Burk et al v. City of Columbus et al
Plaintiff: Summer Hilfers and James A Burk, Jr.
Defendant: Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell and City of Columbus
Not Classified By Court: Nelson E Genshaft
Case Number: 2:2020cv06256
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTATION ORDER re #48 Stipulation - Parties shall jointly propose a deadline for the completion of damages discovery within 14 days of the Court's resolution of dispositive motions. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/14/2023. (agm)
June 13, 2023 Filing 48 STIPULATION by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
May 15, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE by Plaintiff James A Burk, Jr Subpoena Return of Service (Bond, Jonathan)
April 25, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Summer Hilfers by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
April 25, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James A. Burk, Jr. by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
April 17, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott A. DeFoe by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTATION ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 6/13/2023. Dispositive motions due by 8/14/2023. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/16/2023. (agm)
February 15, 2023 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/13/2023. by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pickerill, Alexandra)
January 30, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James A. Burk, Jr. by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
January 30, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Summer Hilfers by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
January 20, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in March 2023. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 1/30/2023. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
January 13, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Marie Hobbs for Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell (Hobbs, Samantha)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 3/15/2023. Dispositive motions due by 5/15/2023. Primary Expert due by 2/15/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 3/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/9/2022. (daf)
November 8, 2022 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/15/2023. by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bond, Jonathan)
October 21, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in December 2022. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 10/31/2022. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTATION ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Primary Expert due by 11/14/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 12/14/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/6/2022. (agm)
October 5, 2022 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/14/2022. by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bond, Jonathan)
September 19, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James A. Burk, Jr. by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
September 19, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Summer Hilfers by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell. (Pickerill, Alexandra)
September 19, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sgt. Neal Tolman by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Bond, Jonathan)
September 19, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Winchell by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Bond, Jonathan)
September 19, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Fihe by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Bond, Jonathan)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time Discovery due by 12/15/2022. Dispositive motions due by 2/15/2023.Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/17/2022. (daf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/15/2022. by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bond, Jonathan)
August 10, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE by Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell (Sperlazza, William)
August 3, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Jennifer Lippman for Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell (Lippman, Allison)
August 2, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Nicole Pickerill for Defendants City of Columbus, Joseph Fihe, Kevin Winchell (Pickerill, Alexandra)
July 21, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Fihe by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Bond, Jonathan)
July 21, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Winchell by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Bond, Jonathan)
June 21, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in August 2022. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 7/1/2022. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
June 9, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Winchell by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Bond, Jonathan)
June 9, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Fihe by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Bond, Jonathan)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 9/15/2022. Dispositive motions due by 11/15/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/17/2022. (agm)
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/15/2022. by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bond, Jonathan)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 03/17/2022. (tla)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTATION ORDER granting #13 Joint MOTION to Vacate Mediation. Mediation Deadline Re-set: 8/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/17/2022. (agm)
March 16, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Vacate Mediation by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bond, Jonathan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/16/2022. by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bond, Jonathan)
March 1, 2022 NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Nelson E Genshaft assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in April 2022, or within 60 days of this notice. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in April 2022. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 2/28/2022. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Primary Expert due by 3/18/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/18/2022. Discovery due by 6/15/2022. Dispositive motions due by 8/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/19/2022. (agm)
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/18/2022. by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bond, Jonathan)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in February 2022. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 1/3/2022. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion Joint MOTION Amended Case Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/18/2021. (daf)
October 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Dispositive motions due by 6/15/2022. Primary Expert due by 1/20/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/22/2022. (daf)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION Amended Case Schedule by Plaintiff James A Burk, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Elliott, Rex)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The March 22, 2021 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 5/28/2021. Motions to Amend due by 5/28/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 4/2/2021. Discovery due by 1/15/2022. Dispositive motions due by 3/15/2022. Primary Expert due by 10/20/2021. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/22/2021. Settlement Demand due by 6/1/2021. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/1/2021. Mediation Deadline: 2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/15/2021. (daf)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Elliott, Rex)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 3/22/2021 02:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Sperlazza, William)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7823033), filed by James A Burk, Jr, Summer Hilfers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Elliott, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burk et al v. City of Columbus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Fihe
Represented By: William Anthony Sperlazza
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Pickerill
Represented By: Allison Jennifer Lippman
Represented By: Samantha Marie Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Winchell
Represented By: William Anthony Sperlazza
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Pickerill
Represented By: Allison Jennifer Lippman
Represented By: Samantha Marie Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus
Represented By: William Anthony Sperlazza
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Pickerill
Represented By: Allison Jennifer Lippman
Represented By: Samantha Marie Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Hilfers
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: Jonathan Bond
Represented By: Barton Ryan Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Burk, Jr.
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: Jonathan Bond
Represented By: Barton Ryan Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Nelson E Genshaft
Represented By: Nelson Eugene Genshaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?