Netjets Sales, Inc. et al v. Sunlu Investment, LLC
Plaintiff: Netjet Sales, Inc., Netjets Services, Inc., NetJets Aviation, Inc. and Netjets Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Sunlu Investment, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05812
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTATION ORDER granting #7 & #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Janice W Reicher and Thomas Bradley Mayhew as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/15/2020. (kk2)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7862383) of Thomas Bradley Mayhew by Defendant Sunlu Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California) (Forry, Steven)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7862319) of Janice W. Reicher by Defendant Sunlu Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certtificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California) (Forry, Steven)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2021 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/12/2020. (sln)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Sunlu Investment, LLC (kk2)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in Franklin County Common Pleas Court by Netjets Sales Inc., Netjets Services Inc., and NetJets Aviation Inc. against Sunlu Investment, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (kk2)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal: Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Sunlu Investment, LLC (Forry, Steven) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (kk2)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, Civil Division, Columbus, Ohio, case number 20-CV-006428 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7745552), filed by Sunlu Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint with all Exhibits attached), #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Answer filed on November 5, 2020)) (Forry, Steven) Modified on 11/10/2020 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netjets Sales, Inc. et al v. Sunlu Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netjet Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netjets Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Gianangeli
Represented By: Charles A Mifsud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Gianangeli
Represented By: Charles A Mifsud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netjets Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Gianangeli
Represented By: Charles A Mifsud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunlu Investment, LLC
Represented By: Steven David Forry
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Thomas B. Mayhew
Represented By: Janice W. Reicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?