United HealthCare Services, Inc. et al v. Corzine
Plaintiff: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Defendant: Jeffrey Corzine
Case Number: 2:2021cv00319
Filed: January 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings, Volume 2, held on 2-22-21, before Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 4/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2021. (Coulter, Darla)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 2-19-21, before Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Darla J. Coulter, Telephone number 614-719-3245. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 4/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2021. (Coulter, Darla)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #2 Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 3/15/2021. (cmw)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 34 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 35 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 39 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 40, #14 Exhibit 41, #15 Exhibit 42, #16 Exhibit 43, #17 Exhibit 44, #18 Exhibit 45, #19 Exhibit 46, #20 Exhibit 47, #21 Exhibit 48, #22 Exhibit 49, #23 Exhibit 51 (Redacted), #24 Exhibit 54, #25 Exhibit 57, #26 Exhibit 58, #27 Exhibit 61, #28 Exhibit 86, #29 Exhibit 88, #30 Exhibit 92, #31 Exhibit 93, #32 Exhibit 94, #33 Exhibit 95, #34 Exhibit 97, #35 Exhibit 99, #36 Exhibit 102, #37 Exhibit 107, #38 Exhibit 109 (Redacted), #39 Exhibit 112, #40 Exhibit 113, #41 Exhibit 114, #42 Exhibit 118 (Redacted), #43 Exhibit 119, #44 Exhibit 120, #45 Exhibit 121, #46 Exhibit 122, #47 Exhibit 123, #48 Exhibit 125, #49 Exhibit 126, #50 Exhibit 127, #51 Exhibit 128, #52 Exhibit 156, #53 Exhibit 157 Part 1, #54 Exhibit 157 Part 2, #55 Exhibit 157 Part 3, #56 Exhibit 157 Part 4, #57 Exhibit 158, #58 Exhibit 159, #59 Exhibit 164 (Redacted), #60 Exhibit 170, #61 Exhibit 171) (Lloyd, Katheryn)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order The Clerk's Office has provided sealed access to counsel to file the Trial Exhibits under seal pursuant to the 2/25/2021 Order (ECF No. #30 ). (daf)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Sealed Access was granted by the Court to permit counsel to file under seal pursuant to the 2/25/2021 Order (ECF No. #30 ). (daf)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Response to Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Brief by Defendant Jeffrey Corzine. (Haas, Christopher)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRIAL BRIEF Post Hearing Response Brief by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRIAL BRIEF (Post-Hearing Brief) by Defendant Jeffrey Corzine. (Haas, Christopher)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TRIAL BRIEF (Post-Hearing Brief) by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - The parties are directed to file under seal the documents that were admitted under seal during the hearing. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/25/2021. (cmw)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/23/2021. (cmw)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Amended MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Defendant Jeffrey Corzine. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Haas, Christopher)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Day 2) held on 2/22/2021. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Day 1) held on 2/19/2021. The Preliminary Injunction hearing will reconvene on Monday, February 22, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. via GoToMeeting. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Jeffrey Corzine. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits with Tentative Redactions Per Forthcoming Motion to Seal) (Haas, Christopher)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Seal Document by Defendant Jeffrey Corzine. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kirila, Jill)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Scheduling Order Regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing is RESET for 2/19/2021 at 09:00 AM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) via GoToMeeting before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/17/2021. (cmw)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/16/2021. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/16/2021. (cmw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION For Protective Order by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Beekhuizen, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing RESET for 2/19/2021 at 10:00 AM via GoToMeeting before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference RESET for 2/16/2021 at 01:30 PM via Teleconference before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Regarding Scheduling. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/5/2021. (cmw)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - The parties are ORDERED to file their proposed agreed protective order, consistent with the findings in this Order, by February 8, 2021. Given the dispute over the Protective Order, the parties are permitted to delay Defendant's deposition to Monday, February 8, 2021. The District Court will adjust the hearing schedule accordingly to give both parties sufficient time to prepare. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/4/21. (jr)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #15 Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice of Carmen J. Cole as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/4/2021. (daf)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8078384) of Carmen J. Cole by Defendant Jeffrey Corzine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing) (Kirila, Jill)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Haas for Defendant Jeffrey Corzine (Haas, Christopher)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill S Kirila for Defendant Jeffrey Corzine (Kirila, Jill)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice of Anna M. Tobin and Jenny Gassman-Pines as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/1/2021. (daf)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8055627) of Anna M. Tobin by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate Of Good Standing) (Lloyd, Katheryn)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8055508) of Jenny Gassman-Pines by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate Of Good Standing) (Lloyd, Katheryn)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction set for 2/16/2021 at 01:30 PM via GoToMeeting before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULE 65.1 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/26/2021. (cmw)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Rule 65.1 Telephone Conference held on 1/25/2021. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 65.1 Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 04:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Corzine. (daf)
January 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Michael B. Roaldi filed by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Option Contract, #2 Exhibit B, RSU Contract) (Lloyd, Katheryn)
January 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
January 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Roaldi Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Roaldi Dec., Option Contract, #3 Exhibit Ex. B to Roaldi Dec., RSU Contract, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lloyd, Katheryn)
January 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc. & UnitedHealth Group Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8031440) and against Jeffrey Corzine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Option Contract, #2 Exhibit B, RSU Contract, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Form Summons Form) (Lloyd, Katheryn) Modified text on 1/24/2021 (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United HealthCare Services, Inc. et al v. Corzine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Michael N Beekhuizen
Represented By: Katheryn M Lloyd
Represented By: Anna M. Tobin
Represented By: Michael N. Beekhuizen
Represented By: Jenny Gassman-Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael N Beekhuizen
Represented By: Katheryn M Lloyd
Represented By: Anna M. Tobin
Represented By: Michael N. Beekhuizen
Represented By: Jenny Gassman-Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Corzine
Represented By: Christopher Haas
Represented By: Jill S Kirila
Represented By: Carmen J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?