Atherton v. Dowling et al
Plaintiff: James Atherton
Defendant: James F. O'Neill III, Steven E. Strah, Steven J. Demetriou, Jerry Sue Thornton, James F. Pearson, Julia L. Johnson, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, William T. Cottle, George M. Smart, Donald T. Misheff, Robert Reffner, Paul T. Addison, FirstEnergy Corporation, Inc., Michael J. Anderson, Leslie M. Turner, Christopher D. Pappas, K. Jon Taylor, Charles E. Jones, Luis A. Reyes, Sandra Pianalto, Michael J. Dowling and Thomas N. Mitchell
Case Number: 2:2020cv05610
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION and ORDER denying (95) Individual Defendants' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/12/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (sem)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER expediting briefing re (145 in 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ) Motion to Stay filed by FirstEnergy Corp. Plaintiff's response due within 7 days of the date of this Order; Defendant' reply are due within 3 days of Plaintiffs' response. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/2/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying (120) Motion to Stay in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Discovery shall commence without further delay. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/20/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting (119) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; (41) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ;(62) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; (44) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; (24) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and (17) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJMotion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Kerin Lyn Kaminski and Karen L Giffen for FirstEnergy Corp. Attorneys Lawrence Heftman; Barry S. Hyman; Ann H. MacDonald; Kayvan B. Sadeghi; Kevin J. Whelan; Elise H. Yu; Daniel John Donnellon and James Alan Dyer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/20/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2)
July 19, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. ( Responses due by 8/9/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTATION ORDER - Defendant FirstEnergy is ORDERED to file any motion to stay by July 21, 2021. If FirstEnergy does not file such a motion, the parties shall file a joint status report by July 26, 2021, setting forth proposed case deadlines to govern this matter moving forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/1/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr)
June 30, 2021 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT of Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Concerning Formation of a Special Litigation Committee by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting (59) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (107) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (38) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (41) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (21) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (14) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kayvan B. Sadeghi. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless he has done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting (58) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (106) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (37) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (40) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (20) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (13) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry S. Hyman, Larry H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yu, and Kevin J. Whelan. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er)
June 24, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375667) of Kayvan B. Sadeghi( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Good Standing Cert.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375658) of Barry S. Hyman, Lawrence H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yo, Kevin J. Whelan( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James Alan Dyer for Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James)
April 14, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Defendant Charles E. Jones. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Warren, Daniel)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason J. Mendro as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on March 19, 2021. (jlk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8222076) of Jason J. Mendro by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mendro COGS) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Rendon, Carole)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Paul T. Addison on 02/05/2021, filed by Plaintiff James Atherton. (Nespole, Gregory)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on James F. Pearson on 02/04/2021, filed by Plaintiff James Atherton. (Nespole, Gregory)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Stay will be EXPEDITED. Plaintiff shall file its response within 14 days of the date of this Order, and Defendants shall file their reply brief within 7 days of Plaintiff's response. The preliminary pretrial conference currently set for December 2, 2020, (Doc. 46 ) is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 20, 2020. (jlk)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding filing instructions going forward in the consolidated cases. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/18/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw)
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION and ORDER - Case No. 2:20-cv-05876 is consolidated with the FirstEnergy Derivative Actions. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 17, 2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jlk)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - GRANTS Plaintiffs' motions to consolidate. (No. 2:20-04813, ECF No. 24; No. 2:20-05128, ECF No. 3; No. 2:20-05529, ECF No. 3); GRANTS St. Louis Employees' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#24]; GRANTS Electrical Workers' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel [#3]; and DENIES Philadelphia Pension's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead Counsel [#3]. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 16, 2020. (jlk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Charles E. Jones on 11/2/2020, answer due 1/1/2021. (Cummins, James)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Rendon, Carole)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Notification of Hearing on Motion 2:20CV4813 24 and 2:20CV5128 - MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases: Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2020 02:00 PM Virtually before Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley. GRANTING Motion in so far as it seeks to hold a hearing. The call-in information for interested parties, the media, and the general public is: 1-646-749-3112, Access Code: 347-407-869.. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/3/2020. (cw)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Chief Judge has determined that this case and case number 2:20-cv-3785 and all other cases listed on memo ARE related. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on November 2, 2020. (jlk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, FirstEnergy Corporation, Inc., Julia L. Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neill III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah Defts Notice of Non-Opposition to Consolidation of Related Derivative Actions (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Eastern Division at Columbus of the Southern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/28/20. (eh)
October 28, 2020 Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati on 10/28/2020 (Case Number 1:20-cv-841). Case assigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (eh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7725857), filed by James Atherton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Cummins, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atherton v. Dowling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. O'Neill III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Demetriou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Sue Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Cottle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Misheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstEnergy Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: James Alan Dyer
Represented By: Ann H. MacDonald
Represented By: Barry S. Hyman
Represented By: Daniel John Donnellon
Represented By: Karen L Giffen
Represented By: Kerin Lyn Kaminski
Represented By: Elise H. Yu
Represented By: Kayvan B. Sadeghi
Represented By: Kevin J. Whelan
Represented By: Lawrence Heftman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Jason J Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pianalto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Atherton
Represented By: James Rubin Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?