The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company v. Conagra Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Defendant: Osco Industries, Inc., Lancaster Commercial Products, LLC, Masco Cabinetry LLC, Inland Products, Inc., Reynolds American, Inc., General Mills, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc. and Lancaster Glass Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv06347
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to General Mills, Inc. on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Merryman, Matthew)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Lancaster Glass Corporation on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Merryman, Matthew)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Conagra Foods, Inc. on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Merryman, Matthew)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel D. Guthrie, Matthew Travers Merryman and Ambereen Khalid Shaffie as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 01/28/2021. (mdr)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTATION ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey D. Talbert, James W. Beers, Jr. and Katherine Louise Oaks as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 01/28/2021. (mdr)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8049919) of Rachel D. Guthrie, Matthew Travers Merryman, Ambereen Khalid Shaffie by Plaintiff The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Admission - RDG, #2 Motion for Admission - MTM, #3 Certificate of Admission - MTM, #4 Motion for Admission - AKS, #5 Certificate of Admission - AKS) (Newman, Sharon)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number BOHSDC-8049641) of Jeffrey D. Talbert, James W. Beers, Jr., Katherine Louise Oaks by Plaintiff The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - JDT, #2 Motion for Admission - JWB, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - JWB, #4 Motion for Admission - KLO, #5 Certificate of Good Standing - KLO) (Newman, Sharon)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Sharon Newman substituting for Arthur M. Kaufman as to Plaintiff The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney) (Newman, Sharon)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7856836), filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaufman, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company v. Conagra Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osco Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster Commercial Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masco Cabinetry LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds American, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster Glass Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Arthur M. Kaufman
Represented By: Sharon Newman
Represented By: Ambereen Khalid Shaffie
Represented By: Katherine Louise Oaks
Represented By: Rachael D. Guthrie
Represented By: Matthew T. Merryman
Represented By: James W. Beers, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?