Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund
Defendant: STEVEN E STRAH, Christopher D Pappas, JAMES F O'NEILL III, Jerry Sue Thornton, James F. Pearson, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, William T. Cottle, George M Smart, Leslie M Turner, Donald T. Misheff, Robert Reffner, Steven J Demetriou, Michael J Anderson, Justin Biltz, Luis A Reyes, Thomas N Mitchell, K. Jon Taylor, Charles E. Jones, Michael J Dowling, Julia L Johnson, Sandra Pianalto, Paul T. Addison, Steven E. Strah, FirstEnergy Corp., John Does 1-50 and James F. O'Neil, III
Case Number: 2:2020cv05237
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Sarah D Morrison
3 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting (119) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; (41) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ;(62) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; (44) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; (24) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and (17) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJMotion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Kerin Lyn Kaminski and Karen L Giffen for FirstEnergy Corp. Attorneys Lawrence Heftman; Barry S. Hyman; Ann H. MacDonald; Kayvan B. Sadeghi; Kevin J. Whelan; Elise H. Yu; Daniel John Donnellon and James Alan Dyer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/20/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2)
July 19, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. ( Responses due by 8/9/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTATION ORDER - Defendant FirstEnergy is ORDERED to file any motion to stay by July 21, 2021. If FirstEnergy does not file such a motion, the parties shall file a joint status report by July 26, 2021, setting forth proposed case deadlines to govern this matter moving forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/1/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr)
June 30, 2021 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT of Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Concerning Formation of a Special Litigation Committee by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting (58) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (106) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (37) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (40) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (20) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (13) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry S. Hyman, Larry H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yu, and Kevin J. Whelan. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting (59) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (107) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (38) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (41) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (21) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (14) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kayvan B. Sadeghi. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless he has done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er)
June 24, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375667) of Kayvan B. Sadeghi( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Good Standing Cert.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375658) of Barry S. Hyman, Lawrence H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yo, Kevin J. Whelan( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by James Alan Dyer for Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
April 14, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Warren, Daniel)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTATION ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Mendro as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 19, 2021. (jlk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8222076) of Jason J. Mendro by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mendro COGS) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Rendon, Carole)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Stay will be EXPEDITED. Plaintiff shall file its response within 14 days of the date of this Order, and Defendants shall file their reply brief within 7 days of Plaintiff's response. The preliminary pretrial conference currently set for December 2, 2020, (Doc. 46 ) is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 20, 2020. (jlk)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER regarding filing instructions going forward in the consolidated cases. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/18/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw)
November 18, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION and ORDER - Case No. 2:20-cv-05876 is consolidated with the FirstEnergy Derivative Actions. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 17, 2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jlk)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - GRANTS Plaintiffs' motions to consolidate. (No. 2:20-04813, ECF No. 24; No. 2:20-05128, ECF No. 3; No. 2:20-05529, ECF No. 3); GRANTS St. Louis Employees' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#24]; GRANTS Electrical Workers' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#3]; and DENIES Philadelphia Pension's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead Counsel [#3]. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 16, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 16, 2020. (jlk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Rendon, Carole)
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund re #6 MOTION for Joinder with Institutional Investors to Consolidate, Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel (Davis, Donald)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTATION ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lometti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 5, 2020. (jlk)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTATION ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amy Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 5, 2020. (jlk)
November 5, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Paul T. Addison on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Michael J Anderson on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Justin Biltz on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; William T. Cottle on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Steven J Demetriou on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Michael J Dowling on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; FirstEnergy Corp. on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Julia L Johnson on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Charles E. Jones on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Donald T. Misheff on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Thomas N Mitchell on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; James F. O'Neil, III on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Christopher D Pappas on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; James F. Pearson on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Sandra Pianalto on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Robert Reffner on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Luis A Reyes on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; George M Smart on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Steven E. Strah on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; K. Jon Taylor on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Jerry Sue Thornton on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Leslie M Turner on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Davis, Donald)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel S. Sommers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 4, 2020. (jlk)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTATION ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Speirs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 4, 2020. (jlk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7739815) of Christopher Lometti by Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Donald)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - notifying Plaintiff Atherton in 2:20CV5610 of the 11/9/2020 hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/3/2020. (cw)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Toll. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on October 2, 2020. (jlk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE PAID - 0648-7735583 in the amount of $200.00) of Amy Miller by Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Donald) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (jlk).
November 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J Anderson, Justin Biltz, William T. Cottle, Steven J Demetriou, John Does 1-50, Michael J Dowling, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A Reyes, George M Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah re #9 Order, Defts Notice of Non-Opposition to Consolidation of Related Derivative Actions (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7728741) of Daniel S. Sommers by Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Donald)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7728714) of Richard A. Speirs by Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Donald)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7728681) of Steven J. Toll by Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Donald)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - the Court ORDERS The City of Philadelphia to appear at the previously scheduled hearing on Monday, November 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/29/2020. (cw)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-5529 IS related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stephen Faxon for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A Reyes, George M Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Faxon, Robert)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A Reyes, George M Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Duffy, Marjorie)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A Reyes, George M Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 24 and 2:20CV5128 #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/21/2020. (cw)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell Arthur Clay for Defendant Justin Biltz (Clay, Darrell)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E Cascarilla for Defendant Justin Biltz (Cascarilla, Ralph)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in support of Institutional Investors to Consolidate, Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. (Davis, Donald) Modified text on 11/16/2020 (jlk).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-3785, 2:20-cv-4534, 2:20-cv-4598, 2:20-cv-4813, 2:20-cv-5020, and 2:20-cv-5128 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison, Judge Edmund A. Sargus, & Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/8/2020. (kk2)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael J Dowling (Favret, John)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John F McCaffrey for Defendant Michael J Dowling (McCaffrey, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7690361), filed by Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Donald) Modified text on 10/6/2020 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN E STRAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D Pappas
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES F O'NEILL III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Sue Thornton
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Cottle
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M Smart
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M Turner
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Misheff
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reffner
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J Demetriou
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Anderson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Biltz
Represented By: Ralph E Cascarilla
Represented By: Darrell Arthur Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A Reyes
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N Mitchell
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Dowling
Represented By: John F McCaffrey
Represented By: John A Favret, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia L Johnson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pianalto
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Addison
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstEnergy Corp.
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: James Alan Dyer
Represented By: Ann H. MacDonald
Represented By: Barry S. Hyman
Represented By: Daniel John Donnellon
Represented By: Elise H. Yu
Represented By: Karen L Giffen
Represented By: Kayvan B. Sadeghi
Represented By: Kerin Lyn Kaminski
Represented By: Kevin J. Whelan
Represented By: Lawrence Heftman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. O'Neil, III
Represented By: Robert Stephen Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp.
Represented By: Donald W Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel S Sommers
Represented By: Donald W Davis, Jr
Represented By: Amy R. Miller
Represented By: Christopher Lometti
Represented By: Richard A. Speirs
Represented By: Adam Daniel Fuller
Represented By: Elizabeth J Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Steven J. Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?