The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Defendant: Thomas N Mitchell, K. Jon Taylor, Charles E. Jones, Ebony L Yeboah-Amankwah, Julia L Johnson, Donald T Misheff, Steven J Demetriou, Christopher D Pappas, Michael J Anderson, Steven E. Strah, Sandra Pianalto, Leslie M. Turner, James F O'Neil, III, James F. Pearson, Luis A Reyes and First Energy Corp.
Intervenor: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. and Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis
Case Number: 2:2020cv05529
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/29/2021. (cw)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Dismiss. This case is hereby closed.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/29/2021. (cw)
January 13, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (West, Nathaniel)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Stay will be EXPEDITED. Plaintiff shall file its response within 14 days of the date of this Order, and Defendants shall file their reply brief within 7 days of Plaintiff's response. The preliminary pretrial conference currently set for December 2, 2020, (Doc. 46 ) is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 20, 2020. (jlk)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER regarding filing instructions going forward in the consolidated cases. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/18/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw)
November 18, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION and ORDER - Case No. 2:20-cv-05876 is consolidated with the FirstEnergy Derivative Actions. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 17, 2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jlk)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - GRANTS Plaintiffs' motions to consolidate. (No. 2:20-04813, ECF No. 24; No. 2:20-05128, ECF No. 3; No. 2:20-05529, ECF No. 3); GRANTS St. Louis Employees' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#24]; GRANTS Electrical Workers' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#3]; and DENIES Philadelphia Pension's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead Counsel [#3]. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 16, 2020. (jlk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Rendon, Carole)
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to #14 Response to #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Haseley, John) Modified text on 11/6/2020 (er).
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7744357) of Andrew D. Abramowitz by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Haseley, John) Terminated on 11/25/2020 (jlk).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donnell Christopher Much. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 4, 2020. (jlk)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barbara A. Podell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 4, 2020. (jlk)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sherrie R. Savett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 4, 2020. (jlk)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael C. Dell'Angelo, IV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 4, 2020. (jlk)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Intervenor Parties Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - notifying Plaintiff Atherton in 2:20CV5610 of the 11/9/2020 hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/3/2020. (cw)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7735805) of Donnell C. Much by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Haseley, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7735795) of Barbara A. Podell by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Haseley, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7735786) of Sherrie R. Savett by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Haseley, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7735741) of Michael Dell'Angelo by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Haseley, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendants Michael J Anderson, Steven J Demetriou, First Energy Corp., Julia L Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T Misheff, Thomas N Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony L Yeboah-Amankwah re #5 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Defts Notice of Non-Opposition to Consolidation of Related Derivative Actions (Ritts, Geoffrey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael J Anderson on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Steven J Demetriou on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; First Energy Corp. on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Julia L Johnson on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Donald T Misheff on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Thomas N Mitchell on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; James F O'Neil, III on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Christopher D Pappas on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; James F. Pearson on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Sandra Pianalto on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Luis A Reyes on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Steven E. Strah on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; K. Jon Taylor on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Leslie M. Turner on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Ebony L Yeboah-Amankwah on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Haseley, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Charles E. Jones on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Haseley, John)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER -the Court ORDERS The City of Philadelphia to appear at the previously scheduled hearing on this matter. This hearing will occur on Monday, November 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley, via video conference virtual courtroom. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/27/2020. (cw)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-4534, 2:20-cv-4598, 2:20-cv-4813, 2:20-cv-5020, 2:20-cv-5128, 2:20-cv-5192, 2:20-cv-5237, and 2:20-cv-3785 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Edmund A. Sargus on 10/23/2020. (daf)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff ( Responses due by 11/13/2020) by Plaintiff The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Declaration and Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Haseley, John)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7718527), filed by The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet with Related Cases, #3 Exhibit Verification) (Haseley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony L Yeboah-Amankwah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T Misheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J Demetriou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pianalto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F O'Neil, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement
Represented By: John Mark Haseley
Represented By: Donnell C. Much
Represented By: Michael C. Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Barbara A. Podell
Represented By: Sherrie R. Savett
Represented By: Nathaniel Zachary West
Represented By: Andrew D. Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?