KBW Investment Properties LLC v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: KBW Investment Properties LLC
Defendant: Alex Azar, Cassandra King, US Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Nina B Witkofsky, Franklin County Municipal Columbus Ohio and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Petitioner: Lisa Cramer
Intervenor: James Cooper, Gladys Laurore, Judge Patrick Gallagher and Phishelle Howze
Case Number: 2:2020cv04852
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 JUDGMENT. Case Terminated. (ds)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 10/9/2020. (ds)
October 9, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff KBW Investment Properties LLC. (Hatzifotinos, Dimitri)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff KBW Investment Properties LLC. (Hatzifotinos, Dimitri)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER - Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/29/2020. (ds)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/29/20. (ds)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 Transcript of Telephone Status Conference Proceedings held on September 25, 2020, before Senior Judge James L. Graham. Court Reporter/Transcriber Allison Lewis Kimmel, FAPR, RDR, CRR, CRC, Telephone number 614.719.3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2020. (ak)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Franklin County Municipal Columbus Ohio. (Sperlazza, William)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Quash by Intervenor Patrick Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena) (Sweeney, Kelley)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion for TRO; granting #8 Motion to Quash; granting #12 Motion to Quash; granting; granting #13 Motion to Quash; #14 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/25/20. (ds) Modified on 9/28/2020 (ds).
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/15/2020 @1:00 PM in Courtroom 331 - Columbus before Judge James L. Graham. (ds)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Quash by Intervenor James Cooper. (Horne, Benjamin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Intervenor Gladys Laurore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Benson, Melissa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Quash by Intervenor Phishelle Howze. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena copy) (Lee, Peggy)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Leslie Cooper Vigen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 09/24/2020. (mdr)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Leslie Cooper Vigen (mdr) Please disregard as issued in error. Modified on 9/24/2020 (mdr).
September 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/8/2020. (mdr)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Leslie Cooper Vigen by Defendants Alex Azar, US Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B Witkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing from the District of Columbia Bar) (Wolfe, Leah)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Petitioner Lisa Cramer. (Lawson, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/21/2020. (ds)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 9/25/2020 @2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge James L. Graham. (ds)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff KBW Investment Properties LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Hatzifotinos, Dimitri)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mdr)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff KBW Investment Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hatzifotinos, Dimitri)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Hatzifotinos, Dimitri)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7659497), filed by KBW Investment Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-d, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Hatzifotinos, Dimitri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KBW Investment Properties LLC v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Leah M. Wolfe
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By: Leah M. Wolfe
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina B Witkofsky
Represented By: Leah M. Wolfe
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Municipal Columbus Ohio
Represented By: William Anthony Sperlazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Leah M. Wolfe
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KBW Investment Properties LLC
Represented By: Dimitri Hatzifotinos
Represented By: Clint Bradley Charnes
Represented By: Solomon J. Parini
Represented By: Michael K. Jameson
Represented By: William Lloyd Willis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa Cramer
Represented By: Michael Jesse Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: James Cooper
Represented By: Benjamin Dodge Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gladys Laurore
Represented By: Melissa C Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Judge Patrick Gallagher
Represented By: Kelley Ann Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Phishelle Howze
Represented By: Peggy Pei-Chi Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?