JUUL Labs, Inc. v. Trentondkaf LLC
Plaintiff: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Trentondkaf LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06584
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cw)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff JUUL Labs, Inc. (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendant Trentondkaf LLC. Trentondkaf LLC served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (jlk)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via Certified mail service on January 13, 2021 to the following: Trentondkaf, LLC, c/o Robel Meimen, Statutory Agent, 4187 Boudinot Avenue, Cincinnati, Ohio 45211, 7019 1120 0001 4867 0650, and Trentondkaf, LLC, 507 East State Street, Trenton, Ohio 45067, 7019 1120 0001 4867 0667. (jlk)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Trentondkaf LLC. (jlk)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs JUUL Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for JUUL Labs, Inc... (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Trademark Infringement, False Designation of Origin, Unfair Competition, Violation of Ohio Common Law, and Violation of Ohio Deceptive Trade Practices Act against Trentondkaf LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7926891), filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUUL Labs, Inc. v. Trentondkaf LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trentondkaf LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd Pierre-Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?