Trost v. Hotchkiss et al
Plaintiff: john "jack" trost
Defendant: kirk immens and Kenneth hotchkiss
Case Number: 2:2021cv00578
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 4/23/2021; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 4/23/2021; Primary Expert due by 10/30/2021; Rebuttal Expert due by 12/15/2021; Discovery (Fact) due by 10/29/2021; Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2021; Settlement Demand due by 4/23/2021; Response to Settlement Demand due by 6/4/2021; Case is referred to Mediation in 11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/7/2021. (kk2)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff John "Jack" Trost. (Swisher, Zachary)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kenneth Hotchkiss, Kirk Immens. (Borla, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. Answers Due: 04/12/2021. (Borla, Robert) Modified text to include Answer date on 2/24/2021 (mdr).
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff John "Jack" Trost Civil Cover Sheet (Swisher, Zachary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8097883), filed by john "jack" trost. (Swisher, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trost v. Hotchkiss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kirk immens
Represented By: Robert Brian Borla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth hotchkiss
Represented By: Robert Brian Borla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: john "jack" trost
Represented By: Zachary Swisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?