Beck v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Alan Beck
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor, Christopher D. Pappas, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, Sandra Pianalto, James F. O'Neil, III, Michael J Anderson, James F. Pearson, FirstEnergy Corporation, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, Steven E. Strah, Robert Reffner, Leslie M. Turner, Luis A. Reyes, Thomas N. Mitchell and Julia L. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv05020
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Algenon L Marbley
3 Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Ritts, Geoffrey)
November 10, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jlk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Alan Beck (Borgess, Pamela)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - notifying Plaintiff Atherton in 2:20CV5610 of the 11/9/2020 hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/3/2020. (cw)
November 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah re #27 Order, Defts Notice of Non-Opposition to Consolidation of Related Derivative Actions (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - the Court ORDERS The City of Philadelphia to appear at the previously scheduled hearing on Monday, November 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/29/2020. (cw)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-5529 IS related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 #24 and 2:20CV5128 #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.
October 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Rendon, Carole)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-4813, 2:20-cv-4598, 2:20-cv-4534, 2:20-cv-3785, 2:20-cv-5237, and 2:20-cv-5128 are related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge Sarah D. Morrison, and Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/8/2020. (kk2)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-5192 and 2:20-cv-4534 are related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley & Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 10/8/2020. (kk2)
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael J Anderson on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Steven J. Demetriou on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; FirstEnergy Corporation on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Julia L. Johnson on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Donald T. Misheff on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Thomas N. Mitchell on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; James F. O'Neil, III on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Christopher D. Pappas on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; James F. Pearson on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Sandra Pianalto on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Robert Reffner on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Luis A. Reyes on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Steven E. Strah on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; K. Jon Taylor on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Leslie M. Turner on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020; Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Squitieri, Lee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Charles E. Jones on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Squitieri, Lee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael J. Dowling on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Squitieri, Lee)
October 6, 2020 NOTICE: The PPTC set for 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. (sln)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-4534 and 2:20-cv-3785 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison & Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/6/2020. (kk2)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael J. Dowling (Favret, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John F McCaffrey for Defendant Michael J. Dowling (McCaffrey, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2020 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Faxon, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Duffy, Marjorie)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FirstEnergy Corporation. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER Granting #6 and #9 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lee Squitieri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/02/2020. (mdr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7681040) of Lee Squitieri by Plaintiff Alan Beck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Borgess, Pamela)
October 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines re #6 : Deficiency Deadline due by 10/15/2020 (kk2)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lee Squitieri: The required certificate of good standing is not from the highest court of a State (kk2)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #4 & #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Justin A Kuehn and Fletcher W Moore by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/1/2020 (kk2)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7681040) of Lee Squitieri by Plaintiff Alan Beck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Borgess, Pamela)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7681033) of Fletcher W. Moore by Plaintiff Alan Beck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Borgess, Pamela)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7681021) of Justin Kuehn by Plaintiff Alan Beck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Borgess, Pamela)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mdr)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Michael J Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7673682), filed by Alan Beck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Borgess, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Pappas
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Misheff
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pianalto
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. O'Neil, III
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Anderson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstEnergy Corporation
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Demetriou
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Dowling
Represented By: John F McCaffrey
Represented By: John A Favret, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reffner
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M. Turner
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Reyes
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. Mitchell
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia L. Johnson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Beck
Represented By: Pamela A Borgess
Represented By: Justin A Kuehn
Represented By: Fletcher W Moore
Represented By: Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?