbloom by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois) (Fairweather, John)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Justin Biltz, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Charles E Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7936185) of Gail E. Lee by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gail Lee Certificate of Good Standing) (Lape, Marcella)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTATION ORDER - This case was set for a Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 1/6/2021. The Rule 26(f) Report of the parties was due on 12/30/2020. Because the parties have yet to file the report, the Court CONTINUES the Pretrial Conference to 1/13/2021 @ 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/30/20. (jr)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Fairweather for Defendant Robert Reffner (Fairweather, John)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa S Del Grosso for Defendant Robert Reffner (Del Grosso, Lisa)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Geoffrey J. Ritts substituting for by/ John C. Fairweather, Steven S. Scholes, David S. Rosenbloom and Paul Helms as to Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION AND ORDER denying #48 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/21/2020. (er)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcella Lape for Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Lape, Marcella)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Geoffrey J. Ritts substituting for /by Marcella L. Lupe and Gail Lee as to Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTATION ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dianne Pitre as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on December 17, 2020. (jlk)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7855518) of Dianne Pitre by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Baumann for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Baumann, Jordan)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTATION ORDER - For good cause shown, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension (Doc. #50 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the forthcoming consolidated complaint within twenty-one (21) days of it being filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/24/20. (jr)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints re #44 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,, #45 Order by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Stay will be EXPEDITED. Plaintiff shall file its response within 14 days of the date of this Order, and Defendants shall file their reply brief within 7 days of Plaintiff's response. The preliminary pretrial conference currently set for December 2, 2020, (Doc. #46 ) is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 20, 2020. (jlk)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER regarding filing instructions going forward in the consolidated cases. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/18/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION and ORDER - Case No. 2:20-cv-05876 is consolidated with the FirstEnergy Derivative Actions. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 17, 2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jlk)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - GRANTS Plaintiffs' motions to consolidate. (No. 2:20-04813, ECF No. 24; No. 2:20-05128, ECF No. 3; No. 2:20-05529, ECF No. 3); GRANTS St. Louis Employees' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#24]; GRANTS Electrical Workers' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#3]; and DENIES Philadelphia Pension's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead Counsel [#3]. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 16, 2020. Modified text on 11/16/2020 (jlk).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE by Interested Party City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement of Filing of Non-Party Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Appointment of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief, #2 Declaration) (Haseley, John)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp re #31 MOTION for Joinder In Support of Motion of the Institutional Investors to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions, Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel (Davis, Donald)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lester Hooker, Maya Saxena & Thomas Curry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/6/2020. (er)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-7742183) of Maya Saxena, Lester Hooker, and Thomas Curry by Plaintiff Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Camillus, John)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Plaintiff Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis of filing opposition memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - notifying Plaintiff Atherton in 2:20CV5610 of the 11/9/2020 hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/3/2020. (cw)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, Justin Biltz, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Charles E Jones, Massachusetts Laborer, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah re #34 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Defts Notice of Non-Opposition to Consolidation of Related Derivative Actions (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - the Court ORDERS The City of Philadelphia to appear at the previously scheduled hearing on Monday, November 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/29/2020. (cw)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-5529 IS related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE by Interested Party City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Declaration and Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Haseley, John)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 #24 and 2:20CV5128 #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 331 - Columbus before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/21/2020. (cw)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Plaintiff Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis of Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene in Related NDOH Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 13, 2020. (jlk)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Joinder In Support of Motion of the Institutional Investors to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions, Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel by Defendant Massachusetts Laborer, Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Davis, Donald)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Plaintiff Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis of Motion to Intervene in Related NDOH Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell Arthur Clay for Defendant Justin Biltz (Clay, Darrell)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E Cascarilla for Defendant Justin Biltz (Cascarilla, Ralph)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-4598, 2:20-cv-4534, 2:20-cv-3785, 2:20-cv-5237, 2:20-cv-5020, and 2:20-cv-5128 are related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge Sarah D. Morrison, and Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/8/2020. (kk2)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received re #4 PHV Motion of of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan: $600. Receipt Number: 200COL063428. (ew)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Camillus, John)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Camillus for Plaintiff Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis (Camillus, John)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Justin Biltz on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to K. Jon Taylor on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Jerry Sue Thornton on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Leslie M Turner on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robert Reffner on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Luis A. Reyes on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; George M. Smart on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Steven E. Strah on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to James F O'Neil, III on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Christopher D. Pappas on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; James F. Pearson on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Sandra Pianalto on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Steven J. Demetriou on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Julia L. Johnson on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Donald T. Misheff on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Thomas N. Mitchell on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to FirstEnergy Corp. on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael J. Dowling on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael J. Anderson on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to William T. Cottle on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Paul T. Addison on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Charles E Jones on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Sparks, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Faxon, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael J. Dowling (Favret, John)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John F McCaffrey for Defendant Michael J. Dowling (McCaffrey, John)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan (mdr)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/6/2020. (mdr)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warin COGS, #2 Exhibit Scherman COGS, #3 Exhibit Sullivan COGS) (Rendon, Carole)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring this case from the docket of the Honorable Douglas R. Cole to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 9/14/20. (sct)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division, Case Number 1:20-cv-705. Case assigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (sct)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7648051), filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sparks, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Jones
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Christopher W.H. Sullivan
Represented By: F. Joseph Warin
Represented By: William Scherman
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F O'Neil, III
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Demetriou
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstEnergy Corp.
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Barry S. Hyman
Represented By: Kayvan B. Sadeghi
Represented By: Elise H. Yu
Represented By: James Alan Dyer
Represented By: Ann H. MacDonald
Represented By: Daniel John Donnellon
Represented By: Lawrence Heftman
Represented By: Kevin J. Whelan
Represented By: Kathleen A Nitschke
Represented By: Karen L Giffen
Represented By: Kerin Lyn Kaminski
Represented By: John Gleeson
Represented By: Maeve O'Connor
Represented By: Susan Reagan Gittes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Sue Thornton
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Emilia McKee Vassallo
Represented By: Jeremy R Teaberry
Represented By: Timothy D. Katsiff
Represented By: David L. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia L. Johnson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Pappas
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Cottle
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M Turner
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Smart
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Misheff
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reffner
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: John C Fairweather
Represented By: Lisa S Del Grosso
Represented By: Steven S. Scholes
Represented By: Paul Helms
Represented By: David S. Rosenbloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Biltz
Represented By: Darrell Arthur Clay
Represented By: Ralph E Cascarilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Anderson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Marcella Lape
Represented By: Gail E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Addison
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Reyes
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pianalto
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Dowling
Represented By: John F McCaffrey
Represented By: John A Favret, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. Mitchell
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Laborer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis
Represented By: Richard Stuart Wayne
Represented By: Robert R Sparks
Represented By: John C Camillus
Represented By: Maya Saxena
Represented By: Thomas Curry
Represented By: Lester Hooker
Represented By: Dianne Pitre
Represented By: Sara DiLeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: John C Camillus
Represented By: Alla Zayenchik
Represented By: Matthew Traylor
Represented By: Jeroen Van Kwawegen
Represented By: Dianne Pitre
Represented By: Margaret Sanborn-Lowing
Represented By: Sara DiLeo
Represented By: Margaret Shore Sanborn-Lowing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp
Represented By: Donald W Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roberta Bloom
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Ligaya T. Hernandez
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James Atherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Arlene Pogolowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joan Randell
Represented By: Michael J Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: Ligaya T. Hernandez
Represented By: David P Meyer
Represented By: Matthew R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?