Babcock v. Online Information Services, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Robert W. Babcock
Defendant: Online Information Services, Inc. and Duke Energy
Case Number: 2:2020cv05187
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Robert W. Babcock (Perry, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Online Information Services, Inc.. (Vaisa, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #9 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/2/2020. (daf)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The November 2, 2020 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2020. Motions to Amend due by 12/31/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 11/13/2020. Discovery due by 6/16/2021. Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2021. Responses due by 7/30/2021 Replies due by 8/13/2021. Primary Expert due by 1/31/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/28/2021. Settlement Demand due by 3/1/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 3/15/2021. Mediation Deadline: 6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/30/2020. (daf)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Robert W. Babcock. (Perry, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Duke Energy. (McLean, James)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN per order ECF No #13 *** Unopposed MOTION for Disclosure INITIAL WITNESS by Defendant Duke Energy. (McLean, James) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (daf). Modified restriction on 11/4/2020 (jlk).
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Online Information Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Duke Energy's Motion to Dismiss) (Vaisa, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Online Information Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Duke Energy's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B - Duke Energy MTD Affidavit) (Vaisa, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2020 02:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Duke Energy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sue Vasilevic) (McLean, James)
October 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Duke Energy answer due 10/30/2020 pursuant to #4 Stipulation. (agm)
October 12, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Defendant Duke Energy. (McLean, James)
October 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Online Information Services, Inc. answer due 10/28/2020. (jlk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Duke Energy, Online Information Services, Inc., filed by Robert W. Babcock. (jlk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Defendant Online Information Services, Inc.. (Vaisa, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20CV005676 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7686601), filed by Online Information Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Compliance) (Vaisa, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babcock v. Online Information Services, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Online Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Raymond Vaisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy
Represented By: James E McLean, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Babcock
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?