Asamoah v. Capstone Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Asamoah
Defendant: Capstone Logistics, LLC and Progressive Logistics Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06590
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #13 Motion to Strike ; DENYING #14 Motion for Default Judgment; DENYING #15 Motion to Remand to State Court; and DENYING #16 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/23/2021. (tb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Default Judgment, #13 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (Lillard, Samuel)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Notation Order via 2:19-cv-5292, ECF No. 108 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiff's Second Complaint) (Lillard, Samuel)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Reconsideration re #12 Opinion and Order by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kk2)
January 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #8 Motion to Certify; DENYING #9 Motion to Compel; and DENYING #10 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 1/25/2021. (tb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Notation Order via 2:19-cv-5292, ECF No. 108 filed by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Payments of Expenses by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal for Striking Plaintiff's Motion and Violating His Due Process Rights by Plaintiff Michael Asamoah (kk2)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Jeanette Hardymon for Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC (Hardymon, Teresa)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Notation Order via 2:19-cv-5292, ECF No. 108 by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (Lillard, Samuel)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-5292 & 2:19-cv-5507 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham and Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 1/4/2021. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 11/30/2020 by Michael Asamoah against Capstone Logistics, LLC & Progressive Logistics Services, LLC. (er)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Attachment to Supplemental Cover Sheet) (Lillard, Samuel) (Main Document 2 & Attachment 1 replaced on 12/31/2020- documents are now flattened and are docs are able to be seen combined) (er).
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's Notice of Removal from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20CV007697 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7931465), filed by Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A State Complaint & Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Ex B OH Registration of Foreign LLC) (Lillard, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asamoah v. Capstone Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Asamoah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Neal Lillard
Represented By: Teresa Jeanette Hardymon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Logistics Services, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Neal Lillard
Represented By: Teresa Jeanette Hardymon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?