Moore v. May
Petitioner: Robert Lee Moore
Respondent: Warden Harold F. May
Case Number: 2:2021cv00361
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER - Petitioner's request for an extension of time to object to the R&R, (Doc #8 ), is GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 4/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/22/21. (jr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Robert Lee Moore. (kl)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and #6 Motion to Amend the Petition to Include Additional Claim, RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/9/2021. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Petitioner Robert Lee Moore. (kh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/Letter by Petitioner Robert Lee Moore. (kh)
January 27, 2021 Judge James L. Graham and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. Motions referred to Kimberly A. Jolson. (er)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00743. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 16, 2020 Copy of #4 Order of Transfer mailed to Robert Lee Moore #239784 P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44901 on 11/16/2020. Related document(s) #4 . (S,AL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio (Columbus). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/16/2020. (S,AL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]
April 7, 2020 Copy of #3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) mailed to Robert Lee Moore at P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44091 on 4/7/2020. Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]
April 7, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Robert Lee Moore. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Prisoner)(Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]
April 6, 2020 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case, (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Robert Lee Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold F. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lee Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?