Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Indemnity Insurance Company and Trustgard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv05086
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ds)
September 9, 2022 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Counter Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hart, Emily)
June 21, 2022 Filing 40 For good cause shown, the parties Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline (ECF No. 39) is hereby GRANTED. The discovery deadline is now September 23, 2022. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 06/21/2022. (ds)
June 17, 2022 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 9/23/2022. by Counter Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hart, Emily)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Discovery due by 7/25/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/25/22. (ds)
March 23, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2022 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge James L. Graham. (ds)
February 10, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE by Counter Claimants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company, Defendants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company of Withdrawal as Co-Counsel for the Grange Defendants (Haque, Ali)
January 18, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Address by Emily S. Hart (Hart, Emily)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All discovery shall be completed by 60 days after the Court rules on the pending motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (ECF No. #26 .) Any dispositive motion shall be filed by 60 days after the deadline for completion of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 27, 2021. (jlk)
July 23, 2021 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Counter Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hart, Emily) Modified to removed date requested at request of filer on 7/23/2021 (kl).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - granting #30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #22 Preliminary Pretrial Order filed by Grange Indemnity Insurance Company. Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Dispositive motions due by 11/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on May 11, 2021. (jlk)
May 11, 2021 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Dispositive motions due by 11/15/2021. (jlk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Counter Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Simpson, Richard)
May 7, 2021 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #22 Preliminary Pretrial Order, New date requested 8/31/2021. by Defendant Grange Indemnity Insurance Company. (Sferra, Anne)
April 23, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company. (Sferra, Anne)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 otation ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due by 4/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/8/2021. (EPD)
April 7, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/23/2021. by Defendants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Sferra, Anne)
March 23, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Counter Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Simpson, Richard)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/21/2021. (sln)
January 20, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Protection Order by Defendants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company. (Sferra, Anne)
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hart, Emily)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 1/18/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 1/18/2021. Discovery due by 5/31/2021. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 1/18/2021. Dispositive motions due by 8/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/12/2021. (er)
January 6, 2021 NOTICE : The PPTC set for 1/7/2021 is VACATED. (See ECF No. #21 .) (sln)
December 29, 2020 Filing 21 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Counter Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hart, Emily)
December 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines per #20 Stipulation filed on 12/23/2020: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company answer due 1/18/2021. (mdr)
December 23, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead to Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hart, Emily)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by All Defendants. (Lindsmith, Quintin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
November 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Quintin Franc Lindsmith for Defendants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company (Lindsmith, Quintin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Marie Sferra for Defendants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company (Sferra, Anne)
November 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Grange Indemnity Insurance Company answer due 12/14/2020; Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company answer due 12/14/2020; Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company answer due 12/14/2020; Trustgard Insurance Company answer due 12/14/2020. (er)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead to Complaint by Defendants Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company. (Lindsmith, Quintin)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Simpson for Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Simpson, Richard)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Ashmore for Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Ashmore, Kimberly)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily S. Hart for Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Hart, Emily)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly Ashmore; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily S. Hart; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Simpson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 12, 2020. (jlk)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7707280) of Richard A. Simpson by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Georgiton, Peter)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7707249) of Emily S. Hart by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Georgiton, Peter)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7707211) of Kimberly A. Ashmore by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Georgiton, Peter)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Trustgard Insurance Company on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Georgiton, Peter)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Georgiton, Peter)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Grange Indemnity Insurance Company on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Georgiton, Peter)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Georgiton, Peter)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Georgiton, Peter)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company re #1 Complaint CIVIL COVER SHEET (Georgiton, Peter)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7678042), filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Georgiton, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company f/k/a Grange Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Anne Marie Sferra
Represented By: Quintin Franc Lindsmith
Represented By: Ali I. Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Anne Marie Sferra
Represented By: Quintin Franc Lindsmith
Represented By: Ali I. Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Anne Marie Sferra
Represented By: Quintin Franc Lindsmith
Represented By: Ali I. Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustgard Insurance Company
Represented By: Anne Marie Sferra
Represented By: Quintin Franc Lindsmith
Represented By: Ali I. Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter John Georgiton
Represented By: Richard A Simpson
Represented By: Kimberly A. Ashmore
Represented By: Rachel E. Shonebarger
Represented By: Emily S. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?