Kitzler v. Root, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerad Kitzler
Defendant: Elliot Geidt, Christopher Olsen, Nick Shalek, Daniel Rosenthal, Luis Von Ahn, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Larry Hilsheimer, Scott Maw, Nancy Kramer, Root, Inc., Doug Ulman, Megan Binkley, Jerri Devard, Barclays Capital Inc., Alexander Timm and Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01301
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
3 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (daf)
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jerad Kitzler (Murray, Joseph)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 , #10 and #11 Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice of Catherine Akenhead, Andrew Finn, and Sharon Nelles as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/27/2021. (daf)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion Order Regarding Service of Process and Response to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/22/2021. (daf)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8278792) of Sharon Nelles by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Harrison, Gregory)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8278792) of Andrew Finn by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Harrison, Gregory)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8278792) of Catherine Akenhead by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Harrison, Gregory)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Pitcher for Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Pitcher, Kelly)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Harrison for Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Harrison, Gregory)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION Order Regarding Service of Process and Response to Complaint by Defendants Megan Binkley, Jerri Devard, Elliot Geidt, Larry Hilsheimer, Nancy Kramer, Scott Maw, Christopher Olsen, Root, Inc., Daniel Rosenthal, Nick Shalek, Alexander Timm, Doug Ulman, Luis Von Ahn. (Kloss, William)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:21-cv-1197 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 4/12/2021. (kk2)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Barclays Capital Inc., Megan Binkley, Jerri Devard, Elliot Geidt, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Larry Hilsheimer, Nancy Kramer, Scott Maw, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Christopher Olsen, Root Inc., Daniel Rosenthal, Nick Shalek, Alexander Timm, Doug Ulman, Luis Von Ahn, and Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Timm, #2 Summons Form Rosenthal, #3 Summons Form Binkley, #4 Summons Form Olsen, #5 Summons Form Ulman, #6 Summons Form Geidt, #7 Summons Form DeVard, #8 Summons Form Hilsheimer, #9 Summons Form Von Ahn, #10 Summons Form Kramer, #11 Summons Form Shalek, #12 Summons Form Maw, #13 Summons Form Goldman Sachs, #14 Summons Form Morgan Stanley, #15 Summons Form Barclays, #16 Summons Form Wells Fargo) (kk2)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff Jerad Kitzler (Murray, Joseph) Modified on 3/26/2021 (kk2)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Violation of the Federal Securities Law against Barclays Capital Inc., Megan Binkley, Jerri Devard, Elliot Geidt, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Larry Hilsheimer, Nancy Kramer, Scott Maw, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Christopher Olsen, Root, Inc., Daniel Rosenthal, Nick Shalek, Alexander Timm, Doug Ulman, Luis Von Ahn, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8235724), filed by Jerad Kitzler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Root, Inc., #3 Summons Form Timm, #4 Summons Form Rosenthal, #5 Summons Form Binkley, #6 Summons Form Olsen, #7 Summons Form Ulman, #8 Summons Form Geidt, #9 Summons Form DeVard, #10 Summons Form Hilsheimer, #11 Summons Form Von Ahn, #12 Summons Form Kramer, #13 Summons Form Shalek, #14 Summons Form Maw, #15 Summons Form Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, #16 Summons Form Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, #17 Summons Form Barclays Capital Inc., #18 Summons Form Wells Fargo Securities, LLC) (Murray, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitzler v. Root, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Geidt
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Olsen
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Shalek
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rosenthal
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Von Ahn
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Kelly E. Pitcher
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Andrew Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Kelly E. Pitcher
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Andrew Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hilsheimer
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Maw
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Kramer
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Root, Inc.
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Ulman
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Binkley
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerri Devard
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Kelly E. Pitcher
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Andrew Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Timm
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Kelly E. Pitcher
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Catherine Akenhead
Represented By: Andrew Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerad Kitzler
Represented By: Joseph F Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?