Coventry Deli, et al. v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co.
Plaintiff: VAN JOE LLC DBA JOSEPH ANTHONY RETREAT SPA AND DRY BAR, COVENTRY DELI, STECK EYE CARE LLC, JOSEPH ANTHONY HAIR STUDIO INC., Joseph Anthony Hair Studio, Inc. and Steck Eye Care, LLC
Defendant: STATE AUTO PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. and State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02708
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey P. Goodman as co-counsel; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel B. Dordick as co-counsel; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marni S. Berger as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 16, 2021. (jlk)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Coventry Deli, Joseph Anthony Hair Studio, Inc., Steck Eye Care, LLC, Van Joe LLC DBA Joseph Anthony Retreat Spa and Dry Bar re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8397812) of Jeffrey P. Goodman Notice of Filing Certificate of Good Standing (Abbarno, Kenneth)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8397862) of Marni S. Berger by Plaintiffs Coventry Deli, Joseph Anthony Hair Studio, Inc., Steck Eye Care, LLC, Van Joe LLC DBA Joseph Anthony Retreat Spa and Dry Bar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (Abbarno, Kenneth)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8397854) of Samuel B. Dordick by Plaintiffs Coventry Deli, Joseph Anthony Hair Studio, Inc., Steck Eye Care, LLC, Van Joe LLC DBA Joseph Anthony Retreat Spa and Dry Bar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (Abbarno, Kenneth)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8397812) of Jeffrey P. Goodman by Plaintiffs Coventry Deli, Joseph Anthony Hair Studio, Inc., Steck Eye Care, LLC, Van Joe LLC DBA Joseph Anthony Retreat Spa and Dry Bar. (Abbarno, Kenneth)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co. on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Abbarno, Kenneth)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Coventry Deli. (Abbarno, Kenneth)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joseph Anthony Hair Studio, Inc.. (Abbarno, Kenneth)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Van Joe LLC DBA Joseph Anthony Retreat Spa and Dry Bar. (Abbarno, Kenneth)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Steck Eye Care, LLC. (Abbarno, Kenneth)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to STATE AUTO PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. (jlk)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Abbarno, Kenneth)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against STATE AUTO PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8326346), filed by STECK EYE CARE LLC, COVENTRY DELI, VAN JOE LLC DBA JOSEPH ANTHONY RETREAT SPA AND DRY BAR, JOSEPH ANTHONY HAIR STUDIO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbarno, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coventry Deli, et al. v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAN JOE LLC DBA JOSEPH ANTHONY RETREAT SPA AND DRY BAR
Represented By: Kenneth P Abbarno
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Goodman
Represented By: Marni S. Berger
Represented By: Samuel B. Dordick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVENTRY DELI
Represented By: Kenneth P Abbarno
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Goodman
Represented By: Marni S. Berger
Represented By: Samuel B. Dordick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STECK EYE CARE LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P Abbarno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH ANTHONY HAIR STUDIO INC.
Represented By: Kenneth P Abbarno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Hair Studio, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth P Abbarno
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Goodman
Represented By: Marni S. Berger
Represented By: Samuel B. Dordick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steck Eye Care, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P Abbarno
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Goodman
Represented By: Marni S. Berger
Represented By: Samuel B. Dordick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE AUTO PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?