Young v. Yost
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Dave Yost
Case Number: 2:2020cv05236
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 20-4199 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Huguette Nicole Young; case manager Virginia Lee Padgett, 513-564-7032. (er)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, (FILING FEE DUE) by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
October 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 11/11/2020 (kk2)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff fourteen (14) days to provide the Court with the relevant financial information necessary to rule on her #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/28/2020. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and to Narrow IFP Issues Ahead of a Potential Appeal by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Emergency Injunctive Relief) (daf)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a complete Application with the necessary financial information on or before October 21, 2020. Motions due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/07/2020. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Receive Service by Email through the Electronic Case Filing System by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope) (er)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Obtain Electronic Filing Rights by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope) (er)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for a Speedy Hearing Under Rule 57 of Fed R Civ P by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope) (er)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Summons Form, #5 USM 285 form, #6 Envelope, #7 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?