Mehler Transport, Inc. et al v. Westfall Towing LLC
Plaintiff: Conexion Logistics LLC and Mehler Transport, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Westfall Towing LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Baillie Lumber Co., L.P.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01293
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Return of Property filed by Plaintiffs Conexion Logistics LLC, Mehler Transport, Inc.. (Lehmkuhl, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 5/18/2021. (tb)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Conexion Logistics LLC, Mehler Transport, Inc. & Defendant Westfall Towing LLC (Lehmkuhl, Andrew) Modified parties on 5/18/2021 (kk2)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2021 @ 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Return of Property filed by Defendant Westfall Towing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Bennett, Daniel)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Baillie Lumber Co., L.P., and COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Westfall Towing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bennett, Daniel)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Westfall Towing LLC answer due 5/3/2021 per #9 (Stipulation) (kk2)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline by Defendant Westfall Towing LLC & All Plaintiffs. (Bennett, Daniel) Modified parties on 4/20/2021 (kk2)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Return of Property by Plaintiffs Conexion Logistics LLC, Mehler Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Melendez, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Miller, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Notice of Motion for Order of Possession of Property, #5 Exhibit Praecipe, #6 Exhibit Request for Hearing) (Lehmkuhl, Andrew)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Westfall Towing LLC c/o Travis Westfall. Westfall Towing LLC served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (kh)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Westfall Towing LLC (kk2)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 03/25/2021. This matter is hereby TRANSFERRED from the docket of The Honorable Susan J. Dlott to the Clerk of this Court for reassignment to the Eastern District atColumbus. (kl)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mehler Transport, Inc. (Lehmkuhl, Andrew)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Conexion Logistics LLC. (Lehmkuhl, Andrew)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westfall Towing LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8234770), filed by Mehler Transport, Inc., Conexion Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Lehmkuhl, Andrew)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati Division on 03/25/2021. Case Number 1:21-cv-202. Case assigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (kl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehler Transport, Inc. et al v. Westfall Towing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Westfall Towing LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conexion Logistics LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmkuhl, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehler Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmkuhl, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Baillie Lumber Co., L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?